EP1186087 - SYSTEM FOR A MACHINE WITH A PLURALITY OF PROXIMITY SENSORS AND A PROXIMITY SENSOR AND A PRIMARY WINDING USED IN SUCH A MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.04.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB Research Ltd. Affolternstrasse 44 8050 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2007/23] | For all designated states ABB RESEARCH LTD. Affolternstrasse 44 8050 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [2002/11] | For all designated states ABB Research Ltd. Affolternstrasse 44 8050 Zürich / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHEIBLE, Guntram Holunderweg 5 D-69493 Hirschberg / DE | 02 /
SMAILUS, Bernd Mühlweg 34 D-69502 Hemsbach / DE | 03 /
KLAUS, Martin Kiefernweg 5 D-64625 Bensheim / DE | 04 /
GARRELS, Kai Auggener Str. 46 D-68239 Mannheim / DE | 05 /
HEINEMANN, Lothar Ladenburger Str. 25 D-69493 Hirschberg / DE | [2002/11] | Representative(s) | Miller, Toivo, et al ABB Patent GmbH Wallstadter Strasse 59 68520 Ladenburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/11] | Miller, Toivo, et al ABB Patent GmbH, Wallstadter Strasse 59 68520 Ladenburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 00931284.4 | 06.06.2000 | [2002/11] | WO2000EP05137 | Priority number, date | DE1999126799 | 11.06.1999 Original published format: DE 19926799 | DE1999129344 | 26.06.1999 Original published format: DE 19929344 | [2002/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0077909 | Date: | 21.12.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1186087 | Date: | 13.03.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1186087 | Date: | 06.06.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H02J5/00, G05B19/042 | [2002/11] | CPC: |
H02J50/40 (EP);
H02J50/10 (US);
H01F5/00 (EP,US);
H02J50/12 (EP);
H02J50/70 (EP,US);
H01F38/14 (EP,US);
H03K17/945 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/11] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM FÜR EINE VIELZAHL VON NÄHERUNGSSENSOREN AUFWEISENDE MASCHINE SOWIE NÄHERUNGSSENSOR UND PRIMÄRWICKLUNG HIERZU | [2007/11] | English: | SYSTEM FOR A MACHINE WITH A PLURALITY OF PROXIMITY SENSORS AND A PROXIMITY SENSOR AND A PRIMARY WINDING USED IN SUCH A MACHINE | [2002/11] | French: | SYSTEME DESTINE A UNE MACHINE PRESENTANT PLUSIEURS DETECTEURS DE PROXIMITE ET DETECTEURS DE PROXIMITE ET ENROULEMENT DE CIRCUIT PRIMAIRE UTILISES DANS CE SYSTEME | [2002/11] |
Former [2002/11] | SYSTEM FÜR EINE EINE VIELZAHL VON NÄHERUNGSSENSOREN AUFWEISENDE MASCHINE SOWIE NÄHERUNGSSENSOR UND PRIMÄRWICKLUNG HIERZU | Entry into regional phase | 26.10.2001 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.10.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.10.2001 | Examination requested [2002/11] | 16.02.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.04.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 04.04.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.06.2007 | CY | 06.06.2007 | DK | 06.06.2007 | FI | 06.06.2007 | GB | 06.06.2007 | IE | 06.06.2007 | LU | 06.06.2007 | NL | 06.06.2007 | BE | 30.06.2007 | CH | 30.06.2007 | LI | 30.06.2007 | MC | 30.06.2007 | SE | 06.09.2007 | GR | 07.09.2007 | ES | 17.09.2007 | PT | 06.11.2007 | [2009/37] |
Former [2009/33] | AT | 06.06.2007 | |
CY | 06.06.2007 | ||
DK | 06.06.2007 | ||
FI | 06.06.2007 | ||
GB | 06.06.2007 | ||
IE | 06.06.2007 | ||
NL | 06.06.2007 | ||
BE | 30.06.2007 | ||
CH | 30.06.2007 | ||
LI | 30.06.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
SE | 06.09.2007 | ||
GR | 07.09.2007 | ||
ES | 17.09.2007 | ||
PT | 06.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 06.06.2007 | |
DK | 06.06.2007 | ||
FI | 06.06.2007 | ||
GB | 06.06.2007 | ||
IE | 06.06.2007 | ||
NL | 06.06.2007 | ||
BE | 30.06.2007 | ||
CH | 30.06.2007 | ||
LI | 30.06.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
SE | 06.09.2007 | ||
GR | 07.09.2007 | ||
ES | 17.09.2007 | ||
PT | 06.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/23] | DK | 06.06.2007 | |
FI | 06.06.2007 | ||
GB | 06.06.2007 | ||
IE | 06.06.2007 | ||
NL | 06.06.2007 | ||
BE | 30.06.2007 | ||
CH | 30.06.2007 | ||
LI | 30.06.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
SE | 06.09.2007 | ||
GR | 07.09.2007 | ||
ES | 17.09.2007 | ||
PT | 06.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | FI | 06.06.2007 | |
GB | 06.06.2007 | ||
IE | 06.06.2007 | ||
NL | 06.06.2007 | ||
BE | 30.06.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
SE | 06.09.2007 | ||
GR | 07.09.2007 | ||
ES | 17.09.2007 | ||
PT | 06.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | FI | 06.06.2007 | |
IE | 06.06.2007 | ||
NL | 06.06.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
SE | 06.09.2007 | ||
ES | 17.09.2007 | ||
PT | 06.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | FI | 06.06.2007 | |
NL | 06.06.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
SE | 06.09.2007 | ||
ES | 17.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | FI | 06.06.2007 | |
SE | 06.09.2007 | ||
ES | 17.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | ES | 17.09.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9511544 (AUCKLAND UNISERVICES LTD [NZ], et al) [A] 1,2,7-9,11,12* column 2 - column 3; figures 2-6,10-14 *; | [Y]DE19528341 (ILG GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1,7,11,12 * figure 1; claim 3 *; | [A]WO9843338 (TELESENSE LTD [IL], et al) [A] 1-13 * abstract *; | [Y]DE19735624 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [Y] 1,7,11,12 * page 2, paragraph 4; figure 1 *; | [Y] - SCHOENER J ET AL, "DEZENTRALE VERSORGUNG AKTIVER GEBER", RADIO FERNSEHEN ELEKTRONIK,DE,VEB VERLAG TECHNIK. BERLIN, (19920901), vol. 41, no. 9, ISSN 1436-1574, pages 627 - 630, XP000311034 [Y] 1,7,11,12 * page 1 * | [A] - KAWAMURA A ET AL, "WIRELESS TRANSMISSION OF POWER AND INFORMATION THROUGH ONE HIGH FREQUENCY RESONANT AC LINK INVERTER FOR ROBOT MANIPULATOR APPLICATIONS", RECORD OF THE INDUSTRY APPLICATIONS CONFERENCE (IAS),US,NEW YORK, IEEE, (19951008), vol. CONF. 30, ISBN 0-7803-3009-9, pages 2367 - 2372, XP000547151 [A] 1-13 * abstract * |