Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP1175555
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
22.07.2005 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 07.09.2005 [2005/36] |
01.07.2005 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
01.04.2005 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
16.08.2004 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
09.08.2004 |
Deletion: Date of oral proceedings |
|
25.05.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.02.2004 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
28.01.2004 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
19.11.2003 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
04.07.2003 |
First examination report |
|
03.07.2003 |
New entry: Examination report or reply |
|
23.05.2003 |
Renewal fee |
|
02.07.2002 |
Change - extension states |
|
28.05.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
14.12.2001 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 30.01.2002 [2002/05] |
14.12.2001 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 30.01.2002 [2002/05] |
30.11.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.03.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.02.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.08.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.06.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|