EP1214671 - METHOD AND DATA PROCESS SYSTEM FOR ANALYSING AND TIMING BUY/SELL TIPS AS AN AID TO INVESTMENT DECISION MAKING ON A TRADEABLE ASSET OR SECURITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.04.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.06.2005 [2005/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jupiter International (Australia) Pty. Ltd. 14/51-55 City Road South Melbourne, VIC 3205 / AU | [2002/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAKAYA, Anil 44 Henry Street Doncaster, VIC 3108 / AU | 02 /
BAKAYA, Dhiraj, Dylan 1011 Eaton Drive McLean, VA 22102 / US | [2002/25] | Representative(s) | Andrae, Steffen, et al Andrae l Westendorp Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Balanstrasse 55 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/25] | Andrae, Steffen, Dr., et al Andrae Flach Haug Balanstrasse 55 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00929064.4 | 25.05.2000 | [2002/25] | WO2000AU00551 | Priority number, date | AU1999PQ00593 | 27.05.1999 Original published format: AU PQ059399 | [2002/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0073946 | Date: | 07.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1214671 | Date: | 19.06.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 07.12.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/60 | [2002/25] | CPC: |
G06Q30/08 (EP,US);
G06Q40/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/25] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND DATENVERARBEITUNGSSYSTEM ZUR ANALYSE UND ZEITBESTIMMUNG VON KAUF/VERKAUFRATSCHLÄGEN ALS EINE HILFE ZUR INVESTITIONSENTSCHEIDUNGSFINDUNG FÜR EINE HANDELBARE VERMÖGENSANLAGE ODER EIN HANDELBARES WERTPAPIER | [2002/25] | English: | METHOD AND DATA PROCESS SYSTEM FOR ANALYSING AND TIMING BUY/SELL TIPS AS AN AID TO INVESTMENT DECISION MAKING ON A TRADEABLE ASSET OR SECURITY | [2002/25] | French: | PROCEDE ET SYSTEME DE TRAITEMENT DE DONNEES DESTINES A ANALYSER ET A DETERMINER UN CALENDRIER DE CONSEILS D'ACHAT/VENTE COMME AIDE A LA DECISION D'INVESTIR SUR UN ACTIF OU UN TITRE NEGOCIABLE | [2002/25] | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2001 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.2001 | Search fee paid | 21.12.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.12.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 21.12.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.12.2001 | Examination requested [2002/25] | 10.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/24] | 12.01.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/24] | Request for further processing for: | 11.09.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 11.09.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.12.2003 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2004 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No Search | International search | [A]CA2084743 (MCINTOSH WILLIAM [CA]); | [A]US5761442 (BARR DEAN S [US], et al); | [AP]US6012042 (BLACK KEITH T [US], et al) |