EP1224524 - INTERFACE SURFACE PRINTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.06.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Silverbrook Research Pty Limited 393 Darling Street Balmain, NSW 2041 / AU | [N/P] |
Former [2002/30] | For all designated states Silverbrook Research Pty. Limited 393 Darling Street Balmain, NSW 2041 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SILVERBROOK, Kia Silverbrook Research Pty Ltd, 393 Darling Street Balmain, NSW 2041 / AU | 02 /
LAPSTUN, Paul 13 Duke Avenue Rodd Point, NSW 2046 / AU | [2002/30] | Representative(s) | Botti, Mario Botti & Ferrari S.p.A. Via Cappellini, 11 20124 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2002/30] | Botti, Mario Botti & Ferrari S.r.l. Via Locatelli, 5 20124 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 00929073.5 | 24.05.2000 | [2002/30] | WO2000AU00560 | Priority number, date | AU1999PQ00559 | 25.05.1999 Original published format: AU PQ055999 | AU1999PQ01313 | 30.06.1999 Original published format: AU PQ131399 | AU1999PQ03632 | 25.10.1999 Original published format: AU PQ363299 | [2002/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0072126 | Date: | 30.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1224524 | Date: | 24.07.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1224524 | Date: | 26.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 30.11.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/03, G06F3/033, B41F31/08, B41L27/10, B41J2/21, G06F3/12 | [2002/38] | CPC: |
B41J2/17556 (EP,US);
G06T1/00 (KR);
B41J13/103 (EP,US);
B41J13/106 (EP,US);
B41J2/16511 (EP,US);
B41J2/16585 (EP,US);
B41J2/17503 (EP,US);
B41J2/17513 (EP,US);
B41J2/17523 (EP,US);
B41J2/17546 (EP,US);
B41J2/17553 (EP,US);
B41J2/17563 (EP,US);
B41J2/2114 (EP,KR,US);
B42C19/02 (EP,US);
B42C9/0006 (EP,US);
B42C9/0081 (EP,US);
B65H29/34 (EP,US);
B65H37/04 (EP,US);
G06F3/0321 (EP,US);
G06F3/03545 (EP,US);
G06F3/04883 (EP,US);
G06K17/00 (EP,US);
G06Q10/10 (EP,US);
G06V30/1423 (EP,US);
H04N1/00204 (EP,US);
H04N1/00244 (EP,US);
H04N1/00326 (EP,US);
H04N1/00358 (EP,US);
H04N1/00376 (EP,US);
H04N1/00567 (EP,US);
H04N1/00968 (EP,US);
H04N1/23 (EP,US);
H04N1/32101 (EP,US);
H04N1/32122 (EP,US);
H04N1/32128 (EP,US);
H04N1/32133 (EP,US);
H04N1/32144 (EP,US);
H04N1/32771 (EP,US);
H04N1/32778 (EP,US);
B42P2261/04 (EP,US);
G06F2203/0337 (EP,US);
G06F3/1204 (EP,US);
G06F3/1265 (EP,US);
G06F3/1284 (EP,US);
H04N1/00127 (EP,US);
H04N2201/0082 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3201 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3205 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3207 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3226 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3242 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3243 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3247 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3249 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3269 (EP,US);
H04N2201/327 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3271 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2002/30] | G06F3/03, G06F3/033, B41F31/08, B41L27/10, B41J2/21 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/30] | Extension states | AL | 02.04.2002 | LT | 02.04.2002 | LV | 02.04.2002 | MK | 02.04.2002 | RO | 02.04.2002 | SI | 02.04.2002 | Title | German: | SCHNITTSTELLENOBERFLÄCHEN DRÜCKER | [2002/30] | English: | INTERFACE SURFACE PRINTER | [2002/30] | French: | IMPRIMANTE POUR IMPRIMER UNE INTERFACE SUR UNE SURFACE | [2002/30] | Entry into regional phase | 02.04.2002 | National basic fee paid | 02.04.2002 | Search fee paid | 02.04.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.04.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.12.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 02.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/30] | 18.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.2006 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 17.03.2006 | 24.01.2006 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 17.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.03.2006 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 02.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 02.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.04.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 20.03.2002 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   02.04.2002 | 20.03.2002 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   02.04.2002 | 20.03.2002 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   02.04.2002 | 20.03.2002 | CY   M01   Fee paid on   02.04.2002 | 20.03.2002 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   02.04.2002 | 20.03.2002 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   02.04.2002 | 20.03.2002 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   02.04.2002 | 20.03.2002 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   02.04.2002 | 20.03.2002 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   02.04.2002 | 20.03.2002 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   02.04.2002 | 20.03.2002 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   02.04.2002 | 20.03.2002 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   02.04.2002 | 20.03.2002 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   02.04.2002 | 20.03.2002 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   02.04.2002 | 20.03.2002 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   02.04.2002 | 20.03.2002 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   02.04.2002 | 20.03.2002 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   02.04.2002 | 20.03.2002 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   02.04.2002 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 20.03.2002 | M01   Fee paid on   02.04.2002 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2004 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   16.07.2004 | 31.05.2005 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   04.07.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.07.2006 | BE | 26.07.2006 | CH | 26.07.2006 | CY | 26.07.2006 | FI | 26.07.2006 | IT | 26.07.2006 | LI | 26.07.2006 | NL | 26.07.2006 | DK | 26.10.2006 | SE | 26.10.2006 | GR | 27.10.2006 | ES | 06.11.2006 | PT | 26.12.2006 | [2009/37] |
Former [2008/19] | AT | 26.07.2006 | |
BE | 26.07.2006 | ||
CH | 26.07.2006 | ||
FI | 26.07.2006 | ||
IT | 26.07.2006 | ||
LI | 26.07.2006 | ||
NL | 26.07.2006 | ||
DK | 26.10.2006 | ||
SE | 26.10.2006 | ||
GR | 27.10.2006 | ||
ES | 06.11.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/35] | AT | 26.07.2006 | |
BE | 26.07.2006 | ||
CH | 26.07.2006 | ||
FI | 26.07.2006 | ||
IT | 26.07.2006 | ||
LI | 26.07.2006 | ||
NL | 26.07.2006 | ||
DK | 26.10.2006 | ||
SE | 26.10.2006 | ||
ES | 06.11.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/28] | AT | 26.07.2006 | |
BE | 26.07.2006 | ||
CH | 26.07.2006 | ||
FI | 26.07.2006 | ||
LI | 26.07.2006 | ||
NL | 26.07.2006 | ||
DK | 26.10.2006 | ||
SE | 26.10.2006 | ||
ES | 06.11.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/23] | AT | 26.07.2006 | |
CH | 26.07.2006 | ||
FI | 26.07.2006 | ||
LI | 26.07.2006 | ||
NL | 26.07.2006 | ||
DK | 26.10.2006 | ||
SE | 26.10.2006 | ||
ES | 06.11.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | CH | 26.07.2006 | |
FI | 26.07.2006 | ||
LI | 26.07.2006 | ||
NL | 26.07.2006 | ||
DK | 26.10.2006 | ||
SE | 26.10.2006 | ||
ES | 06.11.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | CH | 26.07.2006 | |
FI | 26.07.2006 | ||
LI | 26.07.2006 | ||
NL | 26.07.2006 | ||
SE | 26.10.2006 | ||
ES | 06.11.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | CH | 26.07.2006 | |
FI | 26.07.2006 | ||
LI | 26.07.2006 | ||
SE | 26.10.2006 | ||
ES | 06.11.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/09] | CH | 26.07.2006 | |
FI | 26.07.2006 | ||
LI | 26.07.2006 | ||
SE | 26.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/08] | CH | 26.07.2006 | |
LI | 26.07.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2306669 (RICOH KK [JP]); | [A]US5661506 (LAZZOUNI MOHAMED [US], et al); | [A]US5852434 (SEKENDUR ORAL F [US]) | Examination | WO9950787 |