EP1194777 - METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS RELATING TO PANCREATIC ISLET AND BETA-CELL DYSFUNCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 06.11.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2009 | Revocation of patent | published on 09.12.2009 [2009/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PROTEOME SCIENCES PLC Coveham House, Downside Bridge Road Cobham Surrey KT11 3EP / GB | For all designated states University of Geneva 1 Rue Michel Servet 1211 Geneva 4 / CH | [2006/47] |
Former [2006/38] | For all designated states PROTEOME SCIENCES PLC Coveham House, Downside Bridge Road Cobham, Surrey KT11 3EP / GB | ||
For all designated states University of Geneva 1 Rue Michel Servet 1211 Geneva 4 / CH | |||
Former [2002/15] | For all designated states PROTEOME SCIENCES PLC Coveham House, Downside Bridge Road Cobham, Surrey KT11 3EP / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAWTHORNE, Michael The University of Buckingham Yeomanry House Hunter Street Buckingham MK18 1EG / GB | 02 /
SANCHEZ, Jean-Charles Frank-Thomas 42 CH-1208 Geneva / CH | [2002/15] | Representative(s) | Kiddle, Simon John, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/15] | Kiddle, Simon John, et al Mewburn Ellis, York House, 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 00935381.4 | 01.06.2000 | [2002/15] | WO2000GB02118 | Priority number, date | GB19990014890 | 25.06.1999 Original published format: GB 9914890 | [2002/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0101130 | Date: | 04.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1194777 | Date: | 10.04.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.01.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1194777 | Date: | 22.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/50, G01N33/68, C07K14/47 | [2002/15] | CPC: |
G01N33/507 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
C07K14/4702 (EP);
G01N33/5008 (EP);
G01N33/5023 (EP);
G01N33/6803 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/15] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | METHODEN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN BEZÜGLICH PANKREATISCHER INSELZELLEN- UND BETA-ZELLEN- DYSFUNKTION | [2006/23] | English: | METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS RELATING TO PANCREATIC ISLET AND BETA-CELL DYSFUNCTION | [2002/15] | French: | PROCEDES ET COMPOSITIONS SE RAPPORTANT AU DYSFONCTIONS DES ILOTS PANCREATIQUES ET DES CELLULES BETA | [2002/15] |
Former [2002/15] | METHODEN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN BEZÜGLICH PANKRATISCHER INSELZELLEN- UND BETA-ZELLEN- DYSFUNKTION | Entry into regional phase | 17.01.2002 | National basic fee paid | 17.01.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.01.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.12.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.01.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/15] | 17.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.08.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 14.08.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
14.08.2007
ADMISSIBLE Pride Proteomics A/S Forskerparken 10C 5230 Odense M / DK Opponent's representative Orsnes, Henrik Egede Orsnes Patent Sentvedvej 23 5853 Oerbaek / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2007/43] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
14.08.2007
ADMISSIBLE Pride Proteomics A/S Forskerparken 10C 5230 Odense M / DK Opponent's representative Orsnes, Henrik Egede Orsnes Patent Forskerparken 10 5230 Odense M / DK | 04.10.2007 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 21.07.2009 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 31.07.2009 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2009/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.11.2006 | BE | 22.11.2006 | CH | 22.11.2006 | CY | 22.11.2006 | FI | 22.11.2006 | FR | 22.11.2006 | IT | 22.11.2006 | LI | 22.11.2006 | NL | 22.11.2006 | DK | 22.02.2007 | SE | 22.02.2007 | DE | 23.02.2007 | GR | 23.02.2007 | ES | 05.03.2007 | PT | 23.04.2007 | GB | 01.06.2007 | IE | 01.06.2007 | LU | 01.06.2007 | MC | 30.06.2007 | [2009/37] |
Former [2008/52] | AT | 22.11.2006 | |
BE | 22.11.2006 | ||
CH | 22.11.2006 | ||
FI | 22.11.2006 | ||
FR | 22.11.2006 | ||
IT | 22.11.2006 | ||
LI | 22.11.2006 | ||
NL | 22.11.2006 | ||
DK | 22.02.2007 | ||
SE | 22.02.2007 | ||
DE | 23.02.2007 | ||
GR | 23.02.2007 | ||
ES | 05.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
GB | 01.06.2007 | ||
IE | 01.06.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/25] | AT | 22.11.2006 | |
BE | 22.11.2006 | ||
CH | 22.11.2006 | ||
FI | 22.11.2006 | ||
IT | 22.11.2006 | ||
LI | 22.11.2006 | ||
NL | 22.11.2006 | ||
DK | 22.02.2007 | ||
SE | 22.02.2007 | ||
DE | 23.02.2007 | ||
GR | 23.02.2007 | ||
ES | 05.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
GB | 01.06.2007 | ||
IE | 01.06.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
FR | 13.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/23] | AT | 22.11.2006 | |
BE | 22.11.2006 | ||
CH | 22.11.2006 | ||
FI | 22.11.2006 | ||
IT | 22.11.2006 | ||
LI | 22.11.2006 | ||
NL | 22.11.2006 | ||
DK | 22.02.2007 | ||
SE | 22.02.2007 | ||
DE | 23.02.2007 | ||
GR | 23.02.2007 | ||
ES | 05.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
IE | 01.06.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
FR | 13.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 22.11.2006 | |
BE | 22.11.2006 | ||
CH | 22.11.2006 | ||
FI | 22.11.2006 | ||
IT | 22.11.2006 | ||
LI | 22.11.2006 | ||
NL | 22.11.2006 | ||
DK | 22.02.2007 | ||
SE | 22.02.2007 | ||
DE | 23.02.2007 | ||
GR | 23.02.2007 | ||
ES | 05.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | AT | 22.11.2006 | |
BE | 22.11.2006 | ||
CH | 22.11.2006 | ||
FI | 22.11.2006 | ||
IT | 22.11.2006 | ||
LI | 22.11.2006 | ||
NL | 22.11.2006 | ||
DK | 22.02.2007 | ||
SE | 22.02.2007 | ||
DE | 23.02.2007 | ||
ES | 05.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | AT | 22.11.2006 | |
BE | 22.11.2006 | ||
CH | 22.11.2006 | ||
FI | 22.11.2006 | ||
IT | 22.11.2006 | ||
LI | 22.11.2006 | ||
NL | 22.11.2006 | ||
DK | 22.02.2007 | ||
SE | 22.02.2007 | ||
DE | 23.02.2007 | ||
ES | 05.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/39] | AT | 22.11.2006 | |
BE | 22.11.2006 | ||
CH | 22.11.2006 | ||
FI | 22.11.2006 | ||
IT | 22.11.2006 | ||
LI | 22.11.2006 | ||
NL | 22.11.2006 | ||
DK | 22.02.2007 | ||
SE | 22.02.2007 | ||
ES | 05.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/37] | AT | 22.11.2006 | |
BE | 22.11.2006 | ||
CH | 22.11.2006 | ||
FI | 22.11.2006 | ||
IT | 22.11.2006 | ||
LI | 22.11.2006 | ||
NL | 22.11.2006 | ||
DK | 22.02.2007 | ||
SE | 22.02.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/36] | AT | 22.11.2006 | |
BE | 22.11.2006 | ||
CH | 22.11.2006 | ||
FI | 22.11.2006 | ||
IT | 22.11.2006 | ||
LI | 22.11.2006 | ||
NL | 22.11.2006 | ||
SE | 22.02.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/35] | AT | 22.11.2006 | |
BE | 22.11.2006 | ||
CH | 22.11.2006 | ||
FI | 22.11.2006 | ||
IT | 22.11.2006 | ||
LI | 22.11.2006 | ||
NL | 22.11.2006 | ||
SE | 22.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/30] | AT | 22.11.2006 | |
BE | 22.11.2006 | ||
CH | 22.11.2006 | ||
FI | 22.11.2006 | ||
LI | 22.11.2006 | ||
NL | 22.11.2006 | ||
SE | 22.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/28] | AT | 22.11.2006 | |
FI | 22.11.2006 | ||
NL | 22.11.2006 | ||
SE | 22.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/25] | FI | 22.11.2006 | |
SE | 22.02.2007 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9715310 (UNIV FLORIDA [US]) [X] 1-32,34-38,40-52 * page 18, line 21 - page 19, line 1 *; | [E]WO0046369 (CHIRON CORP [US], et al) [E] 1-32,34-38,40-52 * claim 13 * * page 30, line 13 - page 31, line 14 * * page 32, line 22 - page 33, line 22 *; | [X] - EDVARDSSON ULRIKA ET AL, "A proteome analysis of livers from obese (ob/ob) mice treated with the peroxisome proliferator WY14,643.", ELECTROPHORESIS, (199904), vol. 20, no. 4-5, ISSN 0173-0835, pages 935 - 942, XP000964564 [X] 1-32,34-38,40-52 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1522-2683(19990101)20:4/5<935::AID-ELPS935>3.0.CO;2-6 | [X] - SHIMADA A ET AL, "BETA-CELL DESTRUCTION MAY BE A LATE CONSEQUENCE OF THE AUTOIMMUNE PROCESS IN NONOBESE DIABETIC MICE", DIABETES,US,NEW YORK, NY, (19960801), vol. 45, no. 8, ISSN 0012-1797, pages 1063 - 1067, XP000603754 [X] 1-32,34-38,40-52 * page 1064, column L, paragraph F - column R, paragraph 1; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2337/diabetes.45.8.1063 |