EP1284087 - INTEGRATED TELEPHONE SET WITH AN xDSL-MODEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.10.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 29.08.2007 [2007/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG St.-Martin-Strasse 53 81669 München / DE | [2005/49] |
Former [2003/08] | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG St.-Martin-Strasse 53 81669 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAAS, Steven Haefroni 13 44862 Tzur-Yigal / IL | 02 /
PELEG, Shimon Antsilevitz Street 11 45285 Hod-Hasharon / IL | [2003/08] | Representative(s) | Charles, Glyndwr, et al Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Behnisch Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/08] | Charles, Glyndwr, et al Reinhard-Skuhra-Weise & Partner, Patentanwälte, Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00931253.9 | 22.05.2000 | [2003/08] | WO2000EP04650 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0191440 | Date: | 29.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1284087 | Date: | 19.02.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1284087 | Date: | 07.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.11.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04M11/06 | [2003/08] | CPC: |
H04M11/062 (EP,US);
H04M1/738 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/21] |
Former [2003/08] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | INTEGRIERTER TELEFONAPPARAT MIT EINEM XDSL-MODEM | [2003/08] | English: | INTEGRATED TELEPHONE SET WITH AN xDSL-MODEM | [2003/08] | French: | POSTE TELEPHONIQUE INTEGRE A MODEM XDSL | [2003/08] | Entry into regional phase | 25.10.2002 | National basic fee paid | 25.10.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.10.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.12.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.10.2002 | Examination requested [2003/08] | 15.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.09.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 27.09.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 07.12.2005 | GB | 22.05.2006 | [2007/35] |
Former [2007/28] | GB | 22.05.2006 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4503288 (KESSLER BAYARD F [US]) [Y] 16-18,21 * column 1, line 38 - column 2, line 5; figure 1 * * column 2, line 49 - column 3, line 36 * * column 3, line 62 - line 67 * * column 7, line 33 - column 8, line 2 ** column 10, line 18 - column 17, line 37 *; | [X]EP0891067 (ALSTHOM CGE ALCATEL [FR]) [X] 1-3,7,8,10-13,15,19 * column 1, line 3 - column 2, line 9 * * column 23, line 31 - column 24, line 9; figure 13E * * claim 35 *; | [Y]US5889856 (O'TOOLE ANTHONY J P [US], et al) [Y] 20 * column 2, line 18 - line 46 *; | [Y]EP0944281 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [Y] 4-6 * column 2, line 8 - line 44 * * column 15, line 26 - line 49 *; | [Y]US6005873 (AMIT CHEN [IL]) [Y] 14 * column 2, line 9 - line 44 *; | [XY]US6061392 (BREMER GORDON [US], et al) [X] 1,2,7-10,13,19 * column 1, line 44 - column 2, line 8 * * column 3, line 40 - line 63 * * column 4, line 50 - column 5, line 3 * * column 6, line 27 - column 7, line 7; figure 1 * [Y] 4-6,14,16-18,20,21 |