EP1183153 - IMPRESSION CYLINDER COMPRISING INDEXING MEANS FOR MOUNTING A PRINTING SLEEVE ON THE SUPPORT CYLINDER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.10.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.01.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 24.02.2016 [2016/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Polyfibron Technologies S.A. Rue de l'Industrie 68700 Cernay / FR | [2002/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRANCILLE, Jean Jolysable F-17800 Pons / FR | [2002/10] | Representative(s) | Berger, Helmut Cabinet Weinstein 176 avenue Charles de Gaulle 92200 Neuilly sur Seine / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/10] | Berger, Helmut Cabinet WEINSTEIN 56 A, rue du Faubourg Saint-Honoré 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 00929644.3 | 19.05.2000 | [2002/10] | WO2000FR01374 | Priority number, date | FR19990006413 | 20.05.1999 Original published format: FR 9906413 | [2002/10] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0071344 | Date: | 30.11.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1183153 | Date: | 06.03.2002 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1183153 | Date: | 11.12.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B41F13/12, B41N1/16 | [2002/10] | CPC: |
B41F13/12 (EP,US);
B41P2227/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/10] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DRUCKMASCHINENZYLINDER MIT INDEXIERUNGSMITTELN ZUM ANBRINGEN EINER DRUCKHÜLSE AN DEM TRÄGERZYLINDER | [2002/10] | English: | IMPRESSION CYLINDER COMPRISING INDEXING MEANS FOR MOUNTING A PRINTING SLEEVE ON THE SUPPORT CYLINDER | [2002/10] | French: | CYLINDRE D'IMPRESSION COMPRENANT DES MOYENS D'INDEXAGE POUR LE MONTAGE D'UN MANCHON D'IMPRESSION SUR LE CYLINDRE SUPPORT | [2002/10] | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.2001 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.12.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.12.2001 | Examination requested [2002/10] | 10.04.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.06.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.09.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 23.09.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.09.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.12.2002 | FI | 11.12.2002 | GB | 11.12.2002 | GR | 11.12.2002 | IE | 11.12.2002 | NL | 11.12.2002 | DK | 11.03.2003 | PT | 11.03.2003 | SE | 11.03.2003 | CY | 19.05.2003 | LU | 19.05.2003 | BE | 31.05.2003 | MC | 31.05.2003 | ES | 27.06.2003 | [2016/08] |
Former [2005/02] | AT | 11.12.2002 | |
FI | 11.12.2002 | ||
GB | 11.12.2002 | ||
GR | 11.12.2002 | ||
IE | 11.12.2002 | ||
NL | 11.12.2002 | ||
DK | 11.03.2003 | ||
PT | 11.03.2003 | ||
SE | 11.03.2003 | ||
CY | 19.05.2003 | ||
LU | 19.05.2003 | ||
BE | 31.05.2003 | ||
MC | 31.05.2003 | ||
ES | 27.06.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 11.12.2002 | |
FI | 11.12.2002 | ||
GB | 11.12.2002 | ||
GR | 11.12.2002 | ||
IE | 11.12.2002 | ||
NL | 11.12.2002 | ||
DK | 11.03.2003 | ||
PT | 11.03.2003 | ||
SE | 11.03.2003 | ||
CY | 19.05.2003 | ||
LU | 19.05.2003 | ||
BE | 31.05.2003 | ||
ES | 27.06.2003 | ||
Former [2004/36] | AT | 11.12.2002 | |
FI | 11.12.2002 | ||
GB | 11.12.2002 | ||
GR | 11.12.2002 | ||
IE | 11.12.2002 | ||
NL | 11.12.2002 | ||
DK | 11.03.2003 | ||
PT | 11.03.2003 | ||
SE | 11.03.2003 | ||
CY | 19.05.2003 | ||
BE | 31.05.2003 | ||
ES | 27.06.2003 | ||
Former [2004/28] | AT | 11.12.2002 | |
FI | 11.12.2002 | ||
GB | 11.12.2002 | ||
GR | 11.12.2002 | ||
IE | 11.12.2002 | ||
NL | 11.12.2002 | ||
DK | 11.03.2003 | ||
PT | 11.03.2003 | ||
SE | 11.03.2003 | ||
BE | 31.05.2003 | ||
ES | 27.06.2003 | ||
Former [2004/22] | AT | 11.12.2002 | |
FI | 11.12.2002 | ||
GB | 11.12.2002 | ||
GR | 11.12.2002 | ||
IE | 11.12.2002 | ||
NL | 11.12.2002 | ||
DK | 11.03.2003 | ||
PT | 11.03.2003 | ||
SE | 11.03.2003 | ||
ES | 27.06.2003 | ||
Former [2004/04] | AT | 11.12.2002 | |
FI | 11.12.2002 | ||
GR | 11.12.2002 | ||
IE | 11.12.2002 | ||
NL | 11.12.2002 | ||
DK | 11.03.2003 | ||
PT | 11.03.2003 | ||
SE | 11.03.2003 | ||
ES | 27.06.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | AT | 11.12.2002 | |
FI | 11.12.2002 | ||
GR | 11.12.2002 | ||
IE | 11.12.2002 | ||
NL | 11.12.2002 | ||
DK | 11.03.2003 | ||
PT | 11.03.2003 | ||
SE | 11.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/43] | AT | 11.12.2002 | |
FI | 11.12.2002 | ||
GR | 11.12.2002 | ||
IE | 11.12.2002 | ||
NL | 11.12.2002 | ||
PT | 11.03.2003 | ||
SE | 11.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/42] | AT | 11.12.2002 | |
GR | 11.12.2002 | ||
IE | 11.12.2002 | ||
NL | 11.12.2002 | ||
PT | 11.03.2003 | ||
SE | 11.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/37] | AT | 11.12.2002 | |
GR | 11.12.2002 | ||
NL | 11.12.2002 | ||
PT | 11.03.2003 | ||
SE | 11.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/31] | GR | 11.12.2002 | |
NL | 11.12.2002 | ||
PT | 11.03.2003 | ||
SE | 11.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/30] | NL | 11.12.2002 | |
PT | 11.03.2003 | ||
SE | 11.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/29] | PT | 11.03.2003 | |
SE | 11.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/27] | SE | 11.03.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3858287 (CHRISTOFFERSEN ALBERT B); | [A]US5062193 (THOMPSON WILLIAM L [US]); | [AD]EP0510744 (MILLER GRAPHICS AKTIEBOLAG [SE]); | [A]US5215013 (VROTACOE JAMES B [US], et al); | [A]US5513568 (HOFFMAN EDUARD [DE], et al); | [A]US5515781 (SONGER RICHARD F [US]) |