EP1298315 - FUEL INJECTION PUMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.01.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.02.2009 [2009/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yanmar Co., Ltd. 1-32, Chayamachi Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0013 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/09] | For all designated states Yanmar Co., Ltd. 1-32, Chayamachi Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0013 / JP | ||
Former [2003/14] | For all designated states Yanmar Co., Ltd. 1-32, Chayamachi, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0013 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ITSUKI, Seiji, Yanmar Diesel Engine Co., Ltd 1-32, Chayamachi, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0013 / JP | 02 /
HATTORI, Satoshi, Yanmar Diesel Engine Co., Ltd 1-32, Chayamachi, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0013 / JP | 03 /
IMANAKA, Hajimu, Kanmar Diesel Engine Co., Ltd 1-32, Chayamachi, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0013 / JP | 04 /
SAMO, Junichi, Yanmar Diesel Engine Co., Ltd 1-32, Chayamachi, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0013 / JP | 05 /
TANAKA, Masamichi, Yanmar Diesel Engine Co., Ltd 1-32, Chayamachi, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0013 / JP | 06 /
YOKOME, Yoshihiro, Yanmar Diesel Engine Co., Ltd 1-32, Chayamachi, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0013 / JP | [2003/14] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/14] | Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel Möhlstrasse 37 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00931590.4 | 26.05.2000 | [2003/14] | WO2000JP03426 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0190569 | Date: | 29.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1298315 | Date: | 02.04.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1298315 | Date: | 27.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.11.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F02M59/48, F02M45/06, F02M41/12, F02M59/28, F02M59/26, F02M37/04, F04B53/00, F04B53/22, F02M59/36 | [2005/01] | CPC: |
F02M59/265 (EP,US);
F02D1/025 (EP,US);
F02D1/10 (EP,US);
F02M39/02 (EP,US);
F02M41/06 (EP,US);
F02M41/063 (EP,US);
F02M41/066 (EP,US);
F02M59/102 (EP,US);
F02M59/28 (EP,US);
F02M59/34 (EP,US);
F02M59/362 (EP,US);
F02M59/366 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2004/40] | F02M59/48, F02M45/06 | ||
Former IPC [2003/14] | F02M59/48, F02M59/34, F02M59/36, F02M59/20, F02M59/26, F02D1/08, F02D1/16, F02D31/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2004/20] |
Former [2003/14] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | KRAFTSTOFFEINSPRITZPUMPE | [2003/14] | English: | FUEL INJECTION PUMP | [2003/14] | French: | POMPE D'INJECTION DE CARBURANT | [2003/14] | Entry into regional phase | 23.12.2002 | Translation filed | 23.12.2002 | National basic fee paid | 23.12.2002 | Search fee paid | 23.12.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.12.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.11.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 23.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/14] | 23.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.01.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 14.01.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.11.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0055245 (FRIEDMANN & MAIER AG [AT]) [X] 1 * abstract * [A] 4,5; | [XA]GB482680 (GARDNER & SONS LTD, et al) [X] 1,2 * page 2, line 50 - line 66; figure 1 * [A] 5; | [AX]DE2314596 (FRIEDMANN & MAIER AG) [A] 1 * page 5 - page 7; figures 1-5 * * page 5, line 27 - line 28; figures 1,3 * * page 8, line 3 - line 8; figure 9 * * figure 1 * [X] 7,8,5; | [XA]US2223755 (VIKTOR DILLSTROM TORBJORN) [X] 5,7,8 * page 2, column RIGHT, line 33 - page 3, column RIGHT, line 5; figures 1-3,6 * * page 5, column RIGHT, line 34 - line 72; figures 16,17 * [A] 9; | [X]US4526150 (GUENTERT JOSEF [DE], et al) [X] 7-9 * figure 5 *; | [XA]US4831988 (HOEFKEN WILFRIED [DE], et al) [X] 7,8,11,14 * the whole document * [A] 9,10; | [A]GB1462210 (ALLIS CHALMERS) [A] 1,2 * page 3, line 58 - line 97 *; | [A]US3739809 (ULBING O) [A] 7-9 * column 11, line 14 - column 16, line 18; figures 1,3a-3c * | International search | [X]JPS4914816 ; | [Y]JPH10196405 (KUBOTA KK); | [Y]JPH0466772 (YANMAR DIESEL ENGINE CO); | [X]JPH1030515 (KUBOTA KK); | [X]JPH0432258U ; | [X]JPS5121020U ; | [Y]JPS5061216U ; | [Y]JPS5968143U ; | [Y]JPS5827574U ; | [Y]JPS55156219U |