EP1190578 - VIDEO ENCODER AND METHOD OF VIDEO ENCODING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 27.02.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2008 | Change - representative | published on 05.11.2008 [2008/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Motorola Limited Jays Close, Viables Industrial Estate Basingstoke Hampshire RG22 4PD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/13] | For all designated states Motorola Limited Jays Close, Viables Industrial Estate Basingstoke, Hampshire RG22 4PD / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAY, Anthony Richard 15 Plough Way, Winchester Hampshire SO22 4PX / GB | 02 /
HOBSON, Paola Marcella 24 Soper Grove, Basingstoke Hampshire RG21 5PU / GB | 03 /
McKEON, Kevin Michael Dairy Cottage, North Street, Bishop's Sutton Hampshire SO24 0AT / GB | [2002/13] | Representative(s) | McCormack, Derek James, et al Optimus Patents Limited Grove House Lutyens Close Chineham Court Basingstoke, Hampshire RG24 8AG / GB | [2008/45] |
Former [2003/50] | McCormack, Derek James, et al Motorola European Intellectual Property Operations Midpoint Alencon Link Basingstoke Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB | ||
Former [2002/13] | Treleven, Colin, et al Motorola European Intellectual Property Operations, Midpoint, Alencon Link Basingstoke, Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 00936795.4 | 24.05.2000 | [2002/13] | WO2000EP04752 | Priority number, date | GB19990012082 | 24.05.1999 Original published format: GB 9912082 | [2002/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0072603 | Date: | 30.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1190578 | Date: | 27.03.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/36, H04N7/50, H04N7/26 | [2002/13] | CPC: |
H04N19/507 (EP);
H04N19/17 (EP);
H04N19/20 (EP);
H04N19/30 (EP);
H04N19/61 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/13] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VIDEOCODER UND VERFAHREN DER VIDEOCODIERUNG | [2002/13] | English: | VIDEO ENCODER AND METHOD OF VIDEO ENCODING | [2002/13] | French: | CODEUR VIDEO ET PROCEDE DE CODAGE VIDEO | [2002/13] | Entry into regional phase | 27.12.2001 | National basic fee paid | 27.12.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.12.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.12.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.12.2001 | Examination requested [2002/13] | 16.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2004 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2004/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO9903279 (SARNOFF CORP) [X] 1-5,12-17 * the whole document * [Y] 6,8,9; | [YA]EP0707427 (AT & T CORP) [Y] 6,8 * column 4, line 39 - column 6, line 13 * * column 2, line 38 - column 2, line 51 * [A] 1-5,7,9-17; | [X]US5508743 (IIZUKA YOSHIO) [X] 1,2,7 * column 3, line 16 - column 3, line 57 * * figure 3 *; | [A]US5486862 (YAGASAKI YOICHI) [A] 1-17 * abstract * * column 3, line 50 - column 5, line 30 *; | [PX]WO9962265 (SARNOFF CORP) [PX] 1-5,16,17 * the whole document *; | [PX]WO0018136 (SARNOFF CORP) [PX] 1,2,7,9,16,17 * the whole document * | [YA] - STEINBACH E ET AL, "STANDARD COMPATIBLE EXTENSION OF H.263 FOR ROBUST VIDEO TRANSMISSION ON MOBILE ENVIRONMENTS", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS FOR VIDEO TECHNOLOGY,US,IEEE INC. NEW YORK, (19971201), vol. 7, no. 6, ISSN 1051-8215, pages 872 - 881, XP000199011 [Y] 9 * the whole document * [A] 1,2,14,15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/76.644067 | [A] - TALLURI R ET AL, "A ROBUST, SCALABLE, OBJECT-BASED VIDEO COMPRESSION TECHNIQUE FOR VERY LOW BIT-RATE CODING", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS FOR VIDEO TECHNOLOGY,US,IEEE INC. NEW YORK, (19970201), vol. 7, no. 1, ISSN 1051-8215, pages 221 - 233, XP000678893 [A] 1,14,15 * section I.B, Object-Based Coding Versus Block-Based Coding * * figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/76.554433 |