EP1185764 - DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING AIR FLOW IN A TURBINE BLADE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.09.2006 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 29.08.2007 [2007/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PRATT & WHITNEY CANADA CORP. Jeffrey W. Astle, Legal Services (01BE5), 1000 Marie Victorin Longueuil Quebec J4G 1A1 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2005/45] | For all designated states PRATT & WHITNEY CANADA CORP. Jeffrey W. Astle, Legal Services (01BE5), 1000 Marie Victorin Longueuil Quebec J4G 1A1 / CA | ||
Former [2002/11] | For all designated states Pratt & Whitney Canada Corp. Jeffrey W. Astle, Legal Services (01BE5), 1000 Marie Victorin Longueuil, Quebec J4G 1A1 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEVREFILS, Andre 573 D'Youville Chateauguay, Québec J6J 5W6 / CA | 02 /
GRIGORE, Daniel, G. 120 Stockwell Pointe Claire, Québec H9R 5W8 / CA | [2002/11] | Representative(s) | Leckey, David Herbert, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/11] | Leckey, David Herbert, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 00929179.0 | 18.05.2000 | [2002/11] | WO2000CA00572 | Priority number, date | US19990314292 | 19.05.1999 Original published format: US 314292 | [2002/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0071855 | Date: | 30.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1185764 | Date: | 13.03.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1185764 | Date: | 09.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/18 | [2002/11] | CPC: |
F01D5/3007 (EP,US);
F01D5/082 (EP,US);
F05D2240/12 (EP,US);
F05D2240/126 (EP,US);
F05D2250/75 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2004/20] |
Former [2002/11] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR REGELUNG DER LUFTSTRÖMUNG IN EINER TURBINENSCHAUFEL | [2002/11] | English: | DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING AIR FLOW IN A TURBINE BLADE | [2002/11] | French: | DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE COMMANDER LE FLUX D'AIR DANS UNE AUBE DE TURBINE | [2002/11] | Entry into regional phase | 11.12.2001 | National basic fee paid | 11.12.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.12.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.12.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.12.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.12.2001 | Examination requested [2002/11] | 05.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.12.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 24.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.05.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.09.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 13.09.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/42] | Request for further processing for: | 23.02.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 23.02.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.03.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 09.11.2005 | SE | 09.02.2006 | [2007/35] |
Former [2006/27] | SE | 09.02.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0661414 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1,5,6,7; | [A]US4626169 (HSING FREDERICK F [US], et al) [A] 1,5,6,7; | [A]US3706508 (MOSKOWITZ SEYMOUR, et al) [A] 1,5,6,7; | [A]DE3306894 (MTU MUENCHEN GMBH [DE]); | [A]GB2051254 (GEN ELECTRIC); | [A]DE3131405 (KRAFTWERK UNION AG [DE]) |