EP1301347 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR COMPENSATION FOR TIME VARYING NOZZLE MISALIGNMENT IN A DROP ON DEMAND PRINTHEAD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.05.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 12.08.2009 [2009/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Silverbrook Research Pty Limited 393 Darling Street Balmain, NSW 2041 / AU | [N/P] |
Former [2003/16] | For all designated states Silverbrook Research Pty. Limited 393 Darling Street Balmain, NSW 2041 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SILVERBROOK, Kia Silverbrook Research Pty Ltd 393 Darling Street Balmain, New South Wales 2041 / AU | 02 /
LAPSTUN, Paul 13 Duke Avenue Rodd Point NSW 2046 / AU | [2004/13] |
Former [2003/16] | 01 /
SILVERBROOK, Kia Silverbrook Research Pty Ltd 393 Darling Street Balmain, New South Wales 2041 / AU | ||
02 /
LAPSTON, Paul 13 Duke Avenue Rodd Point NSW 2046 / AU | Representative(s) | McKeown, Yvonne Mary, et al MacLachlan & Donaldson 2B Clonskeagh Square Clonskeagh Road Dublin 14 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/16] | McKeown, Yvonne Mary, et al c/o MacLachlan & Donaldson, 47 Merrion Square Dublin 2 / IE | Application number, filing date | 00929105.5 | 24.05.2000 | [2003/16] | WO2000AU00593 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0189845 | Date: | 29.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1301347 | Date: | 16.04.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1301347 | Date: | 25.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 29.11.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/05, B41J2/145, B41J2/505 | [2005/48] | CPC: |
B41J2/04586 (EP,US);
B41J2/04505 (EP,US);
B41J2/04563 (EP,US);
B41J2/0459 (EP,US);
B41J2/155 (EP,US);
B41J2/2135 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2003/22] | B41J2/05 | ||
Former IPC [2003/16] | B41J2/145 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2003/16] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR KOMPENSATION VON IN DER ZEIT VARIIERENDEN AUSRICHTEFEHLERN DER DÜSEN IN EINEM DRUCKKOPF MIT GESTEUERTER TROPFENERZEUGUNG | [2003/16] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR COMPENSATION FOR TIME VARYING NOZZLE MISALIGNMENT IN A DROP ON DEMAND PRINTHEAD | [2003/16] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE COMPENSER LE DESALIGNEMENT DES BUSES, VARIANT DANS LE TEMPS, DANS UNE TETE D'IMPRESSION A JET D'ENCRE CONTROLE | [2003/16] | Entry into regional phase | 23.12.2002 | National basic fee paid | 23.12.2002 | Search fee paid | 23.12.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.12.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.06.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 23.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/16] | 03.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 07.06.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.04.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2004 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   01.07.2004 | 31.05.2005 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   04.07.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.07.2007 | BE | 25.07.2007 | CH | 25.07.2007 | CY | 25.07.2007 | DK | 25.07.2007 | FI | 25.07.2007 | LI | 25.07.2007 | NL | 25.07.2007 | SE | 25.10.2007 | GR | 26.10.2007 | ES | 05.11.2007 | PT | 26.12.2007 | [2009/33] |
Former [2008/28] | AT | 25.07.2007 | |
BE | 25.07.2007 | ||
CH | 25.07.2007 | ||
DK | 25.07.2007 | ||
FI | 25.07.2007 | ||
LI | 25.07.2007 | ||
NL | 25.07.2007 | ||
SE | 25.10.2007 | ||
GR | 26.10.2007 | ||
ES | 05.11.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/23] | AT | 25.07.2007 | |
BE | 25.07.2007 | ||
CH | 25.07.2007 | ||
DK | 25.07.2007 | ||
FI | 25.07.2007 | ||
LI | 25.07.2007 | ||
NL | 25.07.2007 | ||
GR | 26.10.2007 | ||
ES | 05.11.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 25.07.2007 | |
BE | 25.07.2007 | ||
CH | 25.07.2007 | ||
FI | 25.07.2007 | ||
LI | 25.07.2007 | ||
NL | 25.07.2007 | ||
GR | 26.10.2007 | ||
ES | 05.11.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/13] | AT | 25.07.2007 | |
CH | 25.07.2007 | ||
FI | 25.07.2007 | ||
LI | 25.07.2007 | ||
NL | 25.07.2007 | ||
ES | 05.11.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | FI | 25.07.2007 | |
NL | 25.07.2007 | ||
ES | 05.11.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | NL | 25.07.2007 | |
ES | 05.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | ES | 05.11.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]EP0034060 (MEAD CORP [US]); | [A]EP0677388 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]); | [A]EP0709213 (CANON KK [JP]); | [A]EP0914950 (XEROX CORP [US]); | [A]EP0960737 (TOSHIBA TEC KK [JP]) |