Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0189839 | Global Dossier | 29.11.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US57514100 | 23.05.2000 | AU0000578 | 24.05.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8104874 | Global Dossier | 31.01.2012 | B2 | US2010289855 | 18.11.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US59934106 | 15.11.2006 | US4382008 | 06.03.2008 | US84682510 | 30.07.2010 | AU0000578 | 24.05.2000 | US29643402 | 23.11.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7766459 | Global Dossier | 03.08.2010 | B2 | US2008151002 | 26.06.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US59934106 | 15.11.2006 | US4382008 | 06.03.2008 | AU0000578 | 24.05.2000 | US29643402 | 23.11.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7357485 | Global Dossier | 15.04.2008 | B2 | US2007057994 | 15.03.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US59934106 | 15.11.2006 | AU0000578 | 24.05.2000 | US29643402 | 23.11.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4380961B | Global Dossier | 09.12.2009 | B2 | JP2003534167 | 18.11.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | AU0000578 | 24.05.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU4731300 | Global Dossier | 03.12.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US57514100 | 23.05.2000 | AU0000578 | 24.05.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2005200189B | Global Dossier | 16.02.2006 | B2 | AU2005200189 | 03.02.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AU2000247313 | 24.05.2000 | AU2005200189 | 18.01.2005 | AU0000578 | 24.05.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2000247313B | Global Dossier | 21.10.2004 | B2 | Priority number | Date | AU0000578 | 24.05.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1301344 | Global Dossier | 23.05.2007 | B1 | EP1301344 | 17.11.2004 | A4 | EP1301344 | 16.04.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AU0000578 | 24.05.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE362847T | 15.06.2007 | T1 | Priority number | Date | AU0000578 | 24.05.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1205035C | 08.06.2005 | C | CN1452553 | 29.10.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | AU0000578 | 24.05.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60034967T | 28.02.2008 | T2 | DE60034967D1 | 05.07.2007 | D1 | Priority number | Date | AU0000578 | 24.05.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL153028 | 19.06.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | AU0000578 | 24.05.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL166919 | 15.06.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | AU0000578 | 24.05.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6428133 | 06.08.2002 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US57514100 | 23.05.2000 | AU0000578 | 24.05.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7152962 | 26.12.2006 | B1 | Priority number | Date | AU0000578 | 24.05.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA200209790 | 30.07.2003 | B | Priority number | Date | AU0000578 | 24.05.2000 |