EP1301344 - INK JET PRINTHEAD HAVING A MOVING NOZZLE WITH AN EXTERNALLY ARRANGED ACTUATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.03.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Silverbrook Research Pty Limited 393 Darling Street Balmain, NSW 2041 / AU | [N/P] |
Former [2003/16] | For all designated states Silverbrook Research Pty. Limited 393 Darling Street Balmain, NSW 2041 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SILVERBROOK, Kia Silverbrook Research Pty Ltd 393 Darling Street Balmain, NSW 2041 / AU | [2003/16] | Representative(s) | McKeown, Yvonne Mary, et al MacLachlan & Donaldson 2B Clonskeagh Square Clonskeagh Road Dublin 14 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/16] | McKeown, Yvonne Mary, et al c/o MacLachlan & Donaldson, 47 Merrion Square Dublin 2 / IE | Application number, filing date | 00929090.9 | 24.05.2000 | [2003/16] | WO2000AU00578 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0189839 | Date: | 29.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1301344 | Date: | 16.04.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1301344 | Date: | 23.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 29.11.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/045, B41J2/135, B41J2/14, B81B5/00, B81B7/00 | [2003/16] | CPC: |
B41J2/14427 (EP,US);
B41J2/145 (EP,US);
B41J2/1628 (EP,US);
B41J2/1631 (EP,US);
B41J2/1639 (EP,US);
B41J2/1642 (EP,US);
B41J2/1645 (EP,US);
B41J2/1646 (EP,US);
B41J2/1648 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2003/16] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TINTENSTRAHLDRUCKKOPF MIT BEWEGENDER DÜSE UND EXTERNEM BETÄTIGER | [2003/16] | English: | INK JET PRINTHEAD HAVING A MOVING NOZZLE WITH AN EXTERNALLY ARRANGED ACTUATOR | [2003/16] | French: | TETE D'IMPRESSION A JET D'ENCRE COMPORTANT UNE BUSE MOBILE A ACTIONNEUR EXTERNE | [2003/16] | Entry into regional phase | 23.12.2002 | National basic fee paid | 23.12.2002 | Search fee paid | 23.12.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.12.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.06.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 23.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/16] | 30.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.04.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 03.04.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.02.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2004 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   01.07.2004 | 31.05.2005 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   04.07.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.05.2007 | BE | 23.05.2007 | CH | 23.05.2007 | CY | 23.05.2007 | DK | 23.05.2007 | FI | 23.05.2007 | IT | 23.05.2007 | LI | 23.05.2007 | LU | 24.05.2007 | MC | 31.05.2007 | SE | 23.08.2007 | GR | 24.08.2007 | ES | 03.09.2007 | PT | 23.10.2007 | [2009/37] |
Former [2009/33] | AT | 23.05.2007 | |
BE | 23.05.2007 | ||
CH | 23.05.2007 | ||
CY | 23.05.2007 | ||
DK | 23.05.2007 | ||
FI | 23.05.2007 | ||
IT | 23.05.2007 | ||
LI | 23.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
SE | 23.08.2007 | ||
GR | 24.08.2007 | ||
ES | 03.09.2007 | ||
PT | 23.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/23] | AT | 23.05.2007 | |
BE | 23.05.2007 | ||
CH | 23.05.2007 | ||
DK | 23.05.2007 | ||
FI | 23.05.2007 | ||
IT | 23.05.2007 | ||
LI | 23.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
SE | 23.08.2007 | ||
GR | 24.08.2007 | ||
ES | 03.09.2007 | ||
PT | 23.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 23.05.2007 | |
BE | 23.05.2007 | ||
CH | 23.05.2007 | ||
DK | 23.05.2007 | ||
FI | 23.05.2007 | ||
LI | 23.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
SE | 23.08.2007 | ||
GR | 24.08.2007 | ||
ES | 03.09.2007 | ||
PT | 23.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | AT | 23.05.2007 | |
BE | 23.05.2007 | ||
CH | 23.05.2007 | ||
DK | 23.05.2007 | ||
FI | 23.05.2007 | ||
LI | 23.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
SE | 23.08.2007 | ||
ES | 03.09.2007 | ||
PT | 23.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | AT | 23.05.2007 | |
BE | 23.05.2007 | ||
CH | 23.05.2007 | ||
DK | 23.05.2007 | ||
FI | 23.05.2007 | ||
LI | 23.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
SE | 23.08.2007 | ||
ES | 03.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | AT | 23.05.2007 | |
BE | 23.05.2007 | ||
CH | 23.05.2007 | ||
DK | 23.05.2007 | ||
FI | 23.05.2007 | ||
LI | 23.05.2007 | ||
SE | 23.08.2007 | ||
ES | 03.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 23.05.2007 | |
BE | 23.05.2007 | ||
CH | 23.05.2007 | ||
FI | 23.05.2007 | ||
LI | 23.05.2007 | ||
SE | 23.08.2007 | ||
ES | 03.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 23.05.2007 | |
CH | 23.05.2007 | ||
FI | 23.05.2007 | ||
LI | 23.05.2007 | ||
SE | 23.08.2007 | ||
ES | 03.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | CH | 23.05.2007 | |
FI | 23.05.2007 | ||
LI | 23.05.2007 | ||
SE | 23.08.2007 | ||
ES | 03.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | ES | 03.09.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0416540 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [A] 1-13* column 7, line 4 - column 8, line 34; figures 11-14 *; | [XA]US5828394 (KHURI-YAKUB BUTRUS THOMAS [US], et al) [X] 1,10 * column 2, line 46 - column 3, line 54; figures 1-7 * [A] 2-9,11-13 | International search | [Y]JPH11348311 ; | [Y]JPH0867005 ; | [Y]EP0738600 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]); | [Y]WO9818633 (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al); | [Y]WO9903680 (SILVERBROOK RESEARCH PTY LIMIT [AU], et al); | [Y]WO9903681 (SILVERBROOK RES PTY LTD [AU], et al); | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 2000-110769/10, XP001052784 & JPH11348311 A 19991221 (HITACHI KOKI KK) | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 1996-196002/20, XP001052785 & JPH0867005 A 19960312 (FUJITSU LTD) |