EP1183733 - IMAGE SENSOR RESPONSE ENHANCEMENT USING FLUORESCENT PHOSPHORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.05.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/10] | For all designated states INTEL CORPORATION 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95052 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOOTH, Lawrence, A., Jr. 15230 South 17th Avenue Phoenix, AZ 85045 / US | [2002/10] | Representative(s) | Molyneaux, Martyn William, et al Harrison Goddard Foote 40- 43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/10] | Molyneaux, Martyn William, et al Harrison Goddard Foote 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JA / GB | ||
Former [2002/10] | Molyneaux, Martyn William Wildman, Harrold, Allen & Dixon 11th Floor, Tower 3, Clements Inn London WC2A 2AZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 00930815.6 | 17.05.2000 | [2002/10] | WO2000US13718 | Priority number, date | US19990325005 | 02.06.1999 Original published format: US 325005 | [2002/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0074140 | Date: | 07.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1183733 | Date: | 06.03.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1183733 | Date: | 18.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/146, H01L31/0232 | [2002/10] | CPC: |
H01L27/14609 (EP,US);
H01L27/146 (KR);
H01L27/14621 (EP,US);
H01L27/14627 (EP,US);
H01L27/14645 (EP,US);
H04N25/76 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/20] |
Former [2002/10] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EMPFINDLICHKEITERHÖHUNG EINES BILDSENSORS MITTELS FLUORESZIERENDEN PHOSPHOR | [2002/10] | English: | IMAGE SENSOR RESPONSE ENHANCEMENT USING FLUORESCENT PHOSPHORS | [2002/10] | French: | AMELIORATION DE LA REPONSE D'UN CAPTEUR D'IMAGES AU MOYEN DE LUMINOPHORES FLUORESCENTS | [2002/10] | Entry into regional phase | 12.12.2001 | National basic fee paid | 12.12.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.12.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.12.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 17.12.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.12.2001 | Examination requested [2002/10] | 07.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.05.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 17.05.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.04.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 14.03.2008 | [2008/32] | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH04322467 ; | [X]JPH04326763 ; | [XY]WO9728558 (CALIFORNIA INST OF TECHN [US], et al); | [XY]EP0843363 (NEC CORP [JP]); | Examination | US5412705 |