EP1166370 - SUPERCONDUCTOR COMPOSITE WIRE FOR CURRENT LIMITERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.05.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 01.08.2012 [2012/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AMERICAN SUPERCONDUCTOR CORPORATION Two Technology Drive Westborough, MA 01581 / US | For all designated states ABB Technology AG Affolternstrasse 44 8050 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2011/26] | For all designated states AMERICAN SUPERCONDUCTOR CORPORATION Two Technology Drive Westborough, MA 01581 / US | ||
For all designated states ABB Technology AG Affolternstrasse 44 8050 Zürich / CH | |||
Former [2002/27] | For all designated states AMERICAN SUPERCONDUCTOR CORPORATION Two Technology Drive Westborough, MA 01581 / US | ||
For all designated states ABB Technology AG Affolternstrasse 44 8050 Zürich / CH | |||
Former [2002/01] | For all designated states AMERICAN SUPERCONDUCTOR CORPORATION Two Technology Drive Westborough, MA 01581 / US | ||
For all designated states ABB Transmission & Distribution Technologies Ltd. Affolternstrasse 52 8050 Zürich / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MASON, Ralph, P. 38 Cambridge Street Chelmsford, MA 01824 / US | 02 /
CHRISTOPHERSON, Craig, J. 26 Anthony Drive Holden, MA 01520 / US | 03 /
ROBERTS, Peter, R. P.O. Box 1027 Groton, MA 10450 / US | 04 /
FLESHLER, Steven 531 Washington Street Brookline, MA 02446 / US | 05 /
RILEY, Gilber, N., Jr. 630 Hemenway Street Marlborough, MA 01752 / US | 06 /
KALSI, Swarn, S. 22 Minuteman Way Schrewsbury, MA 01545 / US | 07 /
SNITCHLER, Gregory, L. 64 Ireta Road Shrewsbury, MA 01545 / US | 08 /
DIEHL, Robert, C. 41 Hemlock Drive Holden, MA 01520 / US | 09 /
PAUL, Willi Bahnhofstrasse 103 A CH-5430 Wettingen / CH | 10 /
LAKNER, Martin Bollstrasse 28 CH-5413 Birmenstorf / CH | 11 /
BONMANN, Dietrich Siebengebirgsring 62 D-53340 Meckenheim / DE | 12 /
ZUEGER, Harry 7 Ch. de l'Etang CH-1219 Geneva / CH | 13 /
OTTO, Alexander 92 Garrison Road Chelmsford, MA 01824 / US | [2002/10] |
Former [2002/01] | 01 /
MASON, Ralph, P. 79 Maplewood Avenue Marlborough, MA 01752 / US | ||
02 /
CHRISTOPHERSON, Craig, J. 6 Wall Street, Apt. 2 Worcester, MA 01604 / US | |||
03 /
ROBERTS, Peter, R. P.O. Box 1027 Groton, MA 10450 / US | |||
04 /
FLESHLER, Steven 259 Lexington Street Watertown, MA 02472 / US | |||
05 /
RILEY, Gilber, N., Jr. 630 Hemenway Street Marlborough, MA 01752 / US | |||
06 /
KALSI, Swarn, S. 22 Minuteman Way Schrewsbury, MA 01545 / US | |||
07 /
SNITCHLER, Gregory, L. 64 Ireta Road Shrewsbury, MA 01545 / US | |||
08 /
DIEHL, Robert, C. 41 Hemlock Drive Holden, MA 01520 / US | |||
09 /
PAUL, Willi Bahnhofstrasse 103 A CH-5430 Wettingen / CH | |||
10 /
LAKNER, Martin Bollstrasse 28 CH-5413 Birmenstorf / CH | |||
11 /
BONMANN, Dietrich Siebengebirgsring 62 D-53340 Meckenheim / DE | |||
12 /
ZUEGER, Harry 7 Ch. de l'Etang CH-1219 Geneva / CH | |||
13 /
OTTO, Alexander 92 Garrison Road Chelmsford, MA 01824 / US | Representative(s) | ABB Patent Attorneys C/o ABB Schweiz AG Intellectual Property CH-IP Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | ABB Patent Attorneys C/o ABB Schweiz AG Intellectual Property (CH-LC/IP), Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | ||
Former [2002/08] | ABB Patent Attorneys c/o ABB Business Services Ltd, Intellectual Property (SLE-I), Haselstrasse 16/699 5401 Baden / CH | ||
Former [2002/01] | Kaiser, Helmut, Dr. ABB Business Services Ltd., Intellectual Property (SLE-I), Haselstrasse 16/699 5401 Baden / CH | Application number, filing date | 00931914.6 | 22.03.2000 | [2002/01] | WO2000US07530 | Priority number, date | US19990274438 | 22.03.1999 Original published format: US 274438 | US20000488742 | 20.01.2000 Original published format: US 488742 | [2002/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0057493 | Date: | 28.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/39] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1166370 | Date: | 02.01.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.09.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1166370 | Date: | 29.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H01L39/16 | [2010/46] | CPC: |
H01B12/16 (EP,US);
H10N60/30 (EP,US);
H01F2027/2819 (EP,US);
Y02E40/60 (EP,US);
Y10S505/881 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/01] | H01L39/16, H02H9/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, DK, FR, GB, IT [2004/20] |
Former [2002/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SUPRALEITER-VERBUNDDRAHT FÜR STROMBEGRENZER | [2002/01] | English: | SUPERCONDUCTOR COMPOSITE WIRE FOR CURRENT LIMITERS | [2002/01] | French: | MATERIAU COMPOSITE LIMITEUR DE COURANT | [2002/01] | Entry into regional phase | 08.10.2001 | National basic fee paid | 08.10.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.10.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.10.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 08.10.2001 | Examination requested [2002/01] | 10.12.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.11.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 06.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.04.2008 | Opposition(s) | 30.03.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/23] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 06.01.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 06.01.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 24.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2003 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   23.05.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 29.06.2011 | [2012/31] | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPH06309955 ; | [YA]US4700257 (BEKHALED MOHAMMED [FR]); | [A]WO9403955 (ARCH DEV CORP [US]); | JPH06309955 [ ] (HITACHI CABLE); | [Y]DE19746975 (ABB RESEARCH LTD [CH]); | [PX]US5912607 (KALSI SWARN S [US], et al); | [PXPA]WO0010176 (AMERICAN SUPERCONDUCTOR CORP [US], et al); |