EP1166336 - DEVICE FOR MANUFACTURING SEMICONDUCTOR PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.04.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.04.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.05.2007 [2007/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG St.-Martin-Strasse 53 81669 München / DE | [2006/22] |
Former [2002/01] | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG St.-Martin-Strasse 53 81669 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEINEMANN, Bernhard Ostpreussenstrasse 6 D-85521 Ottobrunn / DE | [2002/01] | Representative(s) | Kottmann, Heinz Dieter, et al Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Strasse 58 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/01] | Kottmann, Heinz Dieter, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte MÜLLER & HOFFMANN, Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00929256.6 | 24.03.2000 | [2002/01] | WO2000DE00941 | Priority number, date | DE1999113886 | 26.03.1999 Original published format: DE 19913886 | [2002/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0059002 | Date: | 05.10.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/40] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1166336 | Date: | 02.01.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.10.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1166336 | Date: | 31.05.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/00, F24F3/16 | [2002/01] | CPC: |
F24F3/167 (EP,US);
H01L21/02 (KR);
H01L21/67017 (EP,US);
H01L21/67178 (EP,US);
H01L21/67276 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IE, NL [2004/20] |
Former [2002/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | ANLAGE ZUR FERTIGUNG VON HALBLEITERPRODUKTEN | [2002/01] | English: | DEVICE FOR MANUFACTURING SEMICONDUCTOR PRODUCTS | [2002/01] | French: | INSTALLATION POUR FABRIQUER DES PRODUITS SEMICONDUCTEURS | [2002/01] | Entry into regional phase | 06.09.2001 | National basic fee paid | 06.09.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.09.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.09.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.09.2001 | Examination requested [2002/01] | 21.11.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 20.03.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH1174193 ; | [A]EP0450142 (NMB SEMICONDUCTOR KK [JP]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]US5259812 (KLEINSEK DON A [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990630), vol. 1999, no. 08, & JP11074193 A 19990316 (TOKYO ELECTRON LTD) [X] 1,3,5-8,11-15 * abstract * |