Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] |
12.11.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.12.2004 [2004/53] |
30.07.2004 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
16.07.2004 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
06.02.2004 | First examination report | |
03.02.2004 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
26.09.2003 | Supplementary search report | published on 12.11.2003 [2003/46] |
04.07.2003 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
13.09.2002 | Change - applicant | published on 30.10.2002 [2002/44] |
13.08.2002 | Change - extension states | |
05.07.2002 | Renewal fee | |
01.02.2002 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 20.03.2002 [2002/12] |
01.02.2002 | Request for examination filed | published on 20.03.2002 [2002/12] |
31.01.2002 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
29.01.2002 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
21.01.2002 | Amendment by applicant | |
05.03.2001 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
27.12.2000 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
12.07.2000 | PCT data prior to European publication |