Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
03.10.2008 | Change - representative | published on 05.11.2008 [2008/45] |
27.02.2004 | Deletion: Date of oral proceedings | |
27.02.2004 | Withdrawal of application | published on 14.04.2004 [2004/16] |
24.10.2003 | Change - representative | published on 10.12.2003 [2003/50] |
06.08.2003 | New entry: Date of oral proceedings | |
14.06.2003 | Examination report or reply | |
20.05.2003 | Renewal fee | |
15.04.2003 | Examination report or reply | |
13.12.2002 | First examination report | |
11.12.2002 | Examination report or reply | |
24.07.2002 | Change - extension states | |
22.05.2002 | Renewal fee | |
08.02.2002 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 27.03.2002 [2002/13] |
08.02.2002 | Request for examination filed | published on 27.03.2002 [2002/13] |
12.10.2001 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
06.02.2001 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
08.12.2000 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
04.12.2000 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
27.09.2000 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
19.07.2000 | PCT data prior to European publication |