EP1099080 - LUMINAIRE WITH LEDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.10.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.12.2009 [2009/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2001/20] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARSHALL, Thomas Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
PASHLEY, Michael, D. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
HERMAN, Stephen Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2001/20] | Representative(s) | van den Hooven, Jan, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | Van den Hooven, Jan, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2002/14] | Van den Hooven, Jan, et al Internationaal Octrooibureau B.V. P.O. BOX 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2001/20] | Mulder, Cornelis A.M. Internationaal Octrooibureau B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 00931162.2 | 01.05.2000 | [2001/20] | WO2000EP04186 | Priority number, date | US19990315706 | 20.05.1999 Original published format: US 315706 | [2001/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0071930 | Date: | 30.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1099080 | Date: | 16.05.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F21V7/04, F21V7/09, F21V7/22, F21S8/02, // F21W101:02 | [2001/20] | CPC: |
F21S8/04 (EP,US);
F21S10/02 (EP,US);
F21S41/37 (EP,US);
F21S43/14 (EP,US);
F21S43/33 (EP,US);
F21V7/04 (EP,US);
F21V7/09 (EP,US);
F21V7/30 (EP,US);
F21V9/40 (EP,US);
F21S43/31 (EP,US);
F21V7/0008 (EP,US);
F21Y2103/10 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/21] |
Former [2001/20] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LEUCHTE MIT LICHTEMITTIERENDEN DIODEN | [2001/20] | English: | LUMINAIRE WITH LEDS | [2001/20] | French: | LUMINAIRE A DIODES ELECTROLUMINESCENTES | [2001/20] | Entry into regional phase | 20.02.2001 | National basic fee paid | 30.05.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.05.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/30] | 21.10.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB1021159 (LUCAS INDUSTRIES LTD) [A] 1,10 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0362993 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [A] 1,8 * page 3, line 18 - line 31 * * page 4, line 53 - line 56 * * page 5, line 27 - line 55 ** figures 3-5,7,8 *; | [A]US5222795 (HED AHARON Z [US]) [A] 1,2 * column 2, line 60 - line 68 * * column 5, line 6 - line 24 * * column 6, line 48 - column 7, line 9 * * column 8, line 28 - line 36 * * column 10, line 20 - column 11, line 9 * * figures 1,1D,2D,3D *; | [XA]DE4237107 (WUSTLICH HOLDING GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,8,9 * column 1, line 33 - line 48 * * column 3, line 40 - column 4, line 35 * * figures 1-3 * [A] 6; | [X]US5642933 (HITORA SHOZO [JP]) [X] 1,8,10 * column 2, line 17 - line 51 * * column 3, line 49 - column 5, line 11 * * column 6, line 62 - column 7, line 43 * * figures 1,2,8 * | by applicant | JPH06237017 | US19990277645 |