EP1191902 - Intraurethral device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/14] | INTRAURETHRAL DEVICE AND METHOD | ||
[2004/24] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.01.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HK Medical Technologies Incorporated Suite 404, 2391 Northeast Loop 410 San Antonio, TX 78217 / US | [2002/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIGACHYOV, Valery 25018 Granite Path San Antonio, TX 78258 / US | 02 /
PHAM, Tu, T. 6434 Spanish Earth San Antonio, TX 78233 / US | [2002/14] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/14] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00931967.4 | 28.04.2000 | [2002/14] | WO2000US11502 | Priority number, date | US19990302856 | 30.04.1999 Original published format: US 302856 | [2002/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0066054 | Date: | 09.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1191902 | Date: | 03.04.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.11.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1191902 | Date: | 09.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.11.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/00, A61M1/00, A61F2/06 | [2002/37] | CPC: |
A61F2/0009 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/14] | A61F2/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/14] | Title | German: | Intraurethrale Vorrichtung | [2004/24] | English: | Intraurethral device | [2004/24] | French: | Dispositif intra-uretral | [2004/24] |
Former [2002/14] | INTRAURETHRALE VORRICHTUNG UND METHODE | ||
Former [2002/14] | INTRAURETHRAL DEVICE AND METHOD | ||
Former [2002/14] | DISPOSITIF INTRA-URETRAL ET PROCEDE | Entry into regional phase | 07.11.2001 | National basic fee paid | 07.11.2001 | Search fee paid | 07.11.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.11.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.11.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 07.11.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/14] | 20.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.05.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.11.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 23.11.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.12.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.03.2005 | BE | 09.03.2005 | FI | 09.03.2005 | CY | 28.04.2005 | IE | 28.04.2005 | LU | 28.04.2005 | SE | 29.04.2005 | CH | 30.04.2005 | LI | 30.04.2005 | MC | 30.04.2005 | DK | 09.06.2005 | GR | 09.06.2005 | PT | 07.09.2005 | NL | 01.11.2005 | [2007/27] |
Former [2007/26] | AT | 09.03.2005 | |
BE | 09.03.2005 | ||
FI | 09.03.2005 | ||
CY | 28.04.2005 | ||
IE | 28.04.2005 | ||
LU | 28.04.2005 | ||
SE | 29.04.2005 | ||
CH | 30.04.2005 | ||
LI | 30.04.2005 | ||
DK | 09.06.2005 | ||
GR | 09.06.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
NL | 01.11.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | AT | 09.03.2005 | |
BE | 09.03.2005 | ||
FI | 09.03.2005 | ||
CY | 28.04.2005 | ||
IE | 28.04.2005 | ||
SE | 29.04.2005 | ||
CH | 30.04.2005 | ||
LI | 30.04.2005 | ||
LU | 09.05.2005 | ||
DK | 09.06.2005 | ||
GR | 09.06.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
NL | 01.11.2005 | ||
Former [2007/08] | AT | 09.03.2005 | |
BE | 09.03.2005 | ||
FI | 09.03.2005 | ||
IE | 28.04.2005 | ||
SE | 29.04.2005 | ||
CH | 30.04.2005 | ||
LI | 30.04.2005 | ||
LU | 09.05.2005 | ||
DK | 09.06.2005 | ||
GR | 09.06.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
NL | 01.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/25] | AT | 09.03.2005 | |
BE | 09.03.2005 | ||
FI | 09.03.2005 | ||
IE | 28.04.2005 | ||
SE | 29.04.2005 | ||
CH | 30.04.2005 | ||
LI | 30.04.2005 | ||
DK | 09.06.2005 | ||
GR | 09.06.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
NL | 01.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 09.03.2005 | |
BE | 09.03.2005 | ||
FI | 09.03.2005 | ||
SE | 29.04.2005 | ||
CH | 30.04.2005 | ||
LI | 30.04.2005 | ||
DK | 09.06.2005 | ||
GR | 09.06.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
NL | 01.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 09.03.2005 | |
BE | 09.03.2005 | ||
FI | 09.03.2005 | ||
SE | 29.04.2005 | ||
DK | 09.06.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 09.03.2005 | |
BE | 09.03.2005 | ||
FI | 09.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 09.03.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5701916 (KULISZ ANDRE A [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5* column 1, lines 20-49; figure 1 *; | [X]US5871016 (PHAM TU T [US]) [X] 1-10 * figures 1,7A,7B * | International search | [Y]US5352182 (KALB IRVIN M [US], et al); | [Y]US5618257 (KULISZ ANDRE A [US], et al); | [X]US5701916 (KULISZ ANDRE A [US], et al) |