EP1183544 - SYSTEM-ON-A-CHIP WITH A REPROGRAMMABLE TESTER, DEBUGGER, AND BUS MONITOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/10] | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR IMPLEMENTING A WIRELESS SYSTEM-ON-A-CHIP WITH A REPROGRAMMABLE TESTER, DEBUGGER, AND BUS MONITOR | ||
[2005/20] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.09.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, FR | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG St.-Martin-Strasse 53 81669 München / DE | [2008/30] |
Former [2005/45] | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG St.-Martin-Strasse 53 81669 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/29] | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG St.-Martin-Strasse 53 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/10] | For all designated states Morphics Technology, Inc. 1550 S. Bascom Avenue Campbell, CA 95008-0638 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RIEKEN, Keith 21603 La Playa Court Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | [2002/10] | Representative(s) | Zinkler, Franz, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | Zinkler, Franz, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | ||
Former [2004/10] | Zinkler, Franz, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler, Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | ||
Former [2002/10] | Naismith, Robert Stewart, et al CRUIKSHANK & FAIRWEATHER 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow, G1 3AE Scotland / GB | Application number, filing date | 00935874.8 | 05.05.2000 | [2002/10] | WO2000US12472 | Priority number, date | US19990133140P | 07.05.1999 Original published format: US 133140 P | [2002/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0068698 | Date: | 16.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1183544 | Date: | 06.03.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.11.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1183544 | Date: | 09.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.11.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/3185 | [2005/03] | CPC: |
G01R31/3187 (EP,US);
H04W24/08 (KR);
G01R31/31705 (EP,US);
G01R31/318533 (EP,US);
G01R31/318555 (EP,US);
H04W24/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/10] | G01R31/28 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/10] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | System auf einem Chip mit reprogrammierbarem Testgerät, Fehlerbeseitiger und Busüberwachung | [2005/20] | English: | SYSTEM-ON-A-CHIP WITH A REPROGRAMMABLE TESTER, DEBUGGER, AND BUS MONITOR | [2005/20] | French: | SYSTEME SUR UNE PUCE AVEC UN DISPOSITIF REPROGRAMMABLE DE VERIFICATION, DEBOGUEUR, ET MONITEUR DE BUS | [2005/20] |
Former [2002/10] | GERäTUND VERFAHREN ZUR UNSETZUNG EINES DRAHTLASEN SYSTEM AUF EINER CHIP MIT PROGRAMMIERBAREN TESTGERäT, FEHLERBESEITIGER UND BUSüBERWACHUNG | ||
Former [2002/10] | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR IMPLEMENTING A WIRELESS SYSTEM-ON-A-CHIP WITH A REPROGRAMMABLE TESTER, DEBUGGER, AND BUS MONITOR | ||
Former [2002/10] | APPAREIL ET PROCEDE DE MISE EN OEUVRE D'UN SYSTEME SANS FIL SUR UNE PUCE A L'AIDE D'UN DISPOSITIF DE VERIFICATION, DEBOGUEUR, ET MONITEUR DE BUS | Entry into regional phase | 22.11.2001 | National basic fee paid | 22.11.2001 | Search fee paid | 22.11.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.11.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.11.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 22.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/10] | 10.02.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.05.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.09.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 12.09.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2003 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   14.10.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.11.2005 | BE | 09.11.2005 | CH | 09.11.2005 | CY | 09.11.2005 | FI | 09.11.2005 | FR | 09.11.2005 | IT | 09.11.2005 | LI | 09.11.2005 | NL | 09.11.2005 | DK | 09.02.2006 | GR | 09.02.2006 | SE | 09.02.2006 | ES | 20.02.2006 | PT | 10.04.2006 | GB | 05.05.2006 | IE | 05.05.2006 | LU | 05.05.2006 | MC | 31.05.2006 | [2009/01] |
Former [2008/36] | AT | 09.11.2005 | |
BE | 09.11.2005 | ||
CH | 09.11.2005 | ||
FI | 09.11.2005 | ||
IT | 09.11.2005 | ||
LI | 09.11.2005 | ||
NL | 09.11.2005 | ||
DK | 09.02.2006 | ||
GR | 09.02.2006 | ||
SE | 09.02.2006 | ||
ES | 20.02.2006 | ||
PT | 10.04.2006 | ||
GB | 05.05.2006 | ||
IE | 05.05.2006 | ||
LU | 05.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/35] | AT | 09.11.2005 | |
BE | 09.11.2005 | ||
CH | 09.11.2005 | ||
FI | 09.11.2005 | ||
IT | 09.11.2005 | ||
LI | 09.11.2005 | ||
NL | 09.11.2005 | ||
DK | 09.02.2006 | ||
GR | 09.02.2006 | ||
SE | 09.02.2006 | ||
ES | 20.02.2006 | ||
PT | 10.04.2006 | ||
GB | 05.05.2006 | ||
IE | 05.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/28] | AT | 09.11.2005 | |
BE | 09.11.2005 | ||
CH | 09.11.2005 | ||
FI | 09.11.2005 | ||
LI | 09.11.2005 | ||
NL | 09.11.2005 | ||
DK | 09.02.2006 | ||
GR | 09.02.2006 | ||
SE | 09.02.2006 | ||
ES | 20.02.2006 | ||
PT | 10.04.2006 | ||
GB | 05.05.2006 | ||
IE | 05.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/25] | AT | 09.11.2005 | |
BE | 09.11.2005 | ||
CH | 09.11.2005 | ||
FI | 09.11.2005 | ||
LI | 09.11.2005 | ||
NL | 09.11.2005 | ||
DK | 09.02.2006 | ||
GR | 09.02.2006 | ||
SE | 09.02.2006 | ||
ES | 20.02.2006 | ||
PT | 10.04.2006 | ||
IE | 05.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/07] | AT | 09.11.2005 | |
BE | 09.11.2005 | ||
CH | 09.11.2005 | ||
FI | 09.11.2005 | ||
LI | 09.11.2005 | ||
NL | 09.11.2005 | ||
DK | 09.02.2006 | ||
GR | 09.02.2006 | ||
SE | 09.02.2006 | ||
ES | 20.02.2006 | ||
PT | 10.04.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | AT | 09.11.2005 | |
BE | 09.11.2005 | ||
CH | 09.11.2005 | ||
FI | 09.11.2005 | ||
LI | 09.11.2005 | ||
NL | 09.11.2005 | ||
DK | 09.02.2006 | ||
GR | 09.02.2006 | ||
SE | 09.02.2006 | ||
ES | 20.02.2006 | ||
PT | 10.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | AT | 09.11.2005 | |
BE | 09.11.2005 | ||
CH | 09.11.2005 | ||
FI | 09.11.2005 | ||
LI | 09.11.2005 | ||
NL | 09.11.2005 | ||
DK | 09.02.2006 | ||
GR | 09.02.2006 | ||
SE | 09.02.2006 | ||
ES | 20.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | AT | 09.11.2005 | |
BE | 09.11.2005 | ||
CH | 09.11.2005 | ||
FI | 09.11.2005 | ||
LI | 09.11.2005 | ||
NL | 09.11.2005 | ||
DK | 09.02.2006 | ||
SE | 09.02.2006 | ||
ES | 20.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/34] | AT | 09.11.2005 | |
CH | 09.11.2005 | ||
FI | 09.11.2005 | ||
LI | 09.11.2005 | ||
NL | 09.11.2005 | ||
DK | 09.02.2006 | ||
SE | 09.02.2006 | ||
ES | 20.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/33] | CH | 09.11.2005 | |
FI | 09.11.2005 | ||
LI | 09.11.2005 | ||
NL | 09.11.2005 | ||
SE | 09.02.2006 | ||
ES | 20.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/27] | FI | 09.11.2005 | |
NL | 09.11.2005 | ||
SE | 09.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/23] | FI | 09.11.2005 | |
NL | 09.11.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4940909 (MULDER THEODOR [US], et al) [A] 1-23* figure 1; claim 1 *; | [X]US5878051 (SHARMA SHANTI SWAROOP [US], et al) [X] 1-23 * column 2, line 18 - column 5, line 56; figure 2 *; | [A] - FAWCETT B K, "Taking advantage of reconfigurable logic", ASIC CONFERENCE AND EXHIBIT, 1994. PROCEEDINGS., SEVENTH ANNUAL IEEE INTERNATIONAL ROCHESTER, NY, USA 19-23 SEPT. 1994, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, (19940919), ISBN 0-7803-2020-4, pages 227 - 230, XP010140485 [A] 1-23 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ASIC.1994.404570 | International search | [Y]US5548717 (WOOLDRIDGE JAMES A [US], et al); | [Y]US5572664 (BUJANOS NORMAN [US]); | [Y]US5701417 (LEWIS IAN D [US], et al); | [Y]US5717704 (ROSENFELD ERIC H [US]); | [Y]US5764650 (DEBENHAM BRETT M [US]); | [A]US5768382 (SCHNEIER BRUCE [US], et al); | [Y]US5790568 (LUONG HUY H [US], et al); | [YP]US5909544 (ANDERSON MICHIEL M II [US], et al); | [YP]US5942981 (KACKMAN GERALD M [US]); | [Y] - CHRISTOPHER L., "A fully integrated digital demodulation and forward error correction IC for digital satellite television", IEEE,, (199502), pages 13.1.1 - 13.1.4, XP002930438 | [A] - OPPERMAN M., "Multichip-modules (MSMs) for micro- and millimeter-wave applications", IEEE,, (199808), pages 279 - 284, XP002930437 | [Y] - BROWN ET AL., "Reconfigurable digital baseband modulation for wireless computer communication", IEEE,, (199507), pages 610 - 616, XP002930436 | [A] - MOULDIN ET AL., "Low Probbability of detection tactical wireless LAN supporting command and control on the move", IEEE,, (199310), pages 585 - 589, XP002930435 |