EP1193476 - FLOW RATE MEASURING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.04.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.05.2011 [2011/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2002/14] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKEMURA, Koichi 1-28-306, Jonancho Yamatokoriyama-shi, Nara 639-1016 / JP | 02 /
NAGAOKA, Yukio 5-20-25, Saganakadai Kizucho Soraku-gun, Kyoto 619-0223 / JP | [2002/14] | Representative(s) | Balsters, Robert, et al Novagraaf International S.A. Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2010/03] | Balsters, Robert, et al Novagraaf International S.A. Avenue du Pailly 25 1220 Les Avanchets-Genève / CH | ||
Former [2002/14] | Balsters, Robert, et al Novagraaf SA 25, Avenue du Pailly 1220 Les Avanchets - Geneva / CH | Application number, filing date | 00927750.0 | 11.05.2000 | [2002/14] | WO2000JP03044 | Priority number, date | JP19990129599 | 11.05.1999 Original published format: JP 12959999 | [2002/14] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0068649 | Date: | 16.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1193476 | Date: | 03.04.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.11.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1193476 | Date: | 16.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.11.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G01F1/66, G01F1/68 | [2002/14] | CPC: |
G01F1/696 (EP,US);
G01F1/66 (KR);
G01F1/667 (EP,US);
G01F25/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/14] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DURCHFLUSSMESSVORRICHTUNG | [2002/14] | English: | FLOW RATE MEASURING DEVICE | [2002/14] | French: | DEBITMETRE | [2002/14] | Entry into regional phase | 20.11.2001 | Translation filed | 29.11.2001 | National basic fee paid | 29.11.2001 | Search fee paid | 29.11.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.11.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.12.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 20.11.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/14] | 13.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.04.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 19.04.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.06.2010 | BE | 16.06.2010 | CY | 16.06.2010 | DK | 16.06.2010 | FI | 16.06.2010 | NL | 16.06.2010 | SE | 16.06.2010 | GR | 17.09.2010 | PT | 18.10.2010 | [2011/19] |
Former [2011/14] | AT | 16.06.2010 | |
BE | 16.06.2010 | ||
CY | 16.06.2010 | ||
FI | 16.06.2010 | ||
NL | 16.06.2010 | ||
SE | 16.06.2010 | ||
GR | 17.09.2010 | ||
PT | 18.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | AT | 16.06.2010 | |
CY | 16.06.2010 | ||
FI | 16.06.2010 | ||
NL | 16.06.2010 | ||
SE | 16.06.2010 | ||
GR | 17.09.2010 | ||
PT | 18.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 16.06.2010 | |
CY | 16.06.2010 | ||
FI | 16.06.2010 | ||
NL | 16.06.2010 | ||
SE | 16.06.2010 | ||
GR | 17.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/05] | AT | 16.06.2010 | |
CY | 16.06.2010 | ||
FI | 16.06.2010 | ||
SE | 16.06.2010 | ||
GR | 17.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/01] | AT | 16.06.2010 | |
FI | 16.06.2010 | ||
SE | 16.06.2010 | ||
GR | 17.09.2010 | ||
Former [2010/50] | AT | 16.06.2010 | |
FI | 16.06.2010 | ||
SE | 16.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/49] | AT | 16.06.2010 | |
SE | 16.06.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4782697 (WILLIAMS RD ALBERT J [US]) [A] 1-14* column 9, line 14 - column 10, line 2; figure 9 * | International search | [A]JPH0921667 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | JPH09257539 [ ] (AICHI TOKEI DENKI KK); | [A]EP0806635 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) |