EP1145935 - POSITIONING MECHANISM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.03.2006 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.03.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.05.2006 [2006/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koyo Seiko Co., Ltd. 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-8502 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/42] | For all designated states KOYO SEIKO CO., LTD. 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-8502 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NOMURA, Keiji, c/o Koyo Seiko Co., Ltd. 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-8502 / JP | 02 /
TOMITA, Takehito, c/o Koyo Seiko Co., Ltd. 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-8502 / JP | 03 /
UMETANI, Akihisa, c/o Koyo Seiko Co., Ltd. 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-8502 / JP | 04 /
IINO, Takeo, c/o Koyo Seiko Co., Ltd. 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-8502 / JP | [2005/19] |
Former [2001/42] | 01 /
NOMURA, Keiji, Koyo Seiko Co., Ltd. 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-8502 / JP | ||
02 /
TOMITA, Takehito, Koyo Seiko Co., Ltd. 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-8502 / JP | |||
03 /
UMETANI, Akihisa, Koyo Seiko Co., Ltd. 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-8502 / JP | |||
04 /
IINO, Takeo, Koyo Seiko Co., Ltd. 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-8502 / JP | Representative(s) | Hering, Hartmut Patentanwälte Berendt, Leyh & Hering Innere Wiener Strasse 20 81667 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/42] | Hering, Hartmut, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Berendt, Leyh & Hering Innere Wiener Strasse 20 81667 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00931663.9 | 02.06.2000 | [2001/42] | WO2000JP03576 | Priority number, date | JP19990331314 | 22.11.1999 Original published format: JP 33131499 | [2001/42] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0138160 | Date: | 31.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1145935 | Date: | 17.10.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1145935 | Date: | 18.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 31.05.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B62D5/083 | [2001/42] | CPC: |
B62D6/02 (EP,US);
B62D5/09 (KR);
B62D5/062 (EP,US);
B62D5/087 (KR);
B62D5/22 (KR);
F16D3/76 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | FR [2004/20] |
Former [2001/42] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | STELLEINRICHTUNG | [2001/42] | English: | POSITIONING MECHANISM | [2001/42] | French: | MECANISME DE POSITIONNEMENT | [2001/42] | Entry into regional phase | 07.06.2001 | Translation filed | 06.07.2001 | National basic fee paid | 06.07.2001 | Search fee paid | 06.07.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.07.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/42] | 29.11.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 05.02.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.02.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]JPS6318628U ; | [A]JPH01132819U ; | [A]JPH0330591U ; | [Y]JPH09136657 (KOYO SEIKO CO); | [Y]JPH09150749 (KOYO SEIKO CO); | [A]JPH10299786 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [Y]JPH10318382 (KOYO SEIKO CO) |