EP1177441 - CELL SEPARATION DEVICE AND METHODS FOR USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.05.2006 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. 3500 Deer Creek Road MS 26 U-25 Palo Alto CA 94304-1317 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/16] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. 3500 Deer Creek Road, MS 26 U-25 Palo Alto, CA 94304-1317 / US | ||
Former [2002/06] | For all designated states PROLINX, INC. Suite 100, 22322 20th Avenue S.E. Bothell, WA 98021 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAISER, Robert 7804 N.E. 147th Street Kenmore, WA 98028 / US | 02 /
WEISSMAN, Carl 8801 Latona Avenue N.E. Seattle, WA 98115 / US | 03 /
WEISSMAN, Irving, L. 4147 Jefferson Avenue Redwood City, CA 94062 / US | [2002/06] | Representative(s) | Schoppe, Fritz Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | Schoppe, Fritz Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | ||
Former [2005/14] | Schoppe, Fritz, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | ||
Former [2002/06] | Brasnett, Adrian Hugh, et al Mewburn Ellis York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 00930568.1 | 10.05.2000 | [2002/06] | WO2000US12823 | Priority number, date | US19990133342P | 10.05.1999 Original published format: US 133342 P | [2002/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0068689 | Date: | 16.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1177441 | Date: | 06.02.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.11.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/53, C12Q1/24, C07H15/12 | [2002/06] | CPC: |
C07H21/00 (EP,US);
G01N33/54366 (EP,US);
G01N33/544 (EP,US);
C07B2200/11 (EP,US);
C12Q1/68 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/06] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR ZELLTRENNUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR ANWENDUNG | [2002/06] | English: | CELL SEPARATION DEVICE AND METHODS FOR USE | [2002/06] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SEPARATION CELLULAIRE ET SES METHODES D'UTILISATION | [2002/06] | Entry into regional phase | 06.11.2001 | National basic fee paid | 06.11.2001 | Search fee paid | 06.11.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.11.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.11.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 23.10.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/06] | 09.01.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/23] | 01.02.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2005 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 27.03.2003 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2004/26] | 01.09.2004 | Resumption of proceedings | [2004/26] | 01.03.2005 | Resumption of proceedings | [2005/14] | 27.03.2003 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2005/14] | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5763194 (SLOWIACZEK PETER R [AU], et al); | [Y]US5849878 (CANTOR CHARLES R [US], et al); | [Y]US5695989 (KALAMASZ DALE [US]); | [Y]US5824478 (MUELLER UWE RICHARD [US]); | [Y]US5804384 (MUELLER UWE RICHARD [US], et al); | [Y]US5395754 (LAMBOTTE PAUL P [US], et al); | [Y]US5391723 (PRIEST JOHN H [US]) |