EP1198432 - VITRAGE TRANSPARENT ET SON UTILISATION DANS UNE PORTE D'ENCEINTE REFRIGEREE COMPORTANT NOTAMMENT UN VITRAGE SOUS-VIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.08.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 12.08.2009 [2009/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAINT-GOBAIN GLASS FRANCE 18, avenue d'Alsace 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2002/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MESSERE, Rino 32, rue du Bois Rosine B-4577 Modave / BE | 02 /
HEBERT, Anne-Sophie 15, rue de l'Oise F-60200 Compiegne / FR | 03 /
FLORENTIN, Jean-Michel 35, Loulevard Jeanne d'Arc F-02200 Soissons / FR | [2002/17] | Representative(s) | Muller, René SAINT-GOBAIN RECHERCHE 39, quai Lucien Lefranc 93303 Aubervilliers / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Muller, René SAINT-GOBAIN RECHERCHE 39, quai Lucien Lefranc 93303 Aubervilliers / FR | ||
Former [2002/17] | Muller, René SAINT-GOBAIN RECHERCHE 39, quai Lucien Lefranc 93300 Aubervilliers / FR | Application number, filing date | 00931352.9 | 25.05.2000 | [2002/17] | WO2000FR01424 | Priority number, date | FR19990006586 | 25.05.1999 Original published format: FR 9906586 | [2002/17] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0071481 | Date: | 30.11.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1198432 | Date: | 24.04.2002 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1198432 | Date: | 10.10.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C03C17/32, C03C17/34, C09K3/18 | [2002/17] | CPC: |
A47F3/0434 (EP,KR,US);
C03C17/22 (EP,KR,US);
C03C17/32 (EP,KR,US);
F25D23/02 (EP,KR,US);
F25D2201/14 (EP,KR,US);
Y10S428/913 (EP,KR,US);
Y10T428/249953 (EP,US);
Y10T428/26 (EP,US);
Y10T428/263 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31504 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31551 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31645 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31855 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/17] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DURCHSICHTIGE VERGLASUNG UND IHRE VERWENDUNG IN EINER TÜR EINES GEKÜHLTEN RAUMES DIE INSBESONDERE EINE EVAKUIERTE VERGLASUNG ENTHÄLT | [2002/17] | English: | VITRAGE TRANSPARENT ET SON UTILISATION DANS UNE PORTE D'ENCEINTE REFRIGEREE COMPORTANT NOTAMMENT UN VITRAGE SOUS-VIDE | [2002/17] | French: | VITRAGE TRANSPARENT ET SON UTILISATION DANS UNE PORTE D'ENCEINTE REFRIGEREE COMPORTANT NOTAMMENT UN VITRAGE SOUS-VIDE | [2002/17] | Entry into regional phase | 29.09.2001 | National basic fee paid | 29.09.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.09.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.12.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.09.2001 | Examination requested [2002/17] | 02.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.09.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 13.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.04.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 23.04.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.07.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 21.07.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.07.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/38] | Request for further processing for: | 13.11.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 13.11.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.11.2003 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.10.2007 | CY | 10.10.2007 | IE | 10.10.2007 | GR | 11.01.2008 | MC | 31.05.2008 | [2009/33] |
Former [2009/13] | AT | 10.10.2007 | |
IE | 10.10.2007 | ||
GR | 11.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/04] | AT | 10.10.2007 | |
IE | 10.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/45] | AT | 10.10.2007 | |
IE | 10.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/29] | AT | 10.10.2007 | Cited in | International search | [XY]JPH10167764 ; | [X]SU1101444 ; | [X]JPH02110119 ; | [X]JPH01156390 ; | [X]JPS5263186 ; | [X]JPS5921541 ; | [X]US4767671 (PARKER ROBERT S R [GB], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,10,11 * column 1, line 5 - column 3, line 18 *; | [DY]EP0870450 (SAINT GOBAIN VITRAGE [FR]) [DY] 12 * abstract *; | [X]EP0908500 (CANON KK [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,10,11 * the whole document *; | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980930), vol. 1998, no. 11, & JP10167764 A 19980623 (MATSUMOTO AKIO) [X] 1,3-5,11,13,14 * abstract * [Y] 12 | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1985, no. 05, Database accession no. 1985-030582, XP002146044 & SU1101444 A 19840707 (LENGD RAIL TRANSP) [X] 1,2,4-7 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1990, no. 22, Database accession no. 1990-168384, XP002146045 & JPH02110119 A 19900423 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEM INC) [X] 1,2,4-6,11 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890914), vol. 013, no. 417, Database accession no. (C - 636), & JP01156390 A 19890619 (OJI KAKO KK) [X] 1,2,4-6 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1977, no. 40, Database accession no. 1977-71183Y, XP002146046 & JPS5263186 A 19770525 (SHIN NITTO KAGAKU) [X] 1,2,4-6 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840518), vol. 008, no. 106, Database accession no. (C - 223), & JP59021541 A 19840203 (KATSUO SHIKAMATA) [X] 1,2,4,5 * abstract * |