EP1188246 - Reprogrammable digital wireless communication device and method of operating same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/12] | REPROGRAMMABLE DIGITAL WIRELESS COMMUNICATION DEVICE AND METHOD OF OPERATING SAME | ||
[2008/45] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.01.2010 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG St.-Martin-Strasse 53 81669 München / DE | [2008/30] |
Former [2004/29] | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG St.-Martin-Strasse 53 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/12] | For all designated states Morphics Technology, Inc. 1550 S. Bascom Avenue Campbell, CA 95008-0638 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUBRAMANIAN, Ravi 150 Alley Way Mountain View, CA 94040 / US | [2002/12] | Representative(s) | Zinkler, Franz Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/06] | Zinkler, Franz Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | ||
Former [2002/12] | Naismith, Robert Stewart, et al CRUIKSHANK & FAIRWEATHER 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow, G1 3AE Scotland / GB | Application number, filing date | 00935875.5 | 05.05.2000 | [2002/12] | WO2000US12473 | Priority number, date | US19990133129P | 07.05.1999 Original published format: US 133129 P | US19990133135P | 07.05.1999 Original published format: US 133135 P | US19990133137P | 07.05.1999 Original published format: US 133137 P | US19990133141P | 07.05.1999 Original published format: US 133141 P | [2002/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0069084 | Date: | 16.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1188246 | Date: | 20.03.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.11.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1188246 | Date: | 11.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.11.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/38 | [2002/12] | CPC: |
H04B1/0003 (EP);
H04B1/26 (KR);
H04B1/005 (EP);
H04B1/28 (EP);
H04B1/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/12] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Reprogrammierbare digitale drahtlose Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Nutzung derselben | [2008/45] | English: | Reprogrammable digital wireless communication device and method of operating same | [2008/45] | French: | Dispositif de communication numérique sans fil reprogrammable et procédé de fonctionnement | [2008/45] |
Former [2002/12] | BETRIEBSVERFAHREN UND DEPROGRAMMIERBARE DIGITALE DRAHTLOSE VORRICHTUNG | ||
Former [2002/12] | REPROGRAMMABLE DIGITAL WIRELESS COMMUNICATION DEVICE AND METHOD OF OPERATING SAME | ||
Former [2002/12] | DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATION NUMERIQUE SANS FIL REPROGRAMMABLE ET PROCEDE DE FONCTIONNEMENT | Entry into regional phase | 22.11.2001 | National basic fee paid | 22.11.2001 | Search fee paid | 22.11.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.11.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.11.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 22.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/12] | 06.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP06016938.0 / EP1746736 | Opposition(s) | 14.12.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2003 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   14.10.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.03.2009 | BE | 11.03.2009 | CY | 11.03.2009 | DK | 11.03.2009 | FI | 11.03.2009 | IT | 11.03.2009 | NL | 11.03.2009 | IE | 05.05.2009 | LU | 05.05.2009 | CH | 31.05.2009 | LI | 31.05.2009 | MC | 31.05.2009 | SE | 11.06.2009 | GR | 12.06.2009 | ES | 22.06.2009 | PT | 24.08.2009 | [2011/45] |
Former [2011/21] | AT | 11.03.2009 | |
BE | 11.03.2009 | ||
DK | 11.03.2009 | ||
FI | 11.03.2009 | ||
IT | 11.03.2009 | ||
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
IE | 05.05.2009 | ||
LU | 05.05.2009 | ||
CH | 31.05.2009 | ||
LI | 31.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
GR | 12.06.2009 | ||
ES | 22.06.2009 | ||
PT | 24.08.2009 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 11.03.2009 | |
BE | 11.03.2009 | ||
DK | 11.03.2009 | ||
FI | 11.03.2009 | ||
IT | 11.03.2009 | ||
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
IE | 05.05.2009 | ||
CH | 31.05.2009 | ||
LI | 31.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
GR | 12.06.2009 | ||
ES | 22.06.2009 | ||
PT | 24.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/47] | AT | 11.03.2009 | |
BE | 11.03.2009 | ||
DK | 11.03.2009 | ||
FI | 11.03.2009 | ||
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
IE | 05.05.2009 | ||
CH | 31.05.2009 | ||
LI | 31.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
GR | 12.06.2009 | ||
ES | 22.06.2009 | ||
PT | 24.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/21] | AT | 11.03.2009 | |
BE | 11.03.2009 | ||
DK | 11.03.2009 | ||
FI | 11.03.2009 | ||
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
IE | 05.05.2009 | ||
CH | 31.05.2009 | ||
LI | 31.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
ES | 22.06.2009 | ||
PT | 24.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | AT | 11.03.2009 | |
BE | 11.03.2009 | ||
DK | 11.03.2009 | ||
FI | 11.03.2009 | ||
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.05.2009 | ||
LI | 31.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
ES | 22.06.2009 | ||
PT | 24.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/04] | AT | 11.03.2009 | |
BE | 11.03.2009 | ||
FI | 11.03.2009 | ||
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
ES | 22.06.2009 | ||
PT | 24.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/49] | AT | 11.03.2009 | |
BE | 11.03.2009 | ||
FI | 11.03.2009 | ||
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
ES | 22.06.2009 | ||
PT | 24.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | AT | 11.03.2009 | |
BE | 11.03.2009 | ||
FI | 11.03.2009 | ||
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
ES | 22.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/43] | AT | 11.03.2009 | |
BE | 11.03.2009 | ||
FI | 11.03.2009 | ||
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/40] | AT | 11.03.2009 | |
FI | 11.03.2009 | ||
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/37] | FI | 11.03.2009 | |
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/34] | NL | 11.03.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - RABAEY J M, "Reconfigurable processing: the solution to low-power programmable DSP", ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING, 1997. ICASSP-97., 1997 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON MUNICH, GERMANY 21-24 APRIL 1997, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (19970421), vol. 1, ISBN 0-8186-7919-0, pages 275 - 278, XP010226188 [X] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICASSP.1997.599622 | [A] - TUTTLEBEE W, "Software radio-impacts and implications", SPREAD SPECTRUM TECHNIQUES AND APPLICATIONS, 1998. PROCEEDINGS., 1998 IEEE 5TH INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON SUN CITY, SOUTH AFRICA 2-4 SEPT. 1998, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19980902), vol. 2, ISBN 0-7803-4281-X, pages 541 - 545, XP010307620 [A] 6-10 * abstract * * page 543, paragraph 1 - page 544, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ISSSTA.1998.723843 | International search | [Y]US5539479 (BERTRAM RANDAL L [US]); | [Y]US5872810 (PHILIPS LIEVEN [BE], et al) |