EP1202946 - MOLYBDENUM TRIOXIDE CATALYZED FLUORINATION REACTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.05.2003 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.05.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.07.2003 [2003/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION Occidental Tower, 5005 LBJ Freeway Dallas, TX 75244-6119 / US | [2002/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MANDAL, Sanjay 6204 Elliott Court Midland MI 8642 / US | [2002/31] |
Former [2002/19] | 01 /
MANDAL, Sanjay 90 Jamestown Road Grand Island, NY 14072 / US | Representative(s) | Frankland, Nigel Howard, et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/19] | Frankland, Nigel Howard, et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00937057.8 | 07.06.2000 | [2002/19] | WO2000GB02195 | Priority number, date | US19990373133 | 12.08.1999 Original published format: US 373133 | [2002/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0112577 | Date: | 22.02.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1202946 | Date: | 08.05.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.02.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C07C17/20, C07B39/00, C07C22/04, C07C22/06 | [2002/19] | CPC: |
C07C205/11 (EP,US);
C07B39/00 (EP,US);
C07C17/206 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C17/206, C07C22/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/19] | Title | German: | MOLYBDÄNTRIOXID KATALYSIERTE FLUORIERUNGSREAKTIONEN | [2002/19] | English: | MOLYBDENUM TRIOXIDE CATALYZED FLUORINATION REACTIONS | [2002/19] | French: | REACTIONS DE FLUORATION CATALYSEES PAR DU TRIOXYDE DE MOLYBDENE | [2002/19] | Entry into regional phase | 19.02.2002 | National basic fee paid | 19.02.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.02.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.02.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/19] | 02.01.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/28] | 06.02.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/28] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2002 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | JPS5139606 [ ] (CENTRAL GLASS CO LTD); | [DY]US4098832 (BAXAMUSA YUSUF A, et al) [DY] 1-5 * claim - *; | [E]WO0034215 (OCCIDENTAL CHEM CO [US], et al) [E] 1,5-7,10* claims 1,2,12 *; | [Y] - OKAZAKI, KOSHI ET AL, "Fluorination of alkyl chlorides", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19760927), vol. 85, no. 13, Database accession no. 94212, XP002150778 [Y] 1-5 * abstract * |