07.08.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] |
10.07.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.08.2009 [2009/33] |
02.05.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.06.2008 [2008/23] |
04.04.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.05.2008 [2008/19] |
28.03.2008 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 30.04.2008 [2008/18] |
01.02.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.03.2008 [2008/10] |
25.01.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.02.2008 [2008/09] |
18.01.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.02.2008 [2008/08] |
21.12.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.01.2008 [2008/04] |
09.11.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.12.2007 [2007/50] |
26.10.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.11.2007 [2007/48] |
19.10.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.11.2007 [2007/47] |
20.04.2007 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 23.05.2007 [2007/21] |
14.04.2007 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
14.04.2007 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
30.01.2007 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
10.06.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.06.2006 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
26.01.2006 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
13.07.2005 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
13.07.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.07.2005 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
01.10.2004 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 17.11.2004 [2004/47] |
14.07.2004 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
14.07.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.06.2004 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
25.07.2003 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
25.07.2003 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
12.06.2003 |
Renewal fee |
|
28.02.2003 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 16.04.2003 [2003/16] |
28.02.2003 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 16.04.2003 [2003/16] |
20.02.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.01.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.01.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.01.2003 |
Renewal fee |
|
21.02.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.11.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.06.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|