EP1195151 - MOVABLE FINGER FOR PROSTHESES AND UPPER EXTREMITY PROSTHESES USING THIS MOVABLE FINGER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/15] | MOVABLE FINGER FOR PROSTHESES, UPPER EXTREMITY PROSTHESES USING THIS MOVABLE FINGER, AND MOVABLE FINGER CONTROLLER | ||
[2005/10] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.08.2006 Database last updated on 09.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Harada Electronics Co., Ltd 2-1, Ohdori-nishi 15-chome, Chou-ku Sapporo-shi Hokkaido 060-0042 / JP | For all designated states National Institute of Advanced Industrial Science and Technology 3-1, Kasumigaseki 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8921 / JP | For all designated states Higuchi, Tetsuya National Institute of Advanced Industrial Science and Technology Central 2, 1-1, Umezono 1-chome Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-8568 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/41] | For all designated states Harada Electronics Co., Ltd 2-1, Ohdori-nishi 15-chome, Chou-ku Sapporo-shi Hokkaido 060-0042 / JP | ||
For all designated states National Institute of Advanced Industrial Science and Technology 3-1, Kasumigaseki 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8921 / JP | |||
For all designated states Higuchi, Tetsuya National Institute of Advanced Industrial Science and Technology Central 2, 1-1, Umezono 1-chome Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-8568 / JP | |||
Former [2002/15] | For all designated states Harada Electronics Co., Ltd 2-1, Ohdori-nishi 15-chome, Chou-ku Sapporo-shi, Hokkaido 060-0042 / JP | ||
For all designated states National Institute of Advanced Industrial Science and Technology 3-1, Kasumigaseki 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8921 / JP | |||
For all designated states Higuchi, Tetsuya National Institute of Advanced industrial Science and Technology Central 2, 1-1, Umezono 1-chome Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-8568 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIGUCHI, Tetsuya, Electrotechnical Laboratory Agency of Ind. Sci.& Techn., 1-4, Umezono 1-chome Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-85 / JP | 02 /
HARADA, Masahide, Harada Electronics Co., Ltd 2-1, Ohdori-nishi 15-chome, Chuo-ku Sapporo-shi, Hokkaido 060-0042 / JP | [2002/15] | Representative(s) | Lamb, Martin John Carstairs Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/15] | Lamb, Martin John Carstairs MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 00929803.5 | 19.05.2000 | [2002/15] | WO2000JP03219 | Priority number, date | JP19990139150 | 19.05.1999 Original published format: JP 13915099 | [2002/15] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0071060 | Date: | 30.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1195151 | Date: | 10.04.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1195151 | Date: | 12.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.11.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/56, A61F2/72, A61F2/58, B25J15/00, A61F2/42, A61F2/68 | [2002/38] | CPC: |
B25J15/0009 (EP,US);
A61F2/583 (EP,US);
A61F2/586 (EP,US);
A61F2/70 (EP,US);
A61F2/72 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30322 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30523 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30525 (EP,US);
A61F2002/5072 (EP,US);
A61F2002/701 (EP,US);
A61F2002/704 (EP,US);
A61F2220/0025 (EP,US);
A61F2250/0026 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2002/15] | A61F2/56, A61F2/72 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/15] | Title | German: | BEWEGLICHER FINGER FÜR EINE PROTHESE UND FINGER FÜR EINE PROTHESE DER OBEREN EXTREMITÄT | [2005/10] | English: | MOVABLE FINGER FOR PROSTHESES AND UPPER EXTREMITY PROSTHESES USING THIS MOVABLE FINGER | [2005/10] | French: | DOIGT MOBILE POUR PROTHESES ET PROTHESES DE MEMBRE SUPERIEUR DANS LAQUELLE LEDIT DOIGT MOBILE EST UTILISE | [2005/10] |
Former [2002/15] | BEWEGLICHER FINGER FÜR EINE PROTHESE, FINGER FÜR EINE PROTHESE DER OBEREN EXTREMITÄT UND REGLER FÜR EINEN BEWEGBAREN FINGER | ||
Former [2002/15] | MOVABLE FINGER FOR PROSTHESES, UPPER EXTREMITY PROSTHESES USING THIS MOVABLE FINGER, AND MOVABLE FINGER CONTROLLER | ||
Former [2002/15] | DOIGT MOBILE POUR PROTHESES, PROTHESES DE MEMBRE SUPERIEUR DANS LAQUELLE LEDIT DOIGT MOBILE EST UTILISE ET ORGANE DE COMMANDE DU DOIGT MOBILE | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.2001 | Translation filed | 14.12.2001 | National basic fee paid | 14.12.2001 | Search fee paid | 14.12.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.12.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.11.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 14.12.2001 | Examination requested [2002/15] | 22.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.08.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 05.08.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.07.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.10.2005 | BE | 12.10.2005 | CY | 12.10.2005 | FI | 12.10.2005 | NL | 12.10.2005 | DK | 12.01.2006 | GR | 12.01.2006 | ES | 23.01.2006 | PT | 13.03.2006 | GB | 19.05.2006 | IE | 19.05.2006 | LU | 19.05.2006 | MC | 31.05.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/36] | AT | 12.10.2005 | |
BE | 12.10.2005 | ||
FI | 12.10.2005 | ||
NL | 12.10.2005 | ||
DK | 12.01.2006 | ||
GR | 12.01.2006 | ||
ES | 23.01.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2006 | ||
GB | 19.05.2006 | ||
IE | 19.05.2006 | ||
LU | 19.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/45] | AT | 12.10.2005 | |
BE | 12.10.2005 | ||
FI | 12.10.2005 | ||
NL | 12.10.2005 | ||
DK | 12.01.2006 | ||
GR | 12.01.2006 | ||
ES | 23.01.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2006 | ||
GB | 19.05.2006 | ||
IE | 19.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/35] | AT | 12.10.2005 | |
BE | 12.10.2005 | ||
FI | 12.10.2005 | ||
IT | 12.10.2005 | ||
NL | 12.10.2005 | ||
DK | 12.01.2006 | ||
GR | 12.01.2006 | ||
ES | 23.01.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2006 | ||
GB | 19.05.2006 | ||
IE | 19.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/28] | AT | 12.10.2005 | |
BE | 12.10.2005 | ||
FI | 12.10.2005 | ||
NL | 12.10.2005 | ||
DK | 12.01.2006 | ||
GR | 12.01.2006 | ||
ES | 23.01.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2006 | ||
GB | 19.05.2006 | ||
IE | 19.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/25] | AT | 12.10.2005 | |
BE | 12.10.2005 | ||
FI | 12.10.2005 | ||
NL | 12.10.2005 | ||
DK | 12.01.2006 | ||
GR | 12.01.2006 | ||
ES | 23.01.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2006 | ||
IE | 19.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/07] | AT | 12.10.2005 | |
BE | 12.10.2005 | ||
FI | 12.10.2005 | ||
NL | 12.10.2005 | ||
DK | 12.01.2006 | ||
GR | 12.01.2006 | ||
ES | 23.01.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | AT | 12.10.2005 | |
BE | 12.10.2005 | ||
FI | 12.10.2005 | ||
NL | 12.10.2005 | ||
DK | 12.01.2006 | ||
GR | 12.01.2006 | ||
ES | 23.01.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | AT | 12.10.2005 | |
BE | 12.10.2005 | ||
FI | 12.10.2005 | ||
NL | 12.10.2005 | ||
DK | 12.01.2006 | ||
ES | 23.01.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/34] | AT | 12.10.2005 | |
FI | 12.10.2005 | ||
NL | 12.10.2005 | ||
DK | 12.01.2006 | ||
ES | 23.01.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/33] | FI | 12.10.2005 | |
NL | 12.10.2005 | ||
ES | 23.01.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/25] | FI | 12.10.2005 | |
NL | 12.10.2005 | ||
PT | 13.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/23] | FI | 12.10.2005 | |
NL | 12.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/22] | NL | 12.10.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4986723 (MAEDA YUJI [JP]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [X]US5413611 (HASLAM II THOMAS P [US], et al) [X] 7 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9913807 (UNIV LONDON [GB], et al) [X] 7* the whole document *; | [A] - HASHIMOTO H ET AL, "AN UNILATERAL MASTER-SLAVE HAND SYSTEM WITH A FORCE-CONTROLLED SLAVE HAND", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ROBOTICS AND AUTOMATION. NAGOYA,JAPAN, MAY 21 - 27, 1995, NEW YORK, IEEE, US, (19950521), vol. 1, ISBN 0-7803-1966-4, pages 956 - 961, XP000657286 [A] 1-6 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ROBOT.1995.525406 | International search | [A]JPS50139594 ; | [A]US4685929 (MONESTIER JACQUES [FR]) |