EP1182658 - MAGNETIC TAPE CASSETTE AND METHOD OF ANTISTATIC TREATMENT OF SHEETS USED THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.05.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2002 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.07.2002 [2002/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210 Nakanuma Minamiashigara-shi, Kanagawa-ken 250-0193 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/09] | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210 Nakanuma Minami-ashigara-shi Kanagawa-ken, 250-0193 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakane, Takanobu Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd., 2-12-1, Ogi-cho Odawara-shi, Kanagawa 250-0001 / JP | 02 /
Morita, Kiyoo Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd., 2-12-1, Ogi-cho Odawara-shi, Kanagawa 250-0001 / JP | 03 /
Hiraguchi, Kazuo Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd., 2-12-1, Ogi-cho Odawara-shi, Kanagawa 250-0001 / JP | [2002/09] | Representative(s) | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/09] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Winzererstrasse 106 80797 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00925654.6 | 12.05.2000 | [2002/09] | WO2000JP03071 | Priority number, date | JP19990134006 | 14.05.1999 Original published format: JP 13400699 | [2002/09] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0070615 | Date: | 23.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1182658 | Date: | 27.02.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.11.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G11B23/087 | [2002/09] | CPC: |
G11B23/08764 (EP);
G11B23/087 (KR);
G11B23/08728 (EP);
G11B23/08735 (EP);
G11B23/08785 (EP);
G11B23/08792 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/09] | Title | German: | MAGNETBANDKASSETTE UND ANTISTATISCHES BEHANDLUNGSVERFAHREN VON FOLIEN DAFUER | [2002/09] | English: | MAGNETIC TAPE CASSETTE AND METHOD OF ANTISTATIC TREATMENT OF SHEETS USED THEREFOR | [2002/09] | French: | CASSETTE A RUBAN MAGNETIQUE ET PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT ANTISTATIQUE DE FEUILLES UTILISEES POUR CELLE-CI | [2002/09] | Entry into regional phase | 04.12.2001 | Translation filed | 04.12.2001 | National basic fee paid | 04.12.2001 | Search fee paid | 04.12.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.12.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.10.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 04.12.2001 | Examination requested [2002/09] | 14.05.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/27] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH0197481U ; | [X]JPH0337676U ; | [X]JPS5761689U ; | [X]JPS578683U ; | [XP]JP2000113634 (TDK CORP); | [X]JPH0741775U ; | [X]JPH04356782 (SONY CORP); | [Y]JPH01220120 (SONY CORP); | [X]JPH11232820 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD); | [X]JPS62150784U ; | [X]JPH08329650 (SONY CORP); | [X]JPH0887858 (TORAY INDUSTRIES); | [Y]JPH01251486 (NIHON VALQUA KOGYO KK); | [Y]JPH0128578Y ; | [Y]JPS60146978U ; | [Y]JPS6314388 (YOBEA RULON KOGYO KK) |