EP1175555 - A FAST POST-IMMERSION RESTART SYSTEM FOR A MARINE PROPULSION UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.07.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.09.2005 [2005/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EP Barrus Limited Launton Road Bicester Oxfordshire OX6 0UR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/05] | For all designated states EP Barrus Limited Launton Road Bicester, Oxfordshire OX6 0UR / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GLEN, Robert, D. EP Barrus Limited Launton Road Bicester Oxfordshire OX6 0UR / GB | [2002/05] | Representative(s) | Suckling, Andrew Michael, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 2nd Floor, Wytham Court 11 West Way Oxford OX2 0JB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/05] | Suckling, Andrew Michael, et al Marks & Clerk 4220 Nash Court Oxford Business Park South Oxford OX4 2RU / GB | Application number, filing date | 00927437.4 | 02.05.2000 | [2002/05] | WO2000GB01523 | Priority number, date | GB19990009947 | 29.04.1999 Original published format: GB 9909947 | GB19990026137 | 04.11.1999 Original published format: GB 9926137 | [2002/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0120146 | Date: | 22.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1175555 | Date: | 30.01.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.03.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F02B61/04 | [2002/05] | CPC: |
F02B61/045 (EP,US);
F02B2075/025 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/05] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHNELLSTARTSYSTEM FÜR EINE INS WASSER EINGETAUCHTE BOOTSMASCHINE | [2002/05] | English: | A FAST POST-IMMERSION RESTART SYSTEM FOR A MARINE PROPULSION UNIT | [2002/05] | French: | SYSTEME RAPIDE DE RELANCE D'UNE UNITE DE PROPULSION MARINE APRES IMMERSION | [2002/05] | Entry into regional phase | 27.11.2001 | National basic fee paid | 27.11.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.11.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.11.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/05] | 07.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.08.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/36] | 06.04.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2005/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2005 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]US3132635 (HEIDNER RICHARD C) [Y] 1 * figures 1-3 * * column 2, line 17 - column 3, line 75 * [A] 4,6-9,13,14,18-24; | [Y]US4676759 (MURASE MASAAKI [JP]) [Y] 1 * figures 1,5 * * column 2, line 4 - line 65 *; | [A]EP0773356 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,2,3,5,15-24 * figure 1 * * abstract * * claims 1-20 *; | [DA]EP0219278 (BARRUS E P LTD [GB]) [DA] 1 * figure 1 * * abstract *; | [A]US4461250 (MOHR JAMES W [US]) [A] 1-24 * figure 1 * * column A * * claims 1-22 * |