EP1198336 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A MULTIPLE CHANNEL DUCT ASSEMBLY FOR PARALLEL CABLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/17] | APPARATUS FOR PRODUCING MULTIPLE CHANNEL DUCT ASSEMBLY AND METHOD THEREOF | ||
[2004/30] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.12.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Byun, Moo-Won 102-1306 Hyundai Apt., 39/7, 413-1 Poongnap-dong Songpa-gu Seoul 138-040 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/17] | For all designated states Byun, Moo-Won 102-1306 Hyundai Apt., 39/7, 413-1 Poongnap-dong Songpa-gu, Seoul 138-040 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2002/17] | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schlossschmidstrasse 5 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/17] | Epping Hermann & Fischer Ridlerstrasse 55 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00927880.5 | 13.05.2000 | [2002/17] | WO2000KR00456 | Priority number, date | KR19990026147 | 30.06.1999 Original published format: KR 9926147 | KR19990047832 | 30.10.1999 Original published format: KR 9947832 | [2002/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0102155 | Date: | 11.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1198336 | Date: | 24.04.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.01.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1198336 | Date: | 09.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AT | 11.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B29C47/02, H01B13/24, B29D23/18, B29C39/18 | [2004/30] | CPC: |
H02G3/0406 (EP,US);
H02G9/06 (EP,KR,US);
B29C48/09 (EP,US);
B29C48/11 (EP,US);
B29C48/12 (EP,US);
B29C48/13 (EP,US);
B29C48/151 (EP,US);
B29C48/30 (EP,US);
B29C48/303 (EP,US);
B29C48/34 (EP,US);
G02B6/4459 (EP,US);
H02G3/0462 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2002/17] | B29C47/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/17] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES HÜLLROHRES FÜR MEHRERE PARALLELVERLAUFENDE KABEL | [2004/30] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A MULTIPLE CHANNEL DUCT ASSEMBLY FOR PARALLEL CABLES | [2004/30] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN TUBE DE GAINAGE POUR PLUSIEURS CABLES PARALLELES | [2004/30] |
Former [2002/17] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON MEHRLUMIGEN SCHUTZKANÄLEN | ||
Former [2002/17] | APPARATUS FOR PRODUCING MULTIPLE CHANNEL DUCT ASSEMBLY AND METHOD THEREOF | ||
Former [2002/17] | APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE REALISER UNE CONDUITE A CANAUX MULTIPLES ET PROCEDE CORRESPONDANT | Entry into regional phase | 27.12.2001 | National basic fee paid | 27.12.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.12.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.01.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AT | 27.12.2001 | Examination requested [2002/17] | 02.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 16.05.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 16.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.12.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 09.12.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.11.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/05] | Request for further processing for: | 16.07.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 16.07.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.07.2003 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.02.2005 | BE | 09.02.2005 | CH | 09.02.2005 | ES | 09.02.2005 | FI | 09.02.2005 | FR | 09.02.2005 | IT | 09.02.2005 | LI | 09.02.2005 | NL | 09.02.2005 | DK | 09.05.2005 | GR | 09.05.2005 | SE | 09.05.2005 | DE | 10.05.2005 | CY | 13.05.2005 | GB | 13.05.2005 | IE | 13.05.2005 | LU | 13.05.2005 | MC | 31.05.2005 | PT | 09.07.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/35] | AT | 09.02.2005 | |
BE | 09.02.2005 | ||
CH | 09.02.2005 | ||
ES | 09.02.2005 | ||
FI | 09.02.2005 | ||
FR | 09.02.2005 | ||
IT | 09.02.2005 | ||
LI | 09.02.2005 | ||
NL | 09.02.2005 | ||
DK | 09.05.2005 | ||
GR | 09.05.2005 | ||
SE | 09.05.2005 | ||
DE | 10.05.2005 | ||
CY | 13.05.2005 | ||
GB | 13.05.2005 | ||
IE | 13.05.2005 | ||
LU | 13.05.2005 | ||
MC | 31.05.2005 | ||
Former [2007/27] | AT | 09.02.2005 | |
BE | 09.02.2005 | ||
CH | 09.02.2005 | ||
ES | 09.02.2005 | ||
FI | 09.02.2005 | ||
FR | 09.02.2005 | ||
LI | 09.02.2005 | ||
NL | 09.02.2005 | ||
DK | 09.05.2005 | ||
GR | 09.05.2005 | ||
SE | 09.05.2005 | ||
DE | 10.05.2005 | ||
CY | 13.05.2005 | ||
GB | 13.05.2005 | ||
IE | 13.05.2005 | ||
LU | 13.05.2005 | ||
MC | 31.05.2005 | ||
Former [2007/26] | AT | 09.02.2005 | |
BE | 09.02.2005 | ||
CH | 09.02.2005 | ||
ES | 09.02.2005 | ||
FI | 09.02.2005 | ||
FR | 09.02.2005 | ||
LI | 09.02.2005 | ||
NL | 09.02.2005 | ||
DK | 09.05.2005 | ||
GR | 09.05.2005 | ||
SE | 09.05.2005 | ||
DE | 10.05.2005 | ||
CY | 13.05.2005 | ||
GB | 13.05.2005 | ||
IE | 13.05.2005 | ||
LU | 13.05.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | AT | 09.02.2005 | |
BE | 09.02.2005 | ||
CH | 09.02.2005 | ||
ES | 09.02.2005 | ||
FI | 09.02.2005 | ||
FR | 09.02.2005 | ||
LI | 09.02.2005 | ||
NL | 09.02.2005 | ||
DK | 09.05.2005 | ||
GR | 09.05.2005 | ||
SE | 09.05.2005 | ||
DE | 10.05.2005 | ||
CY | 13.05.2005 | ||
GB | 13.05.2005 | ||
IE | 13.05.2005 | ||
LU | 31.05.2005 | ||
Former [2007/08] | AT | 09.02.2005 | |
BE | 09.02.2005 | ||
CH | 09.02.2005 | ||
ES | 09.02.2005 | ||
FI | 09.02.2005 | ||
FR | 09.02.2005 | ||
LI | 09.02.2005 | ||
NL | 09.02.2005 | ||
DK | 09.05.2005 | ||
GR | 09.05.2005 | ||
SE | 09.05.2005 | ||
DE | 10.05.2005 | ||
GB | 13.05.2005 | ||
IE | 13.05.2005 | ||
LU | 31.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/35] | AT | 09.02.2005 | |
BE | 09.02.2005 | ||
CH | 09.02.2005 | ||
FI | 09.02.2005 | ||
FR | 09.02.2005 | ||
LI | 09.02.2005 | ||
NL | 09.02.2005 | ||
DK | 09.05.2005 | ||
GR | 09.05.2005 | ||
SE | 09.05.2005 | ||
DE | 10.05.2005 | ||
GB | 13.05.2005 | ||
IE | 13.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/31] | AT | 09.02.2005 | |
BE | 09.02.2005 | ||
CH | 09.02.2005 | ||
FI | 09.02.2005 | ||
FR | 09.02.2005 | ||
LI | 09.02.2005 | ||
NL | 09.02.2005 | ||
DK | 09.05.2005 | ||
GR | 09.05.2005 | ||
SE | 09.05.2005 | ||
DE | 10.05.2005 | ||
IE | 13.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/25] | AT | 09.02.2005 | |
BE | 09.02.2005 | ||
CH | 09.02.2005 | ||
FI | 09.02.2005 | ||
LI | 09.02.2005 | ||
NL | 09.02.2005 | ||
DK | 09.05.2005 | ||
GR | 09.05.2005 | ||
SE | 09.05.2005 | ||
DE | 10.05.2005 | ||
IE | 13.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/22] | AT | 09.02.2005 | |
BE | 09.02.2005 | ||
CH | 09.02.2005 | ||
FI | 09.02.2005 | ||
LI | 09.02.2005 | ||
NL | 09.02.2005 | ||
DK | 09.05.2005 | ||
GR | 09.05.2005 | ||
SE | 09.05.2005 | ||
DE | 10.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/18] | AT | 09.02.2005 | |
BE | 09.02.2005 | ||
CH | 09.02.2005 | ||
FI | 09.02.2005 | ||
LI | 09.02.2005 | ||
DK | 09.05.2005 | ||
GR | 09.05.2005 | ||
SE | 09.05.2005 | ||
DE | 10.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 09.02.2005 | |
BE | 09.02.2005 | ||
CH | 09.02.2005 | ||
FI | 09.02.2005 | ||
LI | 09.02.2005 | ||
DK | 09.05.2005 | ||
GR | 09.05.2005 | ||
SE | 09.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/12] | AT | 09.02.2005 | |
BE | 09.02.2005 | ||
CH | 09.02.2005 | ||
FI | 09.02.2005 | ||
LI | 09.02.2005 | ||
DK | 09.05.2005 | ||
SE | 09.05.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 09.02.2005 | |
BE | 09.02.2005 | ||
FI | 09.02.2005 | ||
SE | 09.05.2005 | ||
Former [2005/48] | FI | 09.02.2005 | |
SE | 09.05.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 09.02.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH0542585 ; | [A]JPS60247610 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 17, no. 336, Database accession no. (M - 1435), & JP05042585 A 19930223 (TOYO CHEM CO LTD) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 10, no. 119, Database accession no. (P - 453), & JP60247610 A 19851207 (SUMITOMO DENKI KOGYO K.K.) | Examination | DE1191550 | DE2731834 | DE3739007 |