Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU770681B | Global Dossier | 26.02.2004 | B2 | AU4584300 | 17.04.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | GB0001523 | 02.05.2000 | GB9926137 | 04.11.1999 | GB9909947 | 29.04.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1175555 | Global Dossier | 30.01.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0001523 | 02.05.2000 | GB9926137 | 04.11.1999 | GB9909947 | 29.04.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2349420 | 20.08.2003 | B | GB2349420 | 01.11.2000 | A | GB9926137D0 | 12.01.2000 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB9909947 | 29.04.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB9909947D0 | 30.06.1999 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB9909947 | 29.04.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6676466 | 13.01.2004 | B1 | Priority number | Date | GB0001523 | 02.05.2000 | GB9926137 | 04.11.1999 | GB9909947 | 29.04.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0120146 | Global Dossier | 22.03.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB9926137 | 04.11.1999 | GB9909947 | 29.04.1999 |