EP1175602 - A METHOD OF CHARACTERIZING FLUORESCENT MOLECULES OR OTHER PARTICLES USING GENERATING FUNCTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.01.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 29.08.2007 [2007/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Evotec OAI AG Schnackenburgallee 114 22525 Hamburg / DE | [2002/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PALO, Kauko P.K. 444A, Ouna tee 2 EE74001 Haabneeme / EE | 02 /
KASK, Pete Uus 5-3 EE3051 Harku / EE | [2002/05] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/05] | Meyers, Hans-Wilhelm, Dr.Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 00927110.7 | 29.04.2000 | [2002/05] | WO2000EP03890 | Priority number, date | US19990131657P | 29.04.1999 Original published format: US 131657 P | US19990338439 | 23.06.1999 Original published format: US 338439 | EP19990112104 | 23.06.1999 Original published format: EP 99112104 | EP19990125745 | 23.12.1999 Original published format: EP 99125745 | US20000181564P | 10.02.2000 Original published format: US 181564 P | [2002/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0066985 | Date: | 09.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1175602 | Date: | 30.01.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.11.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1175602 | Date: | 19.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G01J3/44, G01N15/02 | [2002/05] | CPC: |
G01N21/6458 (EP);
G01J3/4406 (EP);
G01J3/457 (EP);
G01J2003/2866 (EP);
G01N2021/6421 (EP);
G01N2021/6463 (EP);
G01N21/6408 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/05] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ERFASSUNG VON FLUORESZIERENDEN MOLEKÜLEN ODER ANDEREN TEILCHEN MITTELS ERZEUGENDEN FUNKTIONEN | [2002/05] | English: | A METHOD OF CHARACTERIZING FLUORESCENT MOLECULES OR OTHER PARTICLES USING GENERATING FUNCTIONS | [2002/05] | French: | PROCEDE UTILISANT DES FONCTIONS GENERATRICES POUR CARACTERISER DES MOLECULES OU AUTRES PARTICULES FLUORESCENTES | [2002/05] | Entry into regional phase | 21.06.2001 | National basic fee paid | 21.06.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.06.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.09.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.06.2001 | Examination requested [2002/05] | 21.06.2001 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 04.04.2002 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 17.04.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.12.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 23.12.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.03.2003 | BE | 19.03.2003 | FI | 19.03.2003 | GR | 19.03.2003 | IT | 19.03.2003 | NL | 19.03.2003 | CY | 29.04.2003 | IE | 29.04.2003 | LU | 29.04.2003 | MC | 30.04.2003 | SE | 19.06.2003 | PT | 20.06.2003 | ES | 30.09.2003 | [2007/35] |
Former [2005/02] | AT | 19.03.2003 | |
BE | 19.03.2003 | ||
FI | 19.03.2003 | ||
GR | 19.03.2003 | ||
NL | 19.03.2003 | ||
CY | 29.04.2003 | ||
IE | 29.04.2003 | ||
LU | 29.04.2003 | ||
MC | 30.04.2003 | ||
SE | 19.06.2003 | ||
PT | 20.06.2003 | ||
ES | 30.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/44] | AT | 19.03.2003 | |
BE | 19.03.2003 | ||
FI | 19.03.2003 | ||
GR | 19.03.2003 | ||
NL | 19.03.2003 | ||
CY | 29.04.2003 | ||
IE | 29.04.2003 | ||
LU | 29.04.2003 | ||
SE | 19.06.2003 | ||
PT | 20.06.2003 | ||
ES | 30.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 19.03.2003 | |
BE | 19.03.2003 | ||
FI | 19.03.2003 | ||
GR | 19.03.2003 | ||
NL | 19.03.2003 | ||
IE | 29.04.2003 | ||
LU | 29.04.2003 | ||
SE | 19.06.2003 | ||
PT | 20.06.2003 | ||
ES | 30.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/29] | AT | 19.03.2003 | |
BE | 19.03.2003 | ||
FI | 19.03.2003 | ||
GR | 19.03.2003 | ||
NL | 19.03.2003 | ||
IE | 29.04.2003 | ||
SE | 19.06.2003 | ||
PT | 20.06.2003 | ||
ES | 30.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/10] | AT | 19.03.2003 | |
BE | 19.03.2003 | ||
FI | 19.03.2003 | ||
GR | 19.03.2003 | ||
NL | 19.03.2003 | ||
SE | 19.06.2003 | ||
PT | 20.06.2003 | ||
ES | 30.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/04] | AT | 19.03.2003 | |
FI | 19.03.2003 | ||
GR | 19.03.2003 | ||
NL | 19.03.2003 | ||
SE | 19.06.2003 | ||
PT | 20.06.2003 | ||
ES | 30.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/01] | AT | 19.03.2003 | |
FI | 19.03.2003 | ||
GR | 19.03.2003 | ||
NL | 19.03.2003 | ||
SE | 19.06.2003 | ||
PT | 20.06.2003 | ||
Former [2003/50] | AT | 19.03.2003 | |
FI | 19.03.2003 | ||
GR | 19.03.2003 | ||
NL | 19.03.2003 | ||
SE | 19.06.2003 | ||
Former [2003/47] | AT | 19.03.2003 | |
FI | 19.03.2003 | ||
GR | 19.03.2003 | ||
NL | 19.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/46] | FI | 19.03.2003 | |
GR | 19.03.2003 | ||
NL | 19.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/41] | FI | 19.03.2003 | |
NL | 19.03.2003 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4198571 (SHEPPARD COLIN J R [GB]) [X] 20 * column 2, line 2 - line 20 * * column 3, line 23 - line 33 ** figures 1,4 *; | [DA]EP0836090 (EVOTEC BIOSYSTEMS GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1-21 * column 2, line 4 - line 10 * * column 2, line 41 - line 58 * * column 3, line 37 - column 4, line 33 * * column 9, line 38 - line 52 *; | [A]WO9823941 (MAX PLANCK GESELLSCHAFT [DE], et al) [A] 17 * page 10, line 34 - page 12, line 24 *; | [X]US5866911 (BAER STEPHEN C [US]) [X] 20 * column 3, line 48 - column 4, line 23 * * figures 1,2,4 *; | [DA] - QIAN H ET AL, "ON THE ANALYSIS OF HIGH ORDER MOMENTS OF FLUORESCENCE FLUCTUATIONS", BIOPHYSICAL JOURNAL, (19900201), vol. 57, ISSN 0006-3495, pages 375 - 380, XP000646996 [DA] 1 * page 375, column 2 - page 378, column 2 * |