EP1189654 - SPLITTABLE OCCLUSION BALLOON SHEATH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/13] | SPLITTABLE OCCLUSION BALLOON SHEATH AND PROCESS OF USE | ||
[2004/16] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.2005 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAIG CORPORATION 14901 DeVeau Place Minnetonka Minnesota 55345-2126 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/13] | For all designated states DAIG CORPORATION 14901 DeVeau Place Minnetonka, Minnesota 55345-2126 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUTLER, William 2120 Aldrich Avenue South 305 Minneapolis, MN 55405 / US | 02 /
FLORIO, Joseph, J. 4723 Castle Road Lacanada, CA 91011 / US | 03 /
BORNZIN, Gene, A. 608 Stonebrook Street Simi Valley, CA 93065 / US | 04 /
OCKULY, John 3210 46th Avenue N. Robbinsdale, MN 55422 / US | 05 /
SCOTT, Steven, E. 3110 Dartmouth Drive Excelsior, MN 55331 / US | [2002/13] | Representative(s) | Westendorp, Michael Oliver Andrae l Westendorp Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Uhlandstrasse 2 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/13] | Westendorp, Michael, Dr. Patentanwälte Splanemann Reitzner Baronetzky Westendorp Rumfordstrasse 7 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00930539.2 | 10.05.2000 | [2002/13] | WO2000US12741 | Priority number, date | US19990344535 | 25.06.1999 Original published format: US 344535 | [2002/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0100268 | Date: | 04.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1189654 | Date: | 27.03.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.01.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1189654 | Date: | 15.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61M25/06, A61M25/10 | [2002/13] | CPC: |
A61M25/10 (EP);
A61M25/0668 (EP);
A61M2025/1052 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/13] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TEILBARE HÜLLENANORDNUNG MIT OKKLUSIONSBALLON | [2002/13] | English: | SPLITTABLE OCCLUSION BALLOON SHEATH | [2004/16] | French: | GAINE DIVISIBLE A BALLONNET D'OCCLUSION | [2004/16] |
Former [2002/13] | SPLITTABLE OCCLUSION BALLOON SHEATH AND PROCESS OF USE | ||
Former [2002/13] | GAINE DIVISIBLE A BALLONNET D'OCCLUSION ET PROCEDE D'UTILISATION | Entry into regional phase | 10.01.2002 | National basic fee paid | 10.01.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.01.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.01.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/13] | 17.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 10.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.09.2004 | BE | 15.09.2004 | CH | 15.09.2004 | ES | 15.09.2004 | FI | 15.09.2004 | LI | 15.09.2004 | NL | 15.09.2004 | DK | 15.12.2004 | GR | 15.12.2004 | SE | 15.12.2004 | PT | 15.02.2005 | CY | 10.05.2005 | IE | 10.05.2005 | LU | 10.05.2005 | MC | 31.05.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/27] | AT | 15.09.2004 | |
BE | 15.09.2004 | ||
CH | 15.09.2004 | ||
ES | 15.09.2004 | ||
FI | 15.09.2004 | ||
LI | 15.09.2004 | ||
NL | 15.09.2004 | ||
DK | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
CY | 10.05.2005 | ||
IE | 10.05.2005 | ||
LU | 10.05.2005 | ||
MC | 31.05.2005 | ||
Former [2007/26] | AT | 15.09.2004 | |
BE | 15.09.2004 | ||
CH | 15.09.2004 | ||
ES | 15.09.2004 | ||
FI | 15.09.2004 | ||
LI | 15.09.2004 | ||
NL | 15.09.2004 | ||
DK | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
CY | 10.05.2005 | ||
IE | 10.05.2005 | ||
LU | 10.05.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | AT | 15.09.2004 | |
BE | 15.09.2004 | ||
CH | 15.09.2004 | ||
ES | 15.09.2004 | ||
FI | 15.09.2004 | ||
LI | 15.09.2004 | ||
NL | 15.09.2004 | ||
DK | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
CY | 10.05.2005 | ||
IE | 10.05.2005 | ||
LU | 31.05.2005 | ||
Former [2007/08] | AT | 15.09.2004 | |
BE | 15.09.2004 | ||
CH | 15.09.2004 | ||
ES | 15.09.2004 | ||
FI | 15.09.2004 | ||
LI | 15.09.2004 | ||
NL | 15.09.2004 | ||
DK | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
IE | 10.05.2005 | ||
LU | 31.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/25] | AT | 15.09.2004 | |
BE | 15.09.2004 | ||
CH | 15.09.2004 | ||
FI | 15.09.2004 | ||
LI | 15.09.2004 | ||
NL | 15.09.2004 | ||
DK | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
IE | 10.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 15.09.2004 | |
BE | 15.09.2004 | ||
CH | 15.09.2004 | ||
FI | 15.09.2004 | ||
LI | 15.09.2004 | ||
NL | 15.09.2004 | ||
DK | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/46] | AT | 15.09.2004 | |
BE | 15.09.2004 | ||
CH | 15.09.2004 | ||
FI | 15.09.2004 | ||
LI | 15.09.2004 | ||
DK | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/28] | AT | 15.09.2004 | |
BE | 15.09.2004 | ||
CH | 15.09.2004 | ||
FI | 15.09.2004 | ||
LI | 15.09.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/21] | AT | 15.09.2004 | |
CH | 15.09.2004 | ||
FI | 15.09.2004 | ||
LI | 15.09.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 15.09.2004 | |
FI | 15.09.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/13] | AT | 15.09.2004 | |
FI | 15.09.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 15.09.2004 | |
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/10] | SE | 15.12.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4983168 (MOOREHEAD HARVEY R [US]) [A] 1,14,18 * column 4, line 45 - column 5, line 19; figures 1-3 *; | [YA]US5098392 (FLEISCHHACKER JOHN J [US], et al) [Y] 1,8 * column 4, line 51 - line 59; figures 1,2 * [A] 14,18,22; | [A]US5125904 (LEE HONGPYO H [US]) [A] 14-18 * column 2, line 52 - column 3, line 9 *; | [A]US5312355 (LEE HONGPYO [US]) [A] 14-18 * figures 1,3; claim 1 *; | [XY]US5571161 (STARKSEN NIEL F [US]) [X] 1,2,6,8 * column 3, line 63 - column 5, line 5 * * column 5, line 66 - column 6, line 8; figures 1,8A-8E * [Y] 14,18,20,23-25; | [A]US5720726 (MARCADIS STUART J [US], et al) [A] 18,26* abstract *; | [Y]US5722963 (LURIE KEITH G [US], et al) [Y] 14,18,20,23-25 * abstract *; | [A]US5814016 (VALLEY KIRSTEN L [US], et al) [A] 1,14,18,20 * abstract *; | [Y]US5873858 (SCHAFER PATRICK [US], et al) [Y] 1,8 * column 4, line 66 - column 5, line 27; figures 4B-4D * |