EP1190489 - OPTIMUM TURBO DECODING ARCHITECTURE AND METHOD USING A CONSTANT OR QUASI-CONSTANT SIGNAL-TO-NOISE RATIO [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.09.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.09.2009 [2009/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/13] | For all designated states TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON (publ) 126 25 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHULIST, Matthias Täublingstr. 33 D-91058 Erlangen / DE | 02 /
GERSTENBERGER, Dirk Silkeborgsgatan 56 S-164 48 Kista / SE | 03 /
MARQUARDT, Michael Seehofallee 20 D-22177 Hamburg / DE | [2002/13] | Representative(s) | Mohsler, Gabriele, et al Ericsson GmbH Ericsson Allee 1 52134 Herzogenrath / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Mohsler, Gabriele, et al Ericsson GmbH Ericsson Allee 1 52134 Herzogenrath / DE | ||
Former [2002/46] | Mohsler, Gabriele, et al Ericsson Eurolab Deutschland GmbH, Patent Department, Neumeyerstrasse 50 90411 Nürnberg / DE | ||
Former [2002/13] | Schmalz, Günther Ericsson Eurolab Deutschland GmbH, Neumeyerstrasse 50 90411 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 00935061.2 | 18.05.2000 | [2002/13] | WO2000EP04495 | Priority number, date | US19990322169 | 28.05.1999 Original published format: US 322169 | [2002/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0074247 | Date: | 07.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1190489 | Date: | 27.03.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1190489 | Date: | 13.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H03M13/29, H04B7/005 | [2002/13] | CPC: |
H04W52/12 (EP,US);
H03M13/27 (KR);
H03M13/2957 (EP,US);
H03M13/612 (EP,US);
H03M13/658 (EP,US);
H04W52/20 (EP,US);
H04W52/24 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2002/46] |
Former [2002/13] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OPTIMALE TURBODEKODIERUNGSARCHITEKTUR UND VERFAHREN MIT ANWENDUNG EINES KONSTANTEN ODER QUASI-KONSTANTEN SIGNAL-RAUSCHVERHÄLTNISSES | [2002/13] | English: | OPTIMUM TURBO DECODING ARCHITECTURE AND METHOD USING A CONSTANT OR QUASI-CONSTANT SIGNAL-TO-NOISE RATIO | [2002/13] | French: | ARCHITECTURE ET PROCEDE DE TURBODECODAGE OPTIMAL DANS LESQUELS UN RAPPORT SIGNAL-BRUIT CONSTANT OU QUASI CONSTANT EST UTILISE | [2002/13] | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.2001 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.12.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.12.2001 | Examination requested [2002/13] | 21.05.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.06.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.07.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 17.07.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 13.11.2002 | IT | 13.11.2002 | [2007/35] |
Former [2006/14] | FR | 13.11.2002 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0715423 (AT & T CORP [US]) [A] 1,10,13,17,23,24 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0849887 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 1,13,23 * column 2, line 39 - column 3, line 55; figure 2 *; | [A]WO9905808 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [A] 1,2 * abstract *; | [A]US5479447 (CHOW PETER S [US], et al); | [A]WO9858461 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) | [A] - SAMPATH A ET AL, "ON SETTING REVERSE LINK TARGET SIR IN A CDMA SYSTEM", IEEE VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE,US,NEW YORK, IEEE, (1997), vol. CONF. 47, ISBN 0-7803-3660-7, pages 929 - 933, XP000736744 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/VETEC.1997.600465 |