EP1177297 - NOVEL NUCLEIC ACIDS AND PROTEINS WITH GROWTH HORMONE ACTIVITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.07.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2003 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.09.2003 [2003/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xencor 2585 Nina Street Pasadena, CA 91107-3708 / US | [2003/01] |
Former [2002/45] | For all designated states Xencor 111 W. Lemon Avenue Monrovia, CA 91016 / US | ||
Former [2002/06] | For all designated states Xencor, Inc. 111 W. Lemon Avenue Monrovia, CA 91016 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FILIKOV, Anton 2202 Fairgreen Avenue Monrovia, CA 91016 / US | [2002/06] | Representative(s) | Kiddle, Simon John, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/06] | Kiddle, Simon John, et al Mewburn Ellis, York House, 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 00935944.9 | 12.05.2000 | [2002/06] | WO2000US13175 | Priority number, date | US19990133784P | 12.05.1999 Original published format: US 133784 P | [2002/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0068385 | Date: | 16.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/46] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1177297 | Date: | 06.02.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.11.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/18, C07K14/61, A61K38/27, C12N5/10, // (A61P43/00, 21:00) | [2002/06] | CPC: |
C07K14/61 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/06 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/06] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NEUE NUKLEINSÄURE UND PROTEINE MIT WACHSTUMSHORMON-AKTIVITÄT | [2002/06] | English: | NOVEL NUCLEIC ACIDS AND PROTEINS WITH GROWTH HORMONE ACTIVITY | [2002/06] | French: | NOUVEAUX ACIDES NUCLEIQUES ET PROTEINES A ACTIVITE D'HORMONE DE CROISSANCE | [2002/06] | Entry into regional phase | 03.12.2001 | National basic fee paid | 03.12.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.12.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.12.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.12.2001 | Examination requested [2002/06] | 09.07.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2003 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9711178 (GENENTECH INC [US], et al) [X] 1-3,7,16-25 * page 7, line 17 - page 8 * * page 21, line 16 - page 41, line 26 * * page 51, line 23 - page 55, line 14 * * example - * * claim - *; | [DA]WO9847089 (CALIFORNIA INST OF TECHN [US]); | [X] - LOWMAN HENRY B ET AL, "Affinity maturation of human growth hormone by monovalent phage display.", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, (1993), vol. 234, no. 3, ISSN 0022-2836, pages 564 - 578, XP000953072 [X] 1-3,7,16-21 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/jmbi.1993.1612 | [X] - ULTSCH MARK H ET AL, "The crystal structure of affinity-matured human growth hormone at 2 A resolution.", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, (1994), vol. 236, no. 1, ISSN 0022-2836, pages 286 - 299, XP000953071 [X] 1-3,7,16-21 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/jmbi.1994.1135 | [DX] - ATWELL SHANE ET AL, "Structural plasticity in a remodeled protein-protein interface.", SCIENCE (WASHINGTON D C), (19971107), vol. 278, no. 5340, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 1125 - 1128, XP002150985 [DX] 1-3 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.278.5340.1125 | [A] - DAHIYAT B I ET AL, "PROTEIN DESIGN AUTOMATION", PROTEIN SCIENCE, (199605), vol. 5, no. 5, ISSN 0961-8368, pages 895 - 903, XP002073372 |