EP1171982 - GIGABIT ETHERNET WITH TIMING OFFSETS BETWEEN TWISTED-PAIR CONDUCTORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/03] | GIGABIT ETHERNET WITH TIMING OFFSETS BETWEEN THE TWISTED PAIRS | ||
[2007/08] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.05.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 11.08.2010 [2010/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Broadcom Corporation 5300 California Avenue Irvine, CA 92617 / US | [2007/21] |
Former [2002/03] | For all designated states Broadcom Corporation 16215 Alton Parkway Irvine, CA 92618-3616 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CREIGH, John, L. 16215 Alton Parkway Irvine, CA 92618-3616 / US | [2002/03] | Representative(s) | Jehle, Volker Armin, et al Bosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/17] | Jehle, Volker Armin, et al Patentanwälte Bosch, Graf von Stosch, Jehle, Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/16] | Graf von Stosch, Andreas, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Bosch, Graf v. Stosch, Jehle Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/03] | Müller, Wolfram Hubertus, Dipl.-Phys., et al Patentanwälte Maikowski & Ninnemann, Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 00926381.5 | 24.04.2000 | [2002/03] | WO2000US11157 | Priority number, date | US19990130616P | 22.04.1999 Original published format: US 130616 P | [2002/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0065791 | Date: | 02.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1171982 | Date: | 16.01.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.11.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1171982 | Date: | 25.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04L25/14 | [2002/03] | CPC: |
H04L7/0062 (EP,US);
G01R31/3004 (EP,US);
G01R31/3008 (EP,US);
G01R31/3016 (EP,US);
G01R31/31715 (EP,US);
G01R31/318502 (EP,US);
G01R31/318552 (EP,US);
G01R31/318594 (EP,US);
H04B3/23 (EP,US);
H04B3/32 (EP,US);
H04L1/0054 (EP,US);
H04L1/006 (EP,US);
H04L1/242 (EP,US);
H04L25/03038 (EP,US);
H04L25/03057 (EP,US);
H04L25/03146 (EP,US);
H04L25/03267 (EP,US);
H04L25/067 (EP,US);
H04L25/14 (EP,US);
H04L25/4917 (EP,US);
H04L25/497 (EP,US);
H04L7/0334 (EP,US);
H04L2025/03363 (EP,US);
H04L2025/03369 (EP,US);
H04L2025/03477 (EP,US);
H04L2025/0349 (EP,US);
H04L2025/03496 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/03] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GIGABIT-ETHERNT MIT ZEITVERSCHIEBUNGEN ZWISCHEN VERDRILLTEN LEITUNGSPAAREN | [2007/08] | English: | GIGABIT ETHERNET WITH TIMING OFFSETS BETWEEN TWISTED-PAIR CONDUCTORS | [2007/08] | French: | GIGA-ETHERNET AVEC DECALAGES TEMPORELS ENTRE LIGNES DE PAIRES TORSADEES | [2007/08] |
Former [2002/03] | GIGABIT-ETHERNT MIT ZEITVERSCHIEBUNGEN ZWISCHEN DEN VERDRILLTEN PAAREN | ||
Former [2002/03] | GIGABIT ETHERNET WITH TIMING OFFSETS BETWEEN THE TWISTED PAIRS | ||
Former [2002/03] | GIGA-ETHERNET AVEC DECALAGES DE SYNCHRONISATION ENTRE PAIRES TORSADEES | Entry into regional phase | 08.11.2001 | National basic fee paid | 08.11.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.11.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.11.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.11.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/03] | 02.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.06.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 12.06.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.04.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.07.2007 | BE | 25.07.2007 | CH | 25.07.2007 | CY | 25.07.2007 | DK | 25.07.2007 | FI | 25.07.2007 | LI | 25.07.2007 | NL | 25.07.2007 | SE | 25.10.2007 | GR | 26.10.2007 | ES | 05.11.2007 | PT | 26.12.2007 | FR | 21.03.2008 | IE | 24.04.2008 | LU | 24.04.2008 | [2010/32] |
Former [2009/33] | AT | 25.07.2007 | |
BE | 25.07.2007 | ||
CH | 25.07.2007 | ||
CY | 25.07.2007 | ||
DK | 25.07.2007 | ||
FI | 25.07.2007 | ||
LI | 25.07.2007 | ||
NL | 25.07.2007 | ||
SE | 25.10.2007 | ||
GR | 26.10.2007 | ||
ES | 05.11.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
FR | 21.03.2008 | ||
IE | 24.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 25.07.2007 | |
BE | 25.07.2007 | ||
CH | 25.07.2007 | ||
DK | 25.07.2007 | ||
FI | 25.07.2007 | ||
LI | 25.07.2007 | ||
NL | 25.07.2007 | ||
SE | 25.10.2007 | ||
GR | 26.10.2007 | ||
ES | 05.11.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
FR | 21.03.2008 | ||
IE | 24.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/32] | AT | 25.07.2007 | |
BE | 25.07.2007 | ||
CH | 25.07.2007 | ||
DK | 25.07.2007 | ||
FI | 25.07.2007 | ||
LI | 25.07.2007 | ||
NL | 25.07.2007 | ||
SE | 25.10.2007 | ||
GR | 26.10.2007 | ||
ES | 05.11.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
FR | 21.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 25.07.2007 | |
BE | 25.07.2007 | ||
CH | 25.07.2007 | ||
DK | 25.07.2007 | ||
FI | 25.07.2007 | ||
LI | 25.07.2007 | ||
NL | 25.07.2007 | ||
SE | 25.10.2007 | ||
GR | 26.10.2007 | ||
ES | 05.11.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/23] | AT | 25.07.2007 | |
BE | 25.07.2007 | ||
CH | 25.07.2007 | ||
DK | 25.07.2007 | ||
FI | 25.07.2007 | ||
LI | 25.07.2007 | ||
NL | 25.07.2007 | ||
GR | 26.10.2007 | ||
ES | 05.11.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 25.07.2007 | |
BE | 25.07.2007 | ||
CH | 25.07.2007 | ||
FI | 25.07.2007 | ||
LI | 25.07.2007 | ||
NL | 25.07.2007 | ||
GR | 26.10.2007 | ||
ES | 05.11.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/13] | AT | 25.07.2007 | |
CH | 25.07.2007 | ||
FI | 25.07.2007 | ||
LI | 25.07.2007 | ||
NL | 25.07.2007 | ||
ES | 05.11.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | FI | 25.07.2007 | |
NL | 25.07.2007 | ||
ES | 05.11.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | NL | 25.07.2007 | |
ES | 05.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | ES | 05.11.2007 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9403005 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-5,16-20,25-29* abstract *; | [X]EP0596736 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [X] 1-5,16-20,25-29 * abstract *; | [X] - CROUCH, JEDWAB, "Coding in 100VG-AnyLAN", HEWLETT-PACKARD JOURNAL, Palo Alto, US, (199508), vol. 46, no. 4, pages 27 - 32, XP000525583 [X] 1-5,16-20,25-29 * figure 3 * |