EP1180021 - REGIMEN AND KIT FOR AMELIORATION OF PREMATURE EJACULATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.07.2005 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.08.2005 [2005/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PENTECH PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. 3315 Algonquin Road, Suite 310 Rolling Meadows, IL 60008 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/08] | For all designated states Pentech Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 3315 Algonquin Road, Suite 310 Rolling Meadows, IL 60008 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EL-RASHIDY, Ragab 130 Exmoor Court Deerfield, IL 60015 / US | 02 /
MCMAHON, Chris 20 Roslyn St., Potts Pt. Sydney, NSW 2011 / AU | [2002/08] | Representative(s) | Vossius, Volker, et al ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/15] | Vossius, Volker, Dr., et al Dr. Volker Vossius, Patentanwaltskanzlei - Rechtsanwaltskanzlei, Holbeinstrasse 5 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/08] | Savic, Bojan, et al Holbeinstrasse 5 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00932038.3 | 03.05.2000 | [2002/08] | WO2000US12067 | Priority number, date | US19990306273 | 06.05.1999 Original published format: US 306273 | [2002/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0067729 | Date: | 16.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1180021 | Date: | 20.02.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.11.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.11.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/20, A61P15/00 | [2005/02] | CPC: |
A61K31/4525 (EP,US);
A61P15/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2002/08] | A61K9/20 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/08] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEHANDLUNG DER PRÄMATUREN EJAKULATION UND DAZUGEHÖRIGER KIT | [2002/08] | English: | REGIMEN AND KIT FOR AMELIORATION OF PREMATURE EJACULATION | [2002/08] | French: | REGIME ET NECESSAIRE DESTINES A AMELIORER L'EJACULATION PRECOCE | [2002/08] | Entry into regional phase | 05.12.2001 | National basic fee paid | 05.12.2001 | Search fee paid | 05.12.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.12.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.11.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 05.12.2001 | Examination requested [2002/08] | 29.01.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.02.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/35] | 01.04.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2004 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   28.10.2004 | 31.05.2005 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PX] - MCMAHON C G ET AL, "TREATMENT OF PREMATURE EJACULATION WITH PAROXETINE HYDROCHLORIDE ASNEEDED: 2 SINGLE-BLIND PLACEBO CONTROLLED CROSSOVER STUDIES", JOURNAL OF UROLOGY, BALTIMORE, MD, US, (199906), vol. 161, no. 6, ISSN 0022-5347, pages 1826 - 1830, XP000980381 [PX] 1-28 * page 1826, column R, paragraph L - page 1830, column L, line 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0022-5347(05)68816-7 | [Y] - J.MOS ET AL., "A comparison of the effects of different serotonin reptake blockers on sexual behaviour of the male rat", EUROPEAN NEUROPSYCHOPHARMACOLOGY, (199901), vol. 9, no. 1-2, ISSN 0924-977X, pages 123 - 135, XP002307419 [Y] 1-28 * page 125, paragraph 3.2.2 - page 126 * * page 131, paragraph 5.5 - paragraph 5.6; table 8 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0924-977X(98)00015-7 | International search | [Y]US5276042 (CRENSHAW ROGER T [US], et al) |