EP1175248 - LIQUID MIST FIRE EXTINGUISHER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.09.2006 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Terra Nova Marine Company Limited 119 Clyde Avenue Mount Pearl Newfoundland & Labrador A1N 4R9 / CA | [2005/46] |
Former [2002/05] | For all designated states Terra Nova Marine Company Limited 119 Clyde Avenue Mount Pearl, Newfoundland & Labrador A1N 4R9 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOPKINS, Gordon, Duane 119 Clyde Avenue Mount Pearl, Newfoundland & Labrador A1N / CA | [2002/05] | Representative(s) | Newell, William Joseph, et al Wynne-Jones, Lainé & James LLP Essex Place 22 Rodney Road Cheltenham Gloucestershire GL50 1JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/27] | Newell, William Joseph, et al Wynne-Jones, Lainé & James 22 Rodney Road Cheltenham Gloucestershire GL50 1JJ / GB | ||
Former [2002/05] | Lainé, Simon James, et al Wynne-Jones, Lainé & James 22, Rodney Road Cheltenham Gloucestershire GL50 1JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 00926603.2 | 04.05.2000 | [2002/05] | WO2000CA00520 | Priority number, date | US19990306017 | 06.05.1999 Original published format: US 306017 | [2002/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0067850 | Date: | 16.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1175248 | Date: | 30.01.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.11.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1175248 | Date: | 16.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A62C13/64, A62C31/02, A62C39/00 | [2002/05] | CPC: |
A62C99/0072 (EP,US);
A62C13/64 (EP,US);
A62C31/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/05] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLÜSSIGNEBELFEUERLÖSCHER | [2002/05] | English: | LIQUID MIST FIRE EXTINGUISHER | [2002/05] | French: | EXTINCTEUR PAR NEBULISATION D'UN LIQUIDE | [2002/05] | Entry into regional phase | 12.11.2001 | National basic fee paid | 12.11.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.11.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.11.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/05] | 04.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.09.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 08.09.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.11.2005 | BE | 16.11.2005 | CH | 16.11.2005 | CY | 16.11.2005 | FI | 16.11.2005 | IT | 16.11.2005 | LI | 16.11.2005 | NL | 16.11.2005 | DK | 16.02.2006 | GR | 16.02.2006 | SE | 16.02.2006 | DE | 17.02.2006 | ES | 27.02.2006 | PT | 17.04.2006 | IE | 04.05.2006 | LU | 04.05.2006 | MC | 31.05.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/36] | AT | 16.11.2005 | |
BE | 16.11.2005 | ||
CH | 16.11.2005 | ||
FI | 16.11.2005 | ||
IT | 16.11.2005 | ||
LI | 16.11.2005 | ||
NL | 16.11.2005 | ||
DK | 16.02.2006 | ||
GR | 16.02.2006 | ||
SE | 16.02.2006 | ||
DE | 17.02.2006 | ||
ES | 27.02.2006 | ||
PT | 17.04.2006 | ||
IE | 04.05.2006 | ||
LU | 04.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/35] | AT | 16.11.2005 | |
BE | 16.11.2005 | ||
CH | 16.11.2005 | ||
FI | 16.11.2005 | ||
IT | 16.11.2005 | ||
LI | 16.11.2005 | ||
NL | 16.11.2005 | ||
DK | 16.02.2006 | ||
GR | 16.02.2006 | ||
SE | 16.02.2006 | ||
DE | 17.02.2006 | ||
ES | 27.02.2006 | ||
PT | 17.04.2006 | ||
IE | 04.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/25] | AT | 16.11.2005 | |
BE | 16.11.2005 | ||
CH | 16.11.2005 | ||
FI | 16.11.2005 | ||
LI | 16.11.2005 | ||
NL | 16.11.2005 | ||
DK | 16.02.2006 | ||
GR | 16.02.2006 | ||
SE | 16.02.2006 | ||
DE | 17.02.2006 | ||
ES | 27.02.2006 | ||
PT | 17.04.2006 | ||
IE | 04.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/07] | AT | 16.11.2005 | |
BE | 16.11.2005 | ||
CH | 16.11.2005 | ||
FI | 16.11.2005 | ||
LI | 16.11.2005 | ||
NL | 16.11.2005 | ||
DK | 16.02.2006 | ||
GR | 16.02.2006 | ||
SE | 16.02.2006 | ||
DE | 17.02.2006 | ||
ES | 27.02.2006 | ||
PT | 17.04.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/51] | AT | 16.11.2005 | |
BE | 16.11.2005 | ||
CH | 16.11.2005 | ||
FI | 16.11.2005 | ||
LI | 16.11.2005 | ||
NL | 16.11.2005 | ||
DK | 16.02.2006 | ||
GR | 16.02.2006 | ||
SE | 16.02.2006 | ||
DE | 17.02.2006 | ||
ES | 27.02.2006 | ||
PT | 17.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | AT | 16.11.2005 | |
BE | 16.11.2005 | ||
CH | 16.11.2005 | ||
FI | 16.11.2005 | ||
LI | 16.11.2005 | ||
NL | 16.11.2005 | ||
DK | 16.02.2006 | ||
GR | 16.02.2006 | ||
SE | 16.02.2006 | ||
ES | 27.02.2006 | ||
PT | 17.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | AT | 16.11.2005 | |
BE | 16.11.2005 | ||
CH | 16.11.2005 | ||
FI | 16.11.2005 | ||
LI | 16.11.2005 | ||
NL | 16.11.2005 | ||
DK | 16.02.2006 | ||
GR | 16.02.2006 | ||
SE | 16.02.2006 | ||
ES | 27.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | AT | 16.11.2005 | |
BE | 16.11.2005 | ||
CH | 16.11.2005 | ||
FI | 16.11.2005 | ||
LI | 16.11.2005 | ||
NL | 16.11.2005 | ||
DK | 16.02.2006 | ||
SE | 16.02.2006 | ||
ES | 27.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/34] | AT | 16.11.2005 | |
CH | 16.11.2005 | ||
FI | 16.11.2005 | ||
LI | 16.11.2005 | ||
NL | 16.11.2005 | ||
DK | 16.02.2006 | ||
SE | 16.02.2006 | ||
ES | 27.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/33] | CH | 16.11.2005 | |
FI | 16.11.2005 | ||
LI | 16.11.2005 | ||
NL | 16.11.2005 | ||
SE | 16.02.2006 | ||
ES | 27.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/27] | FI | 16.11.2005 | |
NL | 16.11.2005 | ||
SE | 16.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/23] | FI | 16.11.2005 | |
NL | 16.11.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE2747588 (HAHN METALLBAU GMBH) [A] 1-22 * page 8, line 4 - page 10, line 24; figure - *; | [A]EP0314354 (BRITISH PETROLEUM CO PLC [GB]) [A] 1-22* column 7, line 57 - column 13, line 23; figure - *; | [A]US4862968 (WOODMAN STUART D [CA]) [A] 1-22 * column 2, line 18 - column 5, line 38; figure - *; | [A]WO9702863 (BROEMME ALBRECHT [DE]) [A] 1-22 * page 5, line L - page 10, line L; figure - *; | [A]DE19724339 (JURKE STEFFEN [DE]) [A] 1-22 * column 1, line 3 - line 38; figure . * |