EP1200695 - TRANSMISSION HOUSING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.06.2006 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEGENIA-AUBI KG Industriestrasse 1-3 57234 Wilnsdorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/27] | For all designated states SIEGENIA-AUBI KG Industriestrasse 1-3 57234 Wilnsdorf / DE | ||
Former [2003/23] | For all designated states SIEGENIA-AUBI KG Eisenhüttenstrasse 22 57074 Siegen / DE | ||
Former [2003/14] | For all designated states SIEGENIA-AUBI KG Industriestrasse 1-3 57234 Wilnsdorf / DE | ||
Former [2002/18] | For all designated states SIEGENIA-FRANK KG Eisenhüttenstrasse 22 57074 Siegen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LOOS, Horst Hofgasse 4 D-57258 Freudenberg / DE | [2002/18] | Application number, filing date | 00927042.2 | 26.04.2000 | [2002/18] | WO2000EP03698 | Priority number, date | DE1999136493 | 05.08.1999 Original published format: DE 19936493 | [2002/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0111168 | Date: | 15.02.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1200695 | Date: | 02.05.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.02.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1200695 | Date: | 27.07.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | E05B9/00, E05C9/00 | [2002/18] | CPC: |
E05C9/021 (EP);
E05C9/063 (EP);
E05D15/524 (EP);
E05Y2900/148 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/18] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GETRIEBEGEHÄUSE | [2002/18] | English: | TRANSMISSION HOUSING | [2002/18] | French: | CARTER POUR SYSTEME DE TRANSMISSION | [2002/18] | Entry into regional phase | 20.07.2001 | National basic fee paid | 20.07.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.07.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.12.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.07.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.07.2001 | Examination requested [2002/18] | 07.02.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.04.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 05.04.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.04.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 27.07.2005 | FI | 27.07.2005 | IE | 27.07.2005 | NL | 27.07.2005 | DK | 27.10.2005 | GR | 27.10.2005 | SE | 27.10.2005 | ES | 07.11.2005 | PT | 27.12.2005 | LU | 26.04.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/36] | FI | 27.07.2005 | |
IE | 27.07.2005 | ||
NL | 27.07.2005 | ||
DK | 27.10.2005 | ||
GR | 27.10.2005 | ||
SE | 27.10.2005 | ||
ES | 07.11.2005 | ||
PT | 27.12.2005 | ||
LU | 26.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/26] | FI | 27.07.2005 | |
IE | 27.07.2005 | ||
NL | 27.07.2005 | ||
DK | 27.10.2005 | ||
GR | 27.10.2005 | ||
SE | 27.10.2005 | ||
ES | 07.11.2005 | ||
PT | 27.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/25] | FI | 27.07.2005 | |
IE | 27.07.2005 | ||
NL | 27.07.2005 | ||
GR | 27.10.2005 | ||
SE | 27.10.2005 | ||
ES | 07.11.2005 | ||
PT | 27.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 27.07.2005 | |
NL | 27.07.2005 | ||
GR | 27.10.2005 | ||
SE | 27.10.2005 | ||
ES | 07.11.2005 | ||
PT | 27.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 27.07.2005 | |
SE | 27.10.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4002360 (FRANK GERHARD, et al) [A] 1 * column 3, line 22 - column 5, line 15; figure - *; | [A]GB2144485 (WINKHAUS FA AUGUST) [A] 1 * page 2, line 57 - page 3, line 30; figure - *; | [A]EP0785329 (SIEGENIA FRANK KG [DE]) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]EP0787876 (SIEGENIA FRANK KG [DE]) [A] 1* figure - * |