EP1177100 - EXPANDABLE LAYER MADE OF A COMPRESSIBLE MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.11.2007 Database last updated on 24.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, LU | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAUERESSIG GMBH & CO. Gutenbergstrasse 1 - 3 48691 Vreden / DE | [2002/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAUERESSIG, Kilian Gutenbergstrasse 1-3 D-48691 Vreden / DE | [2002/06] | Representative(s) | Tönhardt, Marion Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/06] | Tönhardt, Marion, Dr. Forrester & Boehmert, Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00926708.9 | 06.04.2000 | [2002/06] | WO2000DE01092 | Priority number, date | DE1999118432 | 23.04.1999 Original published format: DE 19918432 | [2002/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0064675 | Date: | 02.11.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1177100 | Date: | 06.02.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.11.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1177100 | Date: | 27.12.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B41F27/10, B41N6/00 | [2002/06] | CPC: |
B41F27/105 (EP,US);
B41N7/00 (EP,US);
B41N2207/04 (EP,US);
B41N2207/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2006/52] |
Former [2002/06] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DEHNSCHICHT AUS KOMPRESSIBLEM MATERIAL | [2002/06] | English: | EXPANDABLE LAYER MADE OF A COMPRESSIBLE MATERIAL | [2002/06] | French: | COUCHE EXTENSIBLE CONSTITUEE D'UN MATERIAU COMPRESSIBLE | [2002/06] | Entry into regional phase | 19.10.2001 | National basic fee paid | 19.10.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.10.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.11.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.10.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.10.2001 | Examination requested [2002/06] | 23.06.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.10.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 17.10.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.09.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 27.12.2006 | DK | 27.12.2006 | FI | 27.12.2006 | IE | 27.12.2006 | SE | 27.03.2007 | GR | 28.03.2007 | AT | 06.04.2007 | LU | 06.04.2007 | CH | 30.04.2007 | LI | 30.04.2007 | MC | 30.04.2007 | PT | 28.05.2007 | [2009/37] |
Former [2009/18] | DK | 27.12.2006 | |
FI | 27.12.2006 | ||
IE | 27.12.2006 | ||
SE | 27.03.2007 | ||
GR | 28.03.2007 | ||
AT | 06.04.2007 | ||
CH | 30.04.2007 | ||
LI | 30.04.2007 | ||
MC | 30.04.2007 | ||
PT | 28.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/39] | DK | 27.12.2006 | |
FI | 27.12.2006 | ||
IE | 27.12.2006 | ||
SE | 27.03.2007 | ||
GR | 28.03.2007 | ||
AT | 06.04.2007 | ||
CH | 30.04.2007 | ||
LI | 30.04.2007 | ||
PT | 28.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | DK | 27.12.2006 | |
FI | 27.12.2006 | ||
IE | 27.12.2006 | ||
SE | 27.03.2007 | ||
GR | 28.03.2007 | ||
CH | 30.04.2007 | ||
LI | 30.04.2007 | ||
PT | 28.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/13] | DK | 27.12.2006 | |
FI | 27.12.2006 | ||
IE | 27.12.2006 | ||
SE | 27.03.2007 | ||
CH | 30.04.2007 | ||
LI | 30.04.2007 | ||
PT | 28.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/46] | DK | 27.12.2006 | |
FI | 27.12.2006 | ||
IE | 27.12.2006 | ||
SE | 27.03.2007 | ||
PT | 28.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/42] | FI | 27.12.2006 | |
IE | 27.12.2006 | ||
SE | 27.03.2007 | ||
PT | 28.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/36] | FI | 27.12.2006 | |
SE | 27.03.2007 | ||
PT | 28.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/25] | FI | 27.12.2006 | |
SE | 27.03.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE2620549 (MOSSTYPE CORP) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0196443 (SAUERESSIG & CO [DE]) [A] 1 * page 8, line 14 - line 18 *; | [A]US4864926 (SAUERESSIG KARL W [DE]) [A] 1 * column 5, line 34 - line 58 *; | [A]DE19634033 (BAUER KNUT DR ING [DE], et al) [A] 1 * column 1, line 62 - column 2, line 1 *; | [DE]EP1004455 (SAUERESSIG GMBH & CO [DE]) [DE] 1* paragraph [0025]; figure 3C * |