EP1185373 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR THE MANIPULATION OF PARTICLES BY MEANS OF DIELECTROPHORESIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.06.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Silicon Biosystems S.R.L. Viale Ercolani, 3 40138 Bologna / IT | [2002/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEDORO, Gianni Via Lamalfa Ugo, 3 I-71049 Trinitapoli / IT | [2002/11] | Representative(s) | Cerbaro, Elena, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2002/11] | Cerbaro, Elena, Dr., et al STUDIO TORTA S.r.l., Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 00927623.9 | 13.05.2000 | [2002/11] | WO2000IB00641 | Priority number, date | IT1999BO00262 | 18.05.1999 Original published format: IT BO990262 | [2002/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0069565 | Date: | 23.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1185373 | Date: | 13.03.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.11.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1185373 | Date: | 11.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B03C5/02 | [2002/11] | CPC: |
B03C5/028 (EP,US);
B03C5/026 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/11] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND APPARAT FÜR BEHANDLUNG VON TEILCHEN DURCH DIELEKTROPHORESE | [2002/11] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR THE MANIPULATION OF PARTICLES BY MEANS OF DIELECTROPHORESIS | [2002/11] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE MANIPULATION DE PARTICULES PAR DIELECTROPHORESE | [2002/11] | Entry into regional phase | 13.12.2001 | National basic fee paid | 13.12.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.12.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.10.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.12.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.12.2001 | Examination requested [2002/11] | 31.07.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.03.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 13.05.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 13.05.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/31] | Request for further processing for: | 25.05.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 25.05.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.06.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 11.08.2004 | DK | 11.11.2004 | GR | 11.11.2004 | SE | 11.11.2004 | PT | 11.01.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2005/22] | FI | 11.08.2004 | |
DK | 11.11.2004 | ||
GR | 11.11.2004 | ||
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | FI | 11.08.2004 | |
GR | 11.11.2004 | ||
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 11.08.2004 | |
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/10] | SE | 11.11.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9108284 (NAT RES DEV [GB]) [A] 1,8,9* claims 1,3,5 *; | [A]WO9917883 (CALIFORNIA INST OF TECHN [US]) [A] 1,2,10,22,23,25 * claims 1,3-5,9,33,34 *; | [X] - FUHR G ET AL, "POSITIONING AND MANIPULATION OF CELLS AND MICROPARTICLES USING MINIATURIZED ELECTRIC FIELD TRAPS AND TRAVELLING WAVES", SENSORS AND MATERIALS,JP,SCIENTIFIC PUBLISHING DIVISION OF MYU, TOKYO, (1995), vol. 7, no. 2, ISSN 0914-4935, pages 131 - 146, XP000617993 [X] 1,2,10,12-15,21-23,25 * page 131 - page 134, paragraph 1; figure 4 * | [DX] - SCHNELLE T ET AL, "THREE-DIMENSIONAL ELECTRIC FIELD TRAPS FOR MANIPULATION OF CELLS - CALCULATION AND EXPERIMENTAL VERIFICATION", BBA - GENERAL SUBJECTS,NL,ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, (1993), vol. 1157, no. 2, ISSN 0304-4165, pages 127 - 140, XP000614981 [DX] 1,2,8,12,13,16,18,22,26 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0304-4165(93)90056-E | [A] - FIEDLER S ET AL, "ELECTROCASTING - FORMATION AND STRUCTURING OF SUSPENDED MICROBODIESUSING A.C. GENERATED FIELD CAGES", MICROSYSTEM TECHNOLOGIES,DE,BERLIN, (19951201), ISSN 0946-7076, pages 1 - 7, XP000199394 [A] 1,8,9 * figure 2 * |