EP1230730 - AMPLIFIER WITH IMPROVED, HIGH PRECISION, HIGH SPEED AND LOW POWER CONSUMPTION ARCHITECTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.06.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.07.2010 [2010/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG Am Campeon 1-12 85579 Neubiberg / DE | [2010/22] |
Former [2009/32] | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG St.-Martin-Strasse 53 81669 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/20] | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG St.-Martin-Strasse 53 81669 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/18] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 16483 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2002/33] | For all designated states TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON 164 80 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STOCHINO, Giovanni Via Conte di Carmagnola, 32 I-00176 Rome / IT | [2002/33] | Representative(s) | Faggioni, Carlo Maria, et al Fumero S.r.l. Pettenkoferstrasse 20/22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Faggioni, Carlo Maria, et al Fumero Studio Consulenza Brevetti Snc Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 Munich / DE | ||
Former [2004/39] | Faggioni, Carlo Maria, Dr. Ing., et al Fumero Studio Consulenza Brevetti Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 Munich / DE | ||
Former [2002/33] | Vatti, Paolo, Dr. Ing., et al Fumero Studio Consulenza Brevetti Snc Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00931505.2 | 15.06.2000 | [2002/33] | WO2000IB00803 | Priority number, date | IT1999MI01371 | 18.06.1999 Original published format: IT MI991371 | [2002/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0079680 | Date: | 28.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1230730 | Date: | 14.08.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.12.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1230730 | Date: | 05.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H03F3/30 | [2002/33] | CPC: |
H03F3/3001 (EP,US);
H03F3/3067 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [2004/20] |
Former [2002/33] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERSTÄRKER MIT HOCHLINEARER, SCHNELLEN ARCHITEKTUR UND GERINGEM LEISTUNGSVERBRAUCH | [2009/10] | English: | AMPLIFIER WITH IMPROVED, HIGH PRECISION, HIGH SPEED AND LOW POWER CONSUMPTION ARCHITECTURE | [2002/33] | French: | AMPLIFICATEUR A ARCHITECTURE DE HAUTE PRECISION, RAPIDE ET A FAIBLE CONSOMMATION D'ENERGIE | [2002/33] |
Former [2002/33] | VERSTÄRKER MIT HOCHLINEARER, SCHNELLENR ARCHITEKTUR UND GERINGEM LEISTUNGSVERBRAUCH | Entry into regional phase | 11.01.2002 | National basic fee paid | 11.01.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.01.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.01.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.01.2002 | Examination requested [2004/42] | 18.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 08.05.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 13.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 26.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 23.05.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 02.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.04.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 29.04.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/28] | Request for further processing for: | 02.08.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 28.07.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.08.2006 | Decision despatched | 11.02.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 11.02.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.02.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 18.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 05.08.2009 | [2010/08] | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0297639 (ALCATEL NV [NL], et al) [A] 6* abstract *; | [A]US4939480 (FRYE WILLIAM H [US], et al) [A] 1,8-10 * column 4, line 42 - column 6, line 66; figure 4 *; | [YA]US5212457 (FREY DOUGLAS R [US], et al) [Y] 1-5 * column 2, line 22 - column 3, line 38; figures 1,2 * [A] 8-10; | [Y]US5786731 (BALES JAMES E [US]) [Y] 1-5 * column 3, line 41 - column 6, line 3; figures 5,6 *; | [A]US5907262 (GRAEME JERALD G [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [Y] - GROSHEV V Y, "ASYMMETRICAL PUSH-PULL INTERMEDIATE STAGES FOR HIGH-SPEED OPERATIONAL AMPLIFIERS", TELECOMMUNICATIONS AND RADIO ENGINEERING,US,BEGELL HOUSE, INC., NEW YORK, NY, (19880401), vol. 43, no. 4, ISSN 0040-2508, pages 73 - 76, XP000086493 [Y] 1-5 * page 74 - page 75; figure 5 * |