EP1179155 - PIPE FITTING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.12.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.12.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.01.2006 [2006/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HEPWORTH BUILDING PRODUCTS LIMITED Hazlehead Crow Edge Sheffield S36 4HG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/07] | For all designated states HEPWORTH BUILDING PRODUCTS LIMITED Hazlehead Crow Edge Sheffield S36 4HG / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEEVER, Andrew 1 Station Road Stocksmoor, Huddersfield HD4 6XN / GB | [2002/07] | Representative(s) | Mounteney, Simon James Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/07] | Mounteney, Simon James MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 00927578.5 | 15.05.2000 | [2002/07] | WO2000GB01846 | Priority number, date | GB19990011350 | 14.05.1999 Original published format: GB 9911350 | [2002/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0070258 | Date: | 23.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1179155 | Date: | 13.02.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.11.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1179155 | Date: | 02.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F16L21/08, F16L37/092 | [2002/07] | CPC: |
F16L21/08 (EP,KR);
F16L19/065 (EP);
F16L21/04 (EP);
F16L21/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/07] | Extension states | AL | 06.11.2001 | LT | 06.11.2001 | LV | 06.11.2001 | MK | 06.11.2001 | RO | 06.11.2001 | SI | 06.11.2001 | Title | German: | ROHRVERBINDUNG | [2002/07] | English: | PIPE FITTING | [2002/07] | French: | RACCORD DE TUYAUTERIE | [2002/07] | Entry into regional phase | 06.11.2001 | National basic fee paid | 06.11.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.11.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.12.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/07] | 18.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.11.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 12.11.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.11.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 02.02.2005 | [2005/46] | Cited in | International search | [XA]GB1464741 (LEGRIS FRANCE SA) [X] 1,2,7-11,27 * the whole document * [A] 3-6,14-25; | [X]EP0562999 (FORPLAST SA [ES]) [X] 1,7-13,27 * the whole document *; | [X]US5487572 (COMBOT-COURRAU YVES [FR], et al) [X] 1,7,27* abstract * |