EP1175531 - ICE SCRAPER HAVING NON-ROTARY TOOLS WITH SHIELDED CUTTING INSERTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sandvik Intellectual Property AB 811 81 Sandviken / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/35] | For all designated states Sandvik Intellectual Property AB 811 81 Sandviken / SE | ||
Former [2005/30] | For all designated states Sandvik Intellectual Property HB 811 81 Sandviken / SE | ||
Former [2002/05] | For all designated states SANDVIK AKTIEBOLAG 811 81 Sandviken / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FULLER, Gary, A. 17599 Mahogany Dr. Abingdon, VA 24210 / US | 02 /
DISINGER, Roland, Thomas 4750 West 44th St. Minneapolis, MN 55424 / US | 03 /
MCSWEENEY, Larry, J. 3460 County Road 15 South Point, OH 45680 / US | [2002/05] | Application number, filing date | 00929984.3 | 25.04.2000 | [2002/05] | WO2000SE00776 | Priority number, date | US19990305333 | 05.05.1999 Original published format: US 305333 | [2002/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0068512 | Date: | 16.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1175531 | Date: | 30.01.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.11.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1175531 | Date: | 17.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 16.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | E01H5/12 | [2002/05] | CPC: |
E01H5/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/05] | Title | German: | EISKRATZER VERSEHEN MIT NICHT-DREHBAREN WERKZEUGEN MIT GESCHÜTZTEN SCHNEIDSÄTZEN | [2002/05] | English: | ICE SCRAPER HAVING NON-ROTARY TOOLS WITH SHIELDED CUTTING INSERTS | [2002/05] | French: | GRATTOIR A GLACE EQUIPE D'OUTILS NON ROTATIFS A PLAQUETTES AMOVIBLES BLINDEES | [2002/05] | Entry into regional phase | 18.10.2001 | National basic fee paid | 18.10.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.10.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.12.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 18.10.2001 | Examination requested [2002/05] | 12.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.02.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 09.02.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP05000458.9 / EP1524368 | Opposition(s) | 20.02.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.05.2006 | BE | 17.05.2006 | CH | 17.05.2006 | CY | 17.05.2006 | LI | 17.05.2006 | NL | 17.05.2006 | GR | 18.08.2006 | ES | 28.08.2006 | PT | 17.10.2006 | [2009/37] |
Former [2008/19] | AT | 17.05.2006 | |
BE | 17.05.2006 | ||
CH | 17.05.2006 | ||
LI | 17.05.2006 | ||
NL | 17.05.2006 | ||
GR | 18.08.2006 | ||
ES | 28.08.2006 | ||
PT | 17.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 17.05.2006 | |
BE | 17.05.2006 | ||
CH | 17.05.2006 | ||
LI | 17.05.2006 | ||
NL | 17.05.2006 | ||
ES | 28.08.2006 | ||
PT | 17.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/35] | AT | 17.05.2006 | |
BE | 17.05.2006 | ||
CH | 17.05.2006 | ||
IT | 17.05.2006 | ||
LI | 17.05.2006 | ||
NL | 17.05.2006 | ||
ES | 28.08.2006 | ||
PT | 17.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | AT | 17.05.2006 | |
BE | 17.05.2006 | ||
CH | 17.05.2006 | ||
LI | 17.05.2006 | ||
NL | 17.05.2006 | ||
ES | 28.08.2006 | ||
PT | 17.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | AT | 17.05.2006 | |
BE | 17.05.2006 | ||
CH | 17.05.2006 | ||
LI | 17.05.2006 | ||
ES | 28.08.2006 | ||
PT | 17.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | AT | 17.05.2006 | |
CH | 17.05.2006 | ||
LI | 17.05.2006 | ||
ES | 28.08.2006 | ||
PT | 17.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | AT | 17.05.2006 | |
CH | 17.05.2006 | ||
LI | 17.05.2006 | ||
ES | 28.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 17.05.2006 | |
ES | 28.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | ES | 28.08.2006 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US3239275 (PIERRE BELUGOU); | [X]US3934654 (STEPHENSON EARLE W, et al); | [A]US4753299 (MEYERS THOMAS A [AU]); | [A]DE19643847 (KUEPER GUMMI [DE], et al); | [Y]US5778572 (LUKAVICH PAUL J [US], et al); | [XP]US6003617 (MCSWEENEY LARRY J [US], et al) |