EP1166367 - AN ALUMINUM ALLOY BACK JUNCTION SOLAR CELL AND A PROCESS FOR FABRICATIN THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.10.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EBARA CORPORATION 11-1, Haneda Asahi-cho, Ohta-ku Tokyo 144-8510 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/11] | For all designated states Ebara Corporation 11-1, Haneda Asahi-cho, Ohta-ku Tokyo 144-8510 / JP | ||
Former [2002/01] | For all designated states Ebara Solar, Inc. 13 Airport Road Belle Vernon, PA 15012 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEIER, Daniel, L. 264 Barclay Avenue Pittsburgh, PA 15221 / US | 02 /
DAVIS, Hubert, P. 1141 Sperling Drive Pittsburgh, PA 15221 / US | 03 /
GARCIA, Ruth, A. 1910 Victoria Lane Irwin, PA 15642 / US | 04 /
SALAMI, Jalal 1121 Huston Drive West Mifflin, PA 15122 / US | [2002/01] | Representative(s) | Haines, Miles John L.S. D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/01] | Haines, Miles John D. Young & Co. 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 00930073.2 | 01.02.2000 | [2002/01] | WO2000US02609 | Priority number, date | US19990124797P | 17.03.1999 Original published format: US 124797 P | US19990414990 | 07.10.1999 Original published format: US 414990 | [2002/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0055923 | Date: | 21.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1166367 | Date: | 02.01.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.09.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/068, H01L31/0352, H01L31/0224 | [2002/01] | CPC: |
H01L31/022425 (EP,US);
H01L31/068 (EP,KR,US);
H01L31/0288 (EP,US);
H01L31/04 (KR);
H01L31/0682 (EP);
H01L31/18 (KR);
Y02E10/547 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SOLARZELLE MIT EINEM RÜCKSEITENKONTAKT AUS EINER ALUMINIUMLEGIERUNG UND IHR HERSTELLLUNGSVERFAHREN | [2002/01] | English: | AN ALUMINUM ALLOY BACK JUNCTION SOLAR CELL AND A PROCESS FOR FABRICATIN THEREOF | [2002/01] | French: | CELLULE SOLAIRE A JONCTION ARRIERE EN ALLIAGE D'ALUMINIUM ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION | [2002/01] | Entry into regional phase | 04.10.2001 | National basic fee paid | 04.10.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.10.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.10.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 04.10.2001 | Examination requested [2002/01] | 14.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.05.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/47] | 01.07.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2008 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4916503 (UEMATSU TSUYOSHI [JP], et al) [A] * figure 2B *; | [Y]WO9713280 (EBARA SOLAR INC [US], et al) [Y] 5-7,34,36,39 * figure 1 *; | [XY]EP0776051 (EBARA SOLAR INC [US]) [X] 1-4,8-33,35,37,38 * the whole document * [Y] 5-7,34,36,39; | [A] - SALAMI J ET AL, "Self-aligned locally diffused emitter (SALDE) silicon solar cell", SOLAR ENERGY MATERIALS AND SOLAR CELLS,NL,ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, (19971101), vol. 48, no. 1-4, ISSN 0927-0248, pages 159 - 165, XP004111846 [A] * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0927-0248(97)00092-5 |