EP1233666 - COOLING STRUCTURE OF COMMUNICATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.08.2008 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2006/18] |
Former [2002/34] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIMOJI, Mihoko, Mitsubishi Denki K. K. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 02 /
OZAKI, Eiichi, Mitsubishi Denki K.K. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 03 /
NAKAO, Kazushige, Mitsubishi Denki K.K. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 04 /
OGUSHI, Tetsurou, Mitsubishi Denki K.K. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 05 /
HIRAO, Koichi, Mitsubishi Denki K.K. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 06 /
HASEGAWA, Manabu, Mitsubishi Denki K.K. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 07 /
KOBAYASHI, Takashi, Mitsubishi Denki K.K. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 08 /
YOSHIZAWA, Jiro, Mitsubishi Denki K.K. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2002/34] | Representative(s) | Sajda, Wolf E., et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/34] | Sajda, Wolf E., Dipl.-Phys., et al MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00935550.4 | 06.06.2000 | [2002/34] | WO2000JP03655 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0195687 | Date: | 13.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1233666 | Date: | 21.08.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.12.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.12.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H05K7/20, H05K9/00, H04M1/02, G06F1/20 | [2005/15] | CPC: |
H05K7/20445 (EP,US);
H05K9/0024 (US);
H05K9/0026 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2002/34] | H05K7/20 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/22] |
Former [2002/34] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | KÜHLSTRUKTUR EINER KOMMUNIKATIONSEINRICHTUNG | [2002/34] | English: | COOLING STRUCTURE OF COMMUNICATION DEVICE | [2002/34] | French: | STRUCTURE DE REFROIDISSEMENT D'UN DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATION | [2002/34] | Entry into regional phase | 06.02.2002 | Translation filed | 06.02.2002 | National basic fee paid | 06.02.2002 | Search fee paid | 06.02.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.02.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.02.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/34] | 19.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 30.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2000137548 ; | [A]JPH10290087 ; | [X]EP0130279 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2 * column 3, line 3 - column 4, line 44 * * figure 5 *; | [A]US5801330 (GADEMANN LOTHAR [DE], et al) [A] 3* the whole document *; | [A]JPH10290087 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5991155 (KOBAYASHI TAKASHI [JP], et al) [Y] 7,8 * abstract * * figures 1,4,6 * * column 5, line 16 - line 33 * * column 7, line 6 - line 36 *; | [X]US6049469 (HOOD III CHARLES D [US], et al) [X] 3 * abstract * * column 1, line 15 - line 19 * * column 3, paragraph 4 * * column 7, line 47 - column 8, line 17 *; | [A]US2002051339 (OHASHI SHIGEO [JP], et al) [A] 1-8 * figures 1,3 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20001006), vol. 2000, no. 08, & JP2000137548 A 20000516 (FUJITSU LTD) [X] 1,3 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0036] * * figures 1-7 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990129), vol. 1999, no. 01, & JP10290087 A 19981027 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1-8 * abstract * | International search | [Y]JPS6223491U ; | [Y]JPH03257997 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [Y]JPH0446591U ; | [Y]JPH0451192U ; | [Y]JPH0730280 (SONY CORP); | [Y]JPH07226466 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [Y]US5801330 (GADEMANN LOTHAR [DE], et al) |