EP1119268 - ZIPPER AND ZIPPER ARRANGEMENTS AND METHODS OF MANUFACTURING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.2007 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pactiv Corporation 1900 West Field Court Lake Forest, IL 60045 / US | [2001/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PROVAN, Alexander, R. 6 Arlington Park Canandaigua, NY 14424 / US | 02 /
COOMBER, Thomas, L. 2377 Magog Palmyra, NY 14522 / US | 03 /
BARCLAY, Ian, J. 3093 Parker Road Marion, NY 14505 / US | 04 /
DOBRESKI, David, V. 99 Country Downs Circle Fairport, NY 14450 / US | 05 /
THOMAS, Toby, R. 5411 88th Street Pleasant Prairie, Wisconsin, 53158 / US | [2005/10] |
Former [2001/31] | 01 /
PROVAN, Alexander, R. 6 Arlington Park Canandaigua, NY 14424 / US | ||
02 /
COOMBER, Thomas, L. 2377 Magog Palmyra, NY 14522 / US | |||
03 /
BARCLAY, Ian, J. 3093 Parker Road Marion, NY 14505 / US | |||
04 /
DOBRESKI, David, V. 99 Country Downs Circle Fairport, NY 14450 / US | |||
05 /
THOMAS, Toby, R. 8 Kurt Road Pittsford, NY 14534 / US | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/31] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00930367.8 | 05.05.2000 | [2001/31] | WO2000US12183 | Priority number, date | US19990307937 | 10.05.1999 Original published format: US 307937 | [2001/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0067603 | Date: | 16.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1119268 | Date: | 01.08.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.11.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1119268 | Date: | 05.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.11.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A44B19/36, B65D33/25 | [2002/31] | CPC: |
B65B9/087 (EP,US);
A44B19/16 (EP,KR,US);
A44B19/42 (EP,US);
A61B5/0095 (EP,US);
B65B61/188 (EP,US);
B65B9/093 (EP,US);
B65D33/2541 (EP,KR,US);
A44B19/267 (EP,US);
A44B19/62 (EP,US);
B31B70/8132 (EP,US);
B65B61/18 (EP,US);
Y10T24/15 (EP,US);
Y10T24/2534 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2001/31] | A44B19/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/31] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REISSVERSCHLUSS UND ANORDNUNGEN SOWIE VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG | [2001/31] | English: | ZIPPER AND ZIPPER ARRANGEMENTS AND METHODS OF MANUFACTURING THE SAME | [2001/31] | French: | FERMETURE A GLISSIERE, AGENCEMENTS ET PROCEDES DE FABRICATION DE CETTE FERMETURE | [2001/31] | Entry into regional phase | 05.01.2001 | National basic fee paid | 05.01.2001 | Search fee paid | 05.01.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.05.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/31] | 03.09.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.08.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.12.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 16.12.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP04022558.3 / EP1488716 | EP05008913.5 / EP1554944 | EP06001558.3 / EP1654949 | EP06016369.8 / EP1714574 | EP06016376.3 / EP1721538 | Opposition(s) | 08.01.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.04.2006 | BE | 05.04.2006 | CH | 05.04.2006 | CY | 05.04.2006 | FI | 05.04.2006 | IT | 05.04.2006 | LI | 05.04.2006 | NL | 05.04.2006 | IE | 05.05.2006 | LU | 05.05.2006 | MC | 31.05.2006 | DK | 05.07.2006 | SE | 05.07.2006 | GR | 06.07.2006 | PT | 05.09.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/36] | AT | 05.04.2006 | |
BE | 05.04.2006 | ||
CH | 05.04.2006 | ||
FI | 05.04.2006 | ||
IT | 05.04.2006 | ||
LI | 05.04.2006 | ||
NL | 05.04.2006 | ||
IE | 05.05.2006 | ||
LU | 05.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
DK | 05.07.2006 | ||
SE | 05.07.2006 | ||
GR | 06.07.2006 | ||
PT | 05.09.2006 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 05.04.2006 | |
BE | 05.04.2006 | ||
CH | 05.04.2006 | ||
FI | 05.04.2006 | ||
IT | 05.04.2006 | ||
LI | 05.04.2006 | ||
NL | 05.04.2006 | ||
IE | 05.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
DK | 05.07.2006 | ||
SE | 05.07.2006 | ||
GR | 06.07.2006 | ||
PT | 05.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/35] | AT | 05.04.2006 | |
BE | 05.04.2006 | ||
CH | 05.04.2006 | ||
FI | 05.04.2006 | ||
IT | 05.04.2006 | ||
LI | 05.04.2006 | ||
NL | 05.04.2006 | ||
IE | 05.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
DK | 05.07.2006 | ||
SE | 05.07.2006 | ||
PT | 05.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/25] | AT | 05.04.2006 | |
BE | 05.04.2006 | ||
CH | 05.04.2006 | ||
FI | 05.04.2006 | ||
LI | 05.04.2006 | ||
NL | 05.04.2006 | ||
IE | 05.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
DK | 05.07.2006 | ||
SE | 05.07.2006 | ||
PT | 05.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | AT | 05.04.2006 | |
BE | 05.04.2006 | ||
CH | 05.04.2006 | ||
FI | 05.04.2006 | ||
LI | 05.04.2006 | ||
NL | 05.04.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
DK | 05.07.2006 | ||
SE | 05.07.2006 | ||
PT | 05.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | AT | 05.04.2006 | |
BE | 05.04.2006 | ||
CH | 05.04.2006 | ||
FI | 05.04.2006 | ||
LI | 05.04.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
DK | 05.07.2006 | ||
SE | 05.07.2006 | ||
PT | 05.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/09] | AT | 05.04.2006 | |
CH | 05.04.2006 | ||
FI | 05.04.2006 | ||
LI | 05.04.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
DK | 05.07.2006 | ||
SE | 05.07.2006 | ||
PT | 05.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/07] | AT | 05.04.2006 | |
CH | 05.04.2006 | ||
FI | 05.04.2006 | ||
LI | 05.04.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
DK | 05.07.2006 | ||
SE | 05.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | AT | 05.04.2006 | |
CH | 05.04.2006 | ||
FI | 05.04.2006 | ||
LI | 05.04.2006 | ||
SE | 05.07.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 05.04.2006 | |
FI | 05.04.2006 | ||
SE | 05.07.2006 | ||
Former [2006/51] | FI | 05.04.2006 | |
SE | 05.07.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | SE | 05.07.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5071689 (TILMAN PAUL A [US]) [Y] 27-46,65-86* column 2, line 37 - column 4, line 34; figure - *; | [X]EP0505059 (MOBIL OIL CORP [US]) [X] 1,12,47,56 * column 1, line 45 - column 2, line 37 * * column 7, lines 30-56 * * figure 10 *; | [XY]US5833791 (BRYNIARSKI DAVID A [US], et al) [X] 1-26,47-64 * column 1, line 56 - column 2, line 10; figures 1A,2A,3A,4A * [Y] 27-46,65-86 | International search | [Y]AU252799B ; | [Y]US3790992 (HERZ A); | [Y]US5431760 (DONOVAN TERRY J [US]) |