27.07.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.08.2007 [2007/35] |
08.06.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.07.2007 [2007/28] |
13.10.2006 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 15.11.2006 [2006/46] |
21.10.2005 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 07.12.2005 [2005/49] |
06.10.2005 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
06.10.2005 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
16.06.2005 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
10.06.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.06.2005 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
21.05.2005 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
21.05.2005 |
Deletion: Reply to examination report |
|
19.05.2005 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
14.03.2005 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
12.11.2004 |
First examination report |
|
10.11.2004 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
09.06.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.04.2004 |
Change - designated states |
published on 19.05.2004 [2004/21] |
14.06.2003 |
Renewal fee |
|
04.01.2003 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 19.02.2003 [2003/08] |
04.01.2003 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 19.02.2003 [2003/08] |
05.11.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.11.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
01.11.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.11.2002 |
Change - extension states |
|
27.02.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.02.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.02.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.07.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|